Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
R.D. Geronimo, Ltd, Richard J. Digeronimo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Filosa, Anthony Rudy, Riger, Lee E., Rosenberg, David I., against Archstone Group Nyc Llc, Michael Miller, Property Analytix, Llc, Royce Ashton Rowles, Ryan Lin, (total of 5) See All represented by Katz, Kenneth J, Sackowitz, Adam Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Sharon Gianelli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial Division - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiffs, Richard J. DiGeronimo and R.D. Geronimo, Ltd., are suing Property Analytix, LLC, Archstone Group NYC LLC, Michael Miller, Royce Ashton Rowles, a...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 06, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 08, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 18, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 28, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 08, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 08, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 02, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 24, 2022INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: January 06, 2022POOR PERSON ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 27, 2024STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 06, 2023ORDER APPOINTING FORENSIC EVALUATOR
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY (MAT PILOT ONLY)
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: August 26, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 12, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 27, 2024NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: June 06, 2023PART 130 CERTIFICATION
Date: March 27, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 24, 2022PART 130 CERTIFICATION
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2022POOR PERSON ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 05, 2022INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: January 05, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 07, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 27, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 27, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 22, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 10, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 27, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF
Date: March 27, 2024AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 27, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 26, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 10, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 22, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 29, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: August 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2022INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 0
Date: January 05, 2022FEE WAIVER APPLICATION (MAT PILOT ONLY)
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2022STATEMENT OF NET WORTH
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 17, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 28, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #7) NBR Tax Returns 2017-2021 - CPI redacted
Date: April 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 06, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #9)
Date: May 07, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 13, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 13, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 08, 2024COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 31, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: May 13, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 13, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: May 07, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: September 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: May 26, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 07, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 25, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: April 30, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #9)
Date: October 06, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 13, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 27, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #9) Death Certificate
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 22, 2024MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 27, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 25, 2023TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 04, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #9) Death Certificate
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 30, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: December 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 19, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 13, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 12, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 30, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 25, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: November 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Ex. 1 - May 7, 2024 email to Plaintiff |
|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Ex. 2 - Proof of Mailing |
|
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Defendant's Second Request for Production of Documents |
|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request of Document Production |
|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #9) Notice of Entry with Decision and Order |
|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #9) | |
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 TENNESSEE SESSION COURT DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.