Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Diana P. Blum, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Palo Alto Foundation Medical Group, Inc., Palo Alto Medical Foundation, Sutter Health, represented by Christine A. Lawler, Lindbergh Porter, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Drew C. Takaichi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDrew C. Takaichi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2015 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited(36) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1072 days |
Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 11, 2017Conference: Settlement Jury
Date: July 12, 2017Conference: Trial Setting
Date: August 15, 2017Jury Trial: Long Cause
Date: January 08, 2018Motion: New Trial
Date: April 18, 2018Motion: Order
Date: April 24, 2018Motion: Order
Date: May 18, 2018Motion: Tax Cost
Date: May 18, 2018Motion: Seal Records
Date: June 29, 2018Motion: Tax Cost
Date: August 20, 2018Motion: Order
Date: August 20, 2018Appeal: Notice of Abandonment
Date: September 21, 2018Declaration
Date: August 07, 2018Abandonment: Appeal
Date: September 18, 2018Order After Hearing - POS
Date: August 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 21, 2018Substitution: Attorney
Date: August 22, 2018Deposit: Reporter's Transcript
Date: August 20, 2018Declaration
Date: August 07, 2018Declaration
Date: August 13, 2018Response/Reply
Date: August 13, 2018Designation
Date: August 17, 2018Response/Reply
Date: August 13, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 30, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: May 03, 2018Tentative Decision
Date: April 24, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: June 06, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: May 08, 2018Judgment
Date: May 25, 2018Order
Date: May 14, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 03, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: March 15, 2018Order
Date: May 18, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: March 20, 2018Response/Reply
Date: May 11, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: May 15, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: May 03, 2018Response/Reply
Date: April 16, 2018Response/Reply
Date: April 20, 2018Order
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 16, 2018Tentative Decision
Date: April 16, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 11, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 21, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: March 07, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 08, 2018Judgment
Date: February 22, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: March 13, 2018Statement
Date: April 05, 2018Request
Date: February 06, 2018Stipulation
Date: January 29, 2018Objection: Evidence
Date: January 26, 2018Memorandum
Date: February 06, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 29, 2018Motion: Tax Costs
Date: April 03, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: April 06, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 19, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 03, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 15, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 15, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 03, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: March 15, 2018Tentative Decision
Date: February 22, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 21, 2018Motion: Tax Costs
Date: March 13, 2018Stipulation
Date: March 08, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: February 06, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 06, 2018Objection: Evidence
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 06, 2018Motion: Other
Date: January 26, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 26, 2018Motion: Other
Date: January 29, 2018Order: Disposition of Exhibits
Date: January 30, 2018Response/Reply
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration: In Opposition
Date: January 16, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 26, 2018Response/Reply
Date: January 18, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 22, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 08, 2018Memorandum
Date: January 22, 2018Stipulation
Date: January 25, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 08, 2018Declaration: In Opposition
Date: January 08, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 08, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 08, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Statement
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 16, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: Sanctions
Date: January 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 02, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 16, 2018Brief: Reply
Date: January 08, 2018Declaration: In Opposition
Date: January 08, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 08, 2018Declaration: In Opposition
Date: January 08, 2018Motion: Seal
Date: January 08, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 05, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 05, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 05, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 05, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: Seal
Date: January 05, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 05, 2018Brief: Trial
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Statement
Date: January 05, 2018Brief: Trial
Date: January 05, 2018Declaration: In Opposition
Date: January 02, 2018Motion: Quash
Date: January 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 15, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 11, 2017Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2017Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 23, 2016Minute Order
Date: July 21, 2016Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 18, 2016Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 10, 2016Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 05, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: January 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 02, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 02, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 04, 2017Motion: Quash
Date: January 02, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2017Declaration: In Support
Date: January 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 14, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: February 23, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 20, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2017Minute Order
Date: November 22, 2016Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: November 10, 2016Minute Order
Date: June 14, 2016Minute Order
Date: April 08, 2016Minute Order
Date: November 01, 2016Minute Order
Date: April 20, 2016Minute Order
Date: January 08, 2016Proof of Service
Date: August 13, 2018Declaration
Date: August 13, 2018Proof of Service
Date: August 07, 2018Deposit: Reporter's Transcript
Date: August 06, 2018Deposit: Clerk's Transcript
Date: August 06, 2018Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: July 23, 2018Motion: Attorney's Fees
Date: July 23, 2018Proof of Service
Date: May 11, 2018Declaration
Date: May 11, 2018Declaration
Date: August 13, 2018Order After Hearing - POS
Date: August 01, 2018Designation
Date: August 02, 2018Declaration
Date: August 07, 2018Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
Date: July 27, 2018Order After Hearing - POS
Date: April 23, 2018Proof of Service
Date: July 24, 2018Declaration
Date: May 07, 2018Deposit: Reporter's Transcript
Date: April 18, 2018Appeal deposit for clerk's transcript
Date: April 18, 2018Affidavit
Date: April 11, 2018Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 18, 2018Proof of Service: Mail
Date: May 30, 2018Affidavit
Date: April 10, 2018Proof of Service
Date: April 10, 2018Affidavit
Date: May 15, 2018Proof of Service
Date: May 03, 2018Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: April 17, 2018Proof of Service
Date: April 16, 2018Proof of Service: Mail
Date: April 09, 2018Proof of Service
Date: April 11, 2018Proof of Service: Mail
Date: April 09, 2018Proof of Service
Date: April 11, 2018Proof of Service: Mail
Date: April 03, 2018Proof of Service
Date: April 03, 2018Motion: Attorney's Fees
Date: March 15, 2018Jury Instructions (Final)
Date: February 06, 2018Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: February 01, 2018Order After Hearing - POS
Date: February 06, 2018Notice
Date: February 06, 2018Notice
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service: Mail
Date: March 13, 2018Notice
Date: February 27, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 02, 2018Notice
Date: February 23, 2018Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: February 21, 2018Order After Hearing - POS
Date: February 16, 2018Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: February 08, 2018Verdict
Date: February 08, 2018Proof of Service
Date: January 29, 2018Lodged Under Seal
Date: January 08, 2018Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 08, 2018Declaration
Date: January 22, 2018Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 18, 2018Notice
Date: January 16, 2018Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 11, 2018Exhibit List (Party)
Date: January 05, 2018Lodged Under Seal
Date: January 05, 2018Lodged Under Seal
Date: January 05, 2018Lodged Under Seal
Date: January 05, 2018Other
Date: January 05, 2018Lodged Under Seal
Date: January 05, 2018Exhibit List (Party)
Date: January 05, 2018Index
Date: January 05, 2018Proof of Service
Date: January 02, 2018Proof of Service
Date: January 02, 2018Declaration
Date: November 10, 2016Affidavit
Date: March 19, 2018Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
Date: April 16, 2018Declaration
Date: April 03, 2018Declaration
Date: April 03, 2018Declaration
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration
Date: May 07, 2018Affidavit
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration
Date: May 07, 2018Appeal: Notice to Court Reporter
Date: May 30, 2018Designation
Date: April 16, 2018Declaration
Date: May 15, 2018Appeal: Notice of Abandonment
Date: June 07, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 17, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 03, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: February 20, 2018Request
Date: March 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 17, 2018Tentative Decision
Date: June 26, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: May 16, 2018Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)
Date: May 31, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: April 17, 2018Motion: Seal
Date: May 30, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: July 19, 2018Motion: Strike
Date: June 25, 2018Response/Reply
Date: April 10, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: June 25, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 17, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: April 17, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: May 31, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: May 30, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 27, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: May 07, 2018Motion: Amend
Date: June 28, 2018Response/Reply
Date: April 17, 2018Abandonment: Appeal
Date: June 01, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 20, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 19, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 03, 2018Motion (Amended)
Date: March 29, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: April 23, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 23, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: August 07, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: July 23, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: July 16, 2018Order
Date: July 12, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: June 29, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: May 03, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: August 07, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: July 24, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: July 24, 2018Response/Reply
Date: June 21, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: July 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 12, 2018Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: July 23, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 25, 2018Stipulation
Date: May 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Notice of Abandonment (H046045) |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Abandonment: Appeal Abandonment of Appeal Filed |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney old: Barta new: Louderback |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS Re mtn for atty s fees |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion: Tax Cost
Judge: Department 16 |
|
August 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion: Order
Judge: Department 16 |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Deposit: Reporter's Transcript Taken on Ntc. of Undoc. Act. |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Designation | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Hieu T. Williams in support of reply |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.