Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Glas Tavo Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Valdivia Gustavo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nissen Christopher D., Stewart Ian A, against Edwards Matthew R, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Stephen P. Pfahler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen P. Pfahler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2022 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Opposition TO DEMURRER; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TRO PI) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Reply Defendant Matthew Edwards' Reply to Plaintiffs Demurrer; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TRO PI) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - Amended; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Amended; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gustavo Valdivia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order; Signed and Filed by: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Matthew R Edwards (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 11, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2022Complaint
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 12, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO PI
Date: January 27, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO PI)
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO PI)
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 10, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 14, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 02, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 11, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 29, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: April 29, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: May 05, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 05, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: June 29, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: July 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 22, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 22, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 22, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: August 05, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: OSC AND ORDER FOR MANDATO...)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: August 10, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 19, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 14, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 14, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON M...)
Date: September 15, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: September 16, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2022Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT MATTHEW EDWARDS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS DEMURRER
Date: September 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON CULTIVA LAW, PLLC'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: October 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: October 12, 2022Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: December 02, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: January 13, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 13, 2023Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 19, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 24, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 24, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: January 25, 2023Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: February 27, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TRO PI))
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TRO PI) of 01/31/2022)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR TRO PI)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.