Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KRONENBERGER, TIMOTHY LYLE vs. KRONENBERGER, BRITTANY L
On April 28, 2009 a divorce with parentage case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, OH. Judge SPITLER, COREY E presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 28, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Wayne County, OH
Category
DIVORCE WITH PARENTAGE
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
MAIL RETURNED SENT TO THE WRONG ADDRESS RESENT
Date: Apr 07, 2016ORDERED: NUNC PRO TUNC CC: REG MAIL TO PLNT, EMAILED TO RODGERS, CSEA
Date: Mar 25, 2016MOTION FOR CORRECTION NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: Mar 22, 2016ORDERED: CC: REG MAIL TO PLNT, EMAILED TO RODGERS, CSEA
Date: Mar 22, 2016MAGISTRATES DECISION CC: REG MAIL TO PLNT, EMAILED TO RODGERS, CSEA
Date: Mar 22, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: Jan 29, 2016MOTION TO REVIEW REQUEST FOR VISITATION ABATEMENT
Date: Jan 27, 2016MAGISTRATES ORDER CC: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO PLNT, DFNT EMAILED TO CSEA
Date: Jan 27, 2016ORDERED: JOURNALIZED CC; PLNT, DFNT CSEA
Date: May 13, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING BY MAGISTRATE HINES IN CP 4 NOVEMBER 29, 2011 AT 11:00 AM
Date: Oct 03, 2011FILED NOTICE OF RELOCATION ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257)
Date: Jan 06, 2011FILED NOTICE ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257)
Date: Dec 21, 2010FILED MOTION ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320)
Date: Nov 01, 2010BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320)
Date: Oct 20, 2010MOTION IN LIMINE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320)
Date: Oct 19, 2010NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO- COUNSEL ATTORNEY: OWENS, CLARKE W (0070822)
Date: Oct 19, 2010NOTICE IN COMPLAINCE WITH EVIDENCE ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257)
Date: Oct 12, 2010MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ATTORNEY: ROBERTS, JARED (0081791)
Date: Sep 27, 2010MOTION FOR RELIEF ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257)
Date: Sep 15, 2010MOTION TO RECONSIDER ATTORNEY: ROBERTS, JARED (0081791)
Date: Sep 10, 2010MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320)
Date: Sep 03, 2010TRIAL MEMORANDUM ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320)
Date: Aug 09, 2010FILED MARTIAL ASSETS ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320)
Date: May 17, 2010FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320)
Date: Feb 10, 2010DEFT FINAL PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: Jan 26, 2010MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE (0075257)
Date: Jan 08, 2010CERTIFICATE FROM COUNSELING CENTER FOR: TIMOTHY KRONENBERGER
Date: Jul 23, 2009NOTICE OF SERVING DISCOVERY RESPONSES ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE (0075257)
Date: Jul 06, 2009CERTIFICATE FROM COUNSELING CENTER FOR: BRITTANY KRONENBERGER
Date: Jun 18, 2009ANSWER AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.
Date: Jun 12, 2009MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION
Date: May 27, 2009APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
Date: May 19, 2009DOMESTIC COMPLAINT FILED RECEIPT: 32080 DATE: 04/28/2009
Date: Apr 28, 2009Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | 4DCPREMO WAIVED $20.0000 | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CPDECM WAIVED $3.0000 | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CPPOST WAIVED $0.4800 | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CPORDD WAIVED $3.0000 | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CPDECM WAIVED $6.0000 | |
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED SENT TO THE WRONG ADDRESS RESENT | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDERED: NUNC PRO TUNC CC: REG MAIL TO PLNT, EMAILED TO RODGERS, CSEA | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S DECISION NUNC PRO TUNC CC: REG MAIL TO PLNT EMAILED TO RODGERS, CSEA | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ASSESSED $0.48 | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC SERVICE TO RECIPIENTS: RODGERS, PATRICIA ANN, RODGERS, PATRICIA ANN, CSEA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 SENT DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CPDECM-3/25/2016,CPORDD-3/25/2016 | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDERED: FEE ASSESSED $3.00 | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: FEE ASSESSED $6.00 | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CORRECTION NUNC PRO TUNC | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDERED: CC: REG MAIL TO PLNT, EMAILED TO RODGERS, CSEA | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S DECISION CC: REG MAIL TO PLNT, EMAILED TO RODGERS, CSEA | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC SERVICE TO RECIPIENTS: RODGERS, PATRICIA ANN, RODGERS, PATRICIA ANN, CSEA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 SENT DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CPDECM-3/22/2016,CPORDD-3/22/2016 | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REVIEW REQUEST FOR VISITATION ABATEMENT | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S ORDER CC: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO PLNT, DFNT EMAILED TO CSEA | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FILED FOR REMO: FEE ASSESSED $20.00 | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FORM | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: FEE ASSESSED $3.00 | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC SERVICE TO RECIPIENTS: CSEA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 SENT DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CPDECM-1/27/2016 | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CSEA REVIEW SET FOR 03/16/2016 AT 10:30 AM IN CP3/ , JDG: HINES, ROBERT B | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE KAREN DEACTIVATED | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA ANN DEACTIVATED | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC SERVICE TO RECIPIENTS: CSEA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 3 SENT DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: 4DCPORDNC-5/13/2015,EXHIBITS-5/13/2015,EXHIBITS-5/13/2015 | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDERED: JOURNALIZED CC; PLNT, DFNT CSEA | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FORM | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | CONVIENCE FEE RECEIPT: 63886 DATE: 05/25/2012 | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | 90 DAY NOTICE WAS SENT: KRONENBERGER, BRITTANY L WAS SENT NOTICE FOR $ 43.50 PRINTED ON 05/22/2012 13:30:37. | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | 90 DAY NOTICE WAS SENT: KRONENBERGER, TIMOTHY LYLE WAS SENT NOTICE FOR $ 43.50 PRINTED ON 05/22/2012 13:30:37. | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | 60 DAY NOTICE WAS SENT: KRONENBERGER, TIMOTHY LYLE WAS SENT NOTICE FOR $ 43.50 PRINTED ON 04/16/2012 07:53:29. | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | 60 DAY NOTICE WAS SENT: KRONENBERGER, BRITTANY L WAS SENT NOTICE FOR $ 43.50 PRINTED ON 04/16/2012 07:53:29. | |
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE WAS SENT: (RESENT 4/5/12) KRONENBERGER, TIMOTHY LYLE WAS SENT NOTICE FOR $ 43.50 PRINTED ON 03/15/2012 08:37:44. | |
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE WAS SENT: KRONENBERGER, BRITTANY L WAS SENT NOTICE FOR $ 43.50 PRINTED ON 03/15/2012 08:37:44. | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | COURTESY LETTER WAS ISSUED 1/2 COSTS EA PARTY PER JE: (N) NOTICE 1 FOR A/R (NO DEPOSIT) SENT ON: 12/22/2011 10:33:27 | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDERED: FATHER SHALL HAVE AT LEAST LOCAL RULE 14 TITLE 18 VISIATION. SEE CASE. CC: RODGERS, SHRINER, CSEA, THARP RECEIPT: 63885 DATE: 05/25/2012 RECEIPT: 64501 DATE: 06/19/2012 | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE DECISION AND JUDGES ORDER: PLTFS MOTION FOR MODIFICATION IS HEREBY GRANTED ACCORDING TO SEPARATE JOURNAL ENTRY. DEFTS MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT IS CONSIDERED AND DENIED. DEFTS MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF ALLOCATION OF THE DEFPENDENCY EXPEMPTIONS IS HEREBY GRANTED. COSTS TO DEPOSIT ANY BALANCE TAXED EQUALLY. SEE CASE. CC: RODGERS, SHRINER, THARP, CSEA Receipt: 63885 Date: 05/25/2012 Receipt: 64501 Date: 06/19/2012 | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED NOTICE OF SERVING DISCOVERY RESPONSES ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BY MAGISTRATE HINES IN CP #4 NOVEMBER 29, 2011 AT 11:00 AM | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED MOTION FOR MODIFACTION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND TAX DEPENDENCY EXEMPTION ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC MOTION FILED MOTION TO MODIFY PARENTING TIME ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) RECEIPT: 63885 DATE: 05/25/2012 RECEIPT: 64501 DATE: 06/19/2012 | |
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | COURTESY LETTER WAS ISSUED TO ATTY RODGERS FOR $75.50: (N) NOTICE 1 FOR A/R SENT ON: 02/17/2011 12:33:54 | |
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDERED: PAGE 6 OF THE MAGISTRATES DECISION JOURNALIZED JAN 24, 2011 SHALL BE AMENDED. PLAINTIFF SHALL BE GIVEN CREDIT ON THE CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET. PG 1 OF THE JUDGMENT ENTRY ESTABLISHING MODIFYING CHILD SUPPORT AND MEDICAL SUPPORT FILED JAN 24, 2011 SHALL BE AMENDED. PAGE 2 OF THE JUDGMENT ENTRY ESTABLISHING MODIFYING CHILD SUPPORT AND MEDICAL SUPPORT FILED JAN 24, 2011 SHALL BE AMENDED. IN ALL OTHER ASPECTS THE JUDGMENT ENTRY ESTABLISHING MODIFYING CHILD SUPPORT AND MEDICAL SUPPORT FILED JAN 24, 2011 SHALL REMAIN THE SAME. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION DATED FEB, 7, 2011 IS DENIED. UNLESS NOTIFIED BY COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF TO THE CONTRARY, ON OR BEFORE 14 DAYS AFTER JOURNALIZATION DATE HEREIN, THE COURT WILL ASSUME THAT THE OBJECTIONS FILED BY THE PLAINITFF ARE RESOLVED AND THE JR DATED JAN 24, 2011 AS AMENDED HEREIN CONSTITUTES THE FINAL ORDER OF THIS COURT. SEE CASE FOR DETAILS...CC: RODGERS, SHRINER, CSEA Receipt: 51077 Date: 03/02/2011 | |
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERAION OF CLARIFIACATION TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION OF JANUARY 24, 2011. OBJECTIONS TO MAGRISTATE'S DECISION OF JANUARY 24, 2011 ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING TRACKED TO JUDGE SPITLER WITHOUT FILE | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/CLARIFIICATION OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION OF JANUARY 24, 2011 ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK CASE OUT TO JUDGE SPITLER | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK CASE OUT TO CHRISTINE THARP | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE:PLTF IS HEREBY GRANTED A DIVORCE ON THE GROUNDS ON INCOMPATIBILITY. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, RODGERS, SHRINER RECEIPT: 51077 DATE: 03/02/2011 | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S DECISION: THE JUDGMENT ENTRY ATTACHED HERETO REFLECTS THE AMOUNT OF CHILD SUPPORT THAT HE SHOULD PAY. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, RODGERS, SHRINER RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED NOTICE OF RELOCATION ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED NOTICE ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS E | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS D | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS ON SUPPORT AND IRS TAX EXEMPTION ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY: THE TESTIMONY OF DR. ADAM KEATING IS HEREBY SET FOR NOVEMBER 17, 2010 AT 7:30 AM THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THAT THE PARTIES AND COUNSELS SHALL RECEIVE. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, OWENS, SHRINER, RODGERS RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED MOTION ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER: THE COURT HEREBY APPOINTS CHRISTINE THARP AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL SHALL COOPERATE FULLY AND COMPLETELY WITH THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM, FAILURE OF ANY PERSON TO ABIDE BY THESE ORDERS MAY BE PUNISHED AS CONTEMPT OF COURT. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, RODGERS, SHRINER Receipt: 50777 Date: 02/17/2011 | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO- COUNSEL ATTORNEY: OWENS, CLARKE W (0070822) | |
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED SEPARATION AGREEMENT SHARED PARENTING PLAN NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE IN COMPLAINCE WITH EVIDENCE ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: THIS MATTER IS HEREBY CONTINUED FOR FURTHER HEARING OCTOBER 20, 2010 AT 12:30 PM. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, RODGERS, SHRINER RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ATTORNEY: ROBERTS, JARED (0081791) | |
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: THE HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 8, 2010 AT 8:00 AM IS HEREBY CONTINUED UNTIL SEPTEMBER28, 2010 AT 12:30 PM. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, SHRINER, RODGERS RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: THAT THE MINOR CHILD CONTINUE TO BE ENROLLED IN THE GREEN LOCAL SCHOOL DISTRICT AND MORE SPECIFICALLY CONTINUE TO ATTEND SMITHVILLE ELEMENTARY EVEN THOUGH VISITATION BETWEEN PLTF, THE RESIDENTIAL PARENT FOR SCHOLL PURPOSES, AND THE MINOR CHILD HAS BEEN SUSPENDED UNTIL FURTHER HEARING BY THIS COURT. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, SHRINER, RODGERS Receipt: 50777 Date: 02/17/2011 | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RELIEF ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: THE PRIOR ORDER AND DECISION OF THE MAISTRATE JOURNALIZED ON SEPTEMBER 2, 2010 IS HEREBY VACATED. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, SHRINER, RODGERS RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RECONSIDER ATTORNEY: ROBERTS, JARED (0081791) | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | WAYNE COUNTY CHILDREN SERVICES BOARD'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR RECORDS ATTORNEY: ROBERTS, JARED (0081791) | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: SAID MOTION IS WELL TAKEN AND GRANTED. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, RODGERS, SHRINER, ROBERTS RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED MOTION TO REIVEW RECCORDS, IN CAMERA ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: THAT VISITATION BETWEEN PLTF AND THE MINOR CHILDREN OF THE PARTIES SHALL BE IMMEDIATELY SUSPENDED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT, A PRETRIAL SHALL BE HELD IN THIS MATTER ON SEPTEMBER 8, 2010 AT 8:00 AM. SEE CASE. CC:CSEA, SHRINER, RODGERS Receipt: 50777 Date: 02/17/2011 | |
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED MOTION FOR EMERGENCY SUSPENSION OF VISITATION ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE K (0075257) | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event | TRIAL MEMORANDUM ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE:FINAL HEARING IS SET FOR AUGUST 9TH, 2010. SEE CASE. CC:RODGERS, SHRINER, CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED MARTIAL ASSETS ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED MOTION TO ADOPT SHARED PARENTING PLAN AND SHARED PARENTING PLAN ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY: THE 2/11/10 HEARING CONTINUED AND A PRETRIAL CONF SET FOR 5/17/10 AT 9 AM. PARTIES AND COUNSEL DIRECTED TO APPEAR. C: RODGERS / SHRINER / CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED PRETRIAL STATEMENT OF TIMOTHY KRINENBERGER ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFT FINAL PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: PARTIES REMINDED OF FINAL HRG SET FOR FEBRUARY 11, 2010 AT 1:00 PM. SEE CASE. CC: RODGERS, SHRINER, CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: HRG SET FOR 1/21/10 IS CONTINUED TO JANUARY 20, 2010 AT 8:30 AM. SEE CASE. CC: SHRINER, RODGERS, CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE (0075257) | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: A PRETRIAL CONF HEREBY SCHEDULED FOR 1/21/2010 AT 10 AM. FINAL HEARING SCHEDULED 2/11/2010 AT 1 PM. C: RODGERS / SHRINER / CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | STAUS TWO CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM FILED. ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION. ATTORNEY: RODGERS, PATRICIA A (0016320) | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: STATUS CONF TWO IS SCHEDULED FOR OCT. 15, 2009 AT 9:30 AM... CC: R SHRINER, P RODGERS, CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: MAGISTRATE'S AGREED ENTRY. SEE CASE FOR DETAILS. CC: RODGERS, SHRINER, CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FROM COUNSELING CENTER FOR: TIMOTHY KRONENBERGER | |
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DISCOVERY RESPONSES ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE (0075257) | |
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE FROM COUNSELING CENTER FOR: BRITTANY KRONENBERGER | |
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: ATTY SHRINER SHALL REDUCE AGREEMENT TO WRITING AND SUBMIT ON OR BEFORE 6/25/09. STATUS ONE CONF SCHEDULED 8/6/09 AT 9 AM. C: SHRINER / RODGERS / CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY: THE APPEAL CASE #09-DR-0197 HAS ALREADY BEEN DISMISSED. SEE CASE FOR DETAILS. CC: RODGERS, SHRINER,CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: HRG CONTINUED TO JUNE 11, 2009 AT 8:00 AM. SEE CASE. CC: RODGERS, SHRINER, CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE WITH NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEY: SHRINER, ROSANNE (0075257) | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING SENT TO MAGISTATE HINES W/O FILE | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO SERVE RETURN FILED BY WAYNE COUNTY SHERIFF. SERVED: BRITTANY L KRONENBERGER ON 5/11/09 RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ORDERS & ALL ASOCIATED DOCUMENTS TO DEFT BY: PERSONAL SERVICE THROUGH WAYNE CO SHERIFF RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO SERVE DEFT BY PERSONAL SERVICE THROUGH WAYNE COUNTY SHERIFF RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE: MUTUAL RESTRAINING ORDER. SEE CASE FOR DETAILS. CC: RODGERS, DEFT, CSEA RECEIPT: 50777 DATE: 02/17/2011 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BY MAGISTRATE HINES IN CP #4 ON MAY 20, 2009 AT 1:00 PM. TIME ALLOTTED 1/2 HR FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK-CASE IN CLERK'S OFFICE | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC COMPLAINT FILED RECEIPT: 32080 DATE: 04/28/2009 | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | DIVORCE DEPOSIT RECEIPT: 32080 DATE: 04/28/2009 | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | TRACK FILE OUT TO MAGISTRATE HINES |