Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ben-Zion Alcalay, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Amsalam, Ben, Davidoff, Jonathan M, Shapero, Danielle Shayne, against Atlas Cybersecurity Llc, Barry Dynkin, represented by Rosen, Gary S, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Randysue Marber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandysue Marber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Domestication Of Judgment) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected*
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Response to Motion to Vacate Default
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 04, 2022SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Renewed Motion for Default
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Guarantee
Date: March 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Motion for Final Judgement
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #002) guaranty
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - j  (Motion #002) response to motion to vacate
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - g  (Motion #002) motion for default renew
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - p  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - k  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - e  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - f  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - h  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - n  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - e  (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - f  (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - i  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - q  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - z  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - m  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - l  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - x  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - s  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - t  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - r  (Motion #002) motoin for judgment
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - o  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - y  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - u  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - aa  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - bb  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - w  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - v  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - s  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - e  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - i  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 17, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - f  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - g  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 01, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: May 01, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 30, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - j  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - k  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - h  (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 02, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) service via email of osc |
||
October 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 02, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #3) Signed |
||
September 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) CPLR 2217 |
||
September 23, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
September 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #3) cover letter |
||
September 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - s (Motion #3) informaiton subpoena |
||
September 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #3) document subpoena |
||
September 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #3) affirmaiton of service |
||
September 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #3) restrainign notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.