Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Boudreau, John, On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Alejandro P Gutierrez, Brian D Hefelfinger, Daniel J Palay, against Does 1-10, Mcginness, Chris, Primeritus Financial Services Inc, represented by Keith A Jacoby, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
Category(Other Employment Complaint Case) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This is a complaint filed on behalf of plaintiff John Boudreau, against defendants Primeritus Financial Services Inc. and Chris McGinness, and "Does 1 through 10, inclusive." Plaintiff
alleges causes of action for: 1) Violation of the California L...
Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: July 15, 2020Opposition to defs MSA
Date: August 13, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 14, 2020Notice for Complex Case Management
Date: March 25, 2019Stipulation and Order to Further Continue Motion Cutoff and Related Dates
Date: May 19, 2020Separate Statement in Opp to defs MSA
Date: August 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 23, 2019Motion re: for Class Certification
Date: December 13, 2019Declaration of Daniel J Palay in Opp to defs MSA
Date: August 13, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2020Declaration Declaration of Nathanial Jenkins ISO Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 14, 2020[mche] Stipulation and Order to continue Motion Cutoff and Related Dates.
Date: May 15, 2020Reply SA
Date: September 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 14, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 01, 2020Notice and Order of Complex Determination
Date: March 19, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 29, 2020Stipulation and Order Regarding Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Date: March 29, 2019Declaration DECLARATION RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: December 02, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: August 12, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: February 04, 2022Complaint
Date: December 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 25, 2019Answer
Date: February 08, 2019Order Notice of Hearing in Department 14 for Complex Case Management
Date: March 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration of Brian Hefelfinger ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 13, 2019Declaration of Daniel Palay ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 13, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 30, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: February 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 18, 2020[mche] Stipulation to Further Continue Motion Cutoff and Related dates - Order
Date: June 04, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of MSA
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Continuance
Date: July 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 15, 2020Correspondence Re: Letter to Continue 2/3 Motion to 2/18
Date: January 17, 2020Reply Brief ISO defs MSA
Date: September 04, 2020Order Class Certification and Class Notice
Date: February 03, 2020Stipulation and Order to Continue Motion Cutoff and Related Dates
Date: May 06, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: September 24, 2020Reply to Statement ISO plfs MSA
Date: September 03, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: October 08, 2020Declaration of Christopher McGinness in Support of MSA
Date: July 15, 2020Separate Statement in Support of MSA
Date: July 15, 2020Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence in Support of MSA
Date: July 15, 2020Response to plfs separate Statement of Material Facts in Opp to MSA
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 04, 2020Notice Amended Notice of MSA
Date: September 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 05, 2020Declaration RE Proof Of Service of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion
Date: June 28, 2021Joint Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 19, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 04, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: December 03, 2020Stipulation and Order For Continuance of Case Management Conference
Date: February 11, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: February 25, 2021[mche] Stip and (Proposed) Order for Continuance of Case Management Conference
Date: February 26, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: April 07, 2021Joint Case Management Statement
Date: March 24, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: April 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 28, 2021Notice
Date: June 23, 2021Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: June 28, 2021Declaration Of Plaintiff John Boudreau ISO Motion
Date: June 28, 2021Declaration Of Alejandro P. Gutierrez ISO Unopposed Motion
Date: June 28, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 29, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 23, 2021Joint Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: July 22, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 23, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 30, 2021[mche] Order
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: August 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 06, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Continuance of CMC
Date: August 04, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 30, 2021Joint Case Management Statement
Date: September 29, 2021Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. HEFELFINGER ISO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: November 12, 2021Motion re: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRO P. GUTIERREZ ISO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration DECLARATION OF ZACHARY COOLEY RE NOTICE AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 22, 2021Order Order and Final Judgment
Date: December 22, 2021Summons
Date: December 27, 2018Notice and Order of Complex Determination
Date: March 11, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 27, 2018Order Granting Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: June 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 14, 2019Stipulation and Order Re: Certification of Xertain Classes
Date: January 28, 2020Proposed Order
Date: February 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 15, 2020Response Defendant's esponse to Separate statement ISO Mot for Summary Judgment
Date: August 14, 2020Declaration of Palay
Date: July 15, 2020Declaration of Daniel J Palay ISO Reply to defs Opp to plfs MSA
Date: September 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 12, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: April 12, 2019Declaration of Alejandro P Gutierrez ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 13, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 11, 2019Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Date: April 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 10, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 17, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: December 13, 2019Statement Sep Statement of Material Facts iso MSA
Date: July 15, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 06, 2019Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: June 28, 2021Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: May 10, 2019Paper Exhibits (Compendium of Evidence in Support of MSA) filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Proof of Service filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Proof of Service filed.
Date: May 06, 2019Order - Other (Order and Final Judgment) filed.
Date: December 22, 2021Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: May 10, 2019Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (SA) filed.
Date: September 03, 2020Order - Other (Granting Stipulation and Protective Order) filed.
Date: June 11, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: September 04, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 23, 2021Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: March 19, 2019Declaration - Other (of Christopher McGinness in Support of MSA) filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Reply (to Statement ISO plfs MSA) filed.
Date: September 03, 2020Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Re: Certification of Xertain Classes) filed.
Date: January 28, 2020Complaint filed.
Date: December 27, 2018Order - Other (Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: April 08, 2019Declaration - Other (Of Plaintiff John Boudreau ISO Motion) filed.
Date: June 28, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: December 27, 2018Answer filed.
Date: February 08, 2019Response (Defendant's esponse to Separate statement ISO Mot for Summary Judgment) filed.
Date: August 14, 2020Proposed Order filed.
Date: February 03, 2020Declaration - Other (Of Alejandro P. Gutierrez ISO Unopposed Motion) filed.
Date: June 28, 2021Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action filed.
Date: February 13, 2020Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: February 13, 2020Notice of Hearing (for Complex Case Management) filed.
Date: March 25, 2019Response (to plfs separate Statement of Material Facts in Opp to MSA) filed.
Date: September 04, 2020Declaration - Other (of Palay) filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Proposed Order (PROPOSED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT) filed.
Date: November 12, 2021Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: July 08, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 26, 2021Statement - Other (Sep Statement of Material Facts iso MSA) filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Order - Other (Class Certification and Class Notice) filed.
Date: February 03, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: April 12, 2019Opposition (to defs MSA) filed.
Date: August 13, 2020Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: January 30, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: January 15, 2020Statement of Undisputed Facts (in Opp to defs MSA) filed.
Date: August 13, 2020Declaration - Other (DECLARATION RE PROOF OF SERVICE) filed.
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration - Other (of Daniel J Palay in Opp to defs MSA) filed.
Date: August 13, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of MSA) filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Declaration - Other (of Daniel J Palay ISO Reply to defs Opp to plfs MSA) filed.
Date: September 03, 2020Proposed Order filed.
Date: June 28, 2021Motion - Other (for Class Certification) filed.
Date: December 13, 2019Summons filed.
Date: December 27, 2018Stipulation to Further Continue Motion Cutoff and Related dates - Order
Date: June 04, 2020Declaration - Other (of Alejandro P Gutierrez ISO Motion for Class Certification) filed.
Date: December 13, 2019Stip and (Proposed) Order for Continuance of Case Management Conference
Date: February 26, 2021Motion for Summary Adjudication filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Association of Attorney filed.
Date: December 13, 2019Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: March 11, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: March 18, 2019Motion - Other (MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS) filed.
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration - Other (RE Proof Of Service of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion) filed.
Date: June 28, 2021Notice - Other (of Continuance of CMC) filed.
Date: August 04, 2021Minutes finalized for heard on 01/15/2020 11:02:00 AM .
Date: January 15, 2020Declaration - Other (of Daniel Palay ISO Motion for Class Certification) filed.
Date: December 13, 2019Statement of Undisputed Facts (in Support of MSA) filed.
Date: July 15, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: November 19, 2020Order
Date: July 29, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: March 11, 2019Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 10/09/2020 11:00:00 AM .
Date: October 09, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 30, 2021Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 19, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 07/30/2021 11:41:00 AM .
Date: July 30, 2021Correspondence (Re: Letter to Continue 2/3 Motion to 2/18) filed.
Date: January 17, 2020Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: March 24, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 09, 2021Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 14, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 12/04/2020 10:30:00 AM .
Date: December 04, 2020Declaration - Other (of Brian Hefelfinger ISO Motion for Class Certification) filed.
Date: December 13, 2019Minutes finalized for heard on 08/06/2021 10:12:00 AM .
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: February 04, 2022Stipulation and Order to continue Motion Cutoff and Related Dates.
Date: May 15, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: August 14, 2019Amended Complaint filed.
Date: April 12, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: April 08, 2021Reply (Brief ISO defs MSA) filed.
Date: September 04, 2020Association of Attorney filed.
Date: August 12, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 10, 2019Proposed Order filed.
Date: June 29, 2021Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service (PROOF OF SERVICE) filed.
Date: November 12, 2021Motion for Approval of Class Settlement filed.
Date: June 28, 2021Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 02/26/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: February 26, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 06, 2021Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: September 29, 2021Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (For Continuance of Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: February 11, 2021Notice - Other (of Case Reassignment) filed.
Date: August 04, 2021Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 10/25/2019 10:30:00 AM .
Date: October 25, 2019Notice - Other (Amended Notice of MSA) filed.
Date: September 24, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 14, 2020Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: September 24, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.