Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Schaub, Mark, Tlg Ltd, filed a(n) Unlimited Fraud (16) case represented by Umhofer, Matthew Donald, against Fcp Corporate, Fcp Corporate Ltd, Fcp Private Llc, Waters, Andrew Wyles, represented by Baker, Cory Taylor, Nimmons, Kevin R, Pro Se, Woodsome, Meghan K, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Fraud (16) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges that the defendants, Andrew Wyles Waters, FCP Corporate Ltd., and FCP Private, LLC, engaged in theft and fraud by transferring approximately $1.9 million from the plaintiffs, Mark Schaub and TLG Ltd., to accounts controlled by ...
Motion: Strike
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 20212_RJN and Exs. F-J
Date: February 15, 20224_Proof of Service
Date: February 15, 20223_Sep. Stm't ISO Motion to Compel
Date: February 15, 20221_Pl.'s' Motion to Compel Exs. A-E
Date: February 15, 20222022-02-17 CMC
Date: February 17, 2022Motion: Withdraw as Attorney
Date: January 07, 2022Order, Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 04, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 07, 20222022-03-07 Notice of CMC FINAL
Date: March 07, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 25, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 14, 20212022-05-02 CMS
Date: May 02, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: May 06, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 06, 20222022-05-0 Ntc of Payment
Date: May 09, 20222022-05-09 Ntc of Cont of Hearing
Date: May 09, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: May 09, 20222- Not of Pltfs MTC FCP Private RFAs
Date: May 13, 20223- Not of Pltfs MTC FCP Private RFPs
Date: May 13, 20221- Not of Pltfs MTC FCP Private FROGs
Date: May 13, 20225- Req For Judicial Notice
Date: May 13, 20222- Notice of Pltfs MTC Discovery Waters RFAs
Date: May 13, 20226- Sep Stmt ISO MTC FCP Private
Date: May 13, 20224- Memo of P&A's FCP Private
Date: May 13, 20227- POS
Date: May 13, 20226- Sep Stmt ISO MTC Discovery Waters
Date: May 13, 20224- Plffs' Memo Ps and As MTC Discovery Waters
Date: May 13, 20221- Notice of Pltfs MTC Discovery Waters FROGs
Date: May 13, 20225- Request For Judicial Notice- Waters
Date: May 13, 20222022-05-13 POS
Date: May 13, 20223- Notice of Pltfs MTC Discovery Waters RFPs
Date: May 13, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: May 13, 20222022-05-17 Supplemental DHB Decl
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: May 27, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Demurrer, Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Demurrer, Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 23, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: August 12, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Complaint, Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Non-availability, Filed
Date: March 25, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Non-availability, Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed
Date: July 19, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: October 14, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: April 14, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Supplemental Declaration, Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Mail Returned Undeliverable
Date: June 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: September 20, 20225_POS
Date: September 20, 20221_Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: September 20, 20223_Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 20, 20221_Schaub Request for Entry of Default
Date: January 19, 2023Schaub Notice of Change of Firm Aff
Date: January 31, 20232_Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: February 14, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Motion: Order
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Order, Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Notice of Change of Address, Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Answer, Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Judgment, Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Order, Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Reply, Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 23, 2020CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: July 16, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Demurrer
Date: June 04, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Stipulation, Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 24, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Answer, Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
Steve Schwab v. Christopher Bowen, et al. Case No. 20CV02113 Hearing Date: January 8, 2024 HEARING: Motion of Plaintiff Steve Schwab for Terminating Sanctions ATTORNEYS: For Plaintiff Steve Schwab: Wi...
Judge: Judge Colleen K. Sterne |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 2_Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
2_Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
1_Schaub Proposed Judgment Judgment, Filed in the amount of $1,889,332.00 |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Schaub Notice of Change of Firm Aff | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Schaub Notice of Change of Firm Aff Notice of Change of Address, Filed and Firm Affiliation |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | 1_Schaub Request for Entry of Default | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
2_Proposed Order Granting Motion Order, Filed Granting Pltiffs' Mot for Terminating Sanctions - Judgment for Ptiffs Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
4_Proposed Order Granting Judicial Notice Order, Filed Granting REquest for Judicial Notice ISO Pltiffs' Mot for Terminating Sanctions - Answer filed 10/25/2021 is hereby Striken; Judgment for Pltiffs Mark Schaub and TLG Ltd on causes of Action 1-4 of the Second Amended Complaint against Deft Andrew Waters, FCP Corp Ltd and FCP Private LLC Judge: Geck, Donna D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.