Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dehey Marjorie, Overacker Paul, Quality Control Restoration Inc., The Point At Beverly Hills Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Zola Emanuel D., against Barber Victor Michael, Lb Property Management Inc, Quality Control Restoration Inc., The Point At Beverly Hills Inc., represented by Bryan Geoffrey Levan, Cady Eurus, Carpenter Gregory James, Ghalumyan Hayk, Murphy Michael B, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management234 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 22, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 22, 2019Complaint
Date: January 22, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2019Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: January 25, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 14, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: March 18, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: April 19, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT - 1ST
Date: June 11, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 11, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: July 11, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 06, 2019Notice - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 09, 2019Answer
Date: August 09, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: August 29, 2019Answer
Date: August 29, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 30, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: September 13, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 29, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 05, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: November 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 07, 2019Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: December 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 14, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 12, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 03, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 29, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: January 31, 2020Answer
Date: January 31, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 29, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 16, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: June 07, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: June 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: September 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: September 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: October 01, 2021Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: October 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION OFF CALENDAR
Date: October 22, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 25, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CIVIL TRIAL DATE
Date: April 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS RE CONTINUANCE OF MSC, FSC AND TRIAL
Date: April 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 19, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCHEDULING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2022Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: August 01, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: August 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)
Date: August 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 30, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/30/2022
Date: August 30, 2022Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATION
Date: September 06, 2022Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
Date: September 06, 2022Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: September 19, 2022Case Management Statement; Filed by: Paul Overacker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Quality Control Restoration Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kere K. Tickner (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Paul Overacker (Defendant); The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: LB Property Management Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Quality Control Restoration Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by LB Property Management Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Quality Control Restoration Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Paul Overacker (Defendant); The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Quality Control Restoration Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Paul Overacker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Quality Control Restoration Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Quality Control Restoration Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LB Property Management Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00amended complaint Filed by Paul Overacker (Plaintiff); Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Order (Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Gregory James Carpenter (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Paul Overacker (Plaintiff); Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff); Ryker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Kere K. Tickner (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Ryker)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Due Diligence)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Defendant's Demurrer with Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case ...))
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Order (Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court;)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Plaintiffs Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Motion off Calendar)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LB Property Management Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Victor Michael Barber (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Quality Control Restoration Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: G. David Rubin (Attorney)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LB Property Management Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Quality Control Restoration Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Gregory James Carpenter (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference) Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Motion off Calendar) Filed by Victor Michael Barber (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Victor Michael Barber (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) Filed by Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Victor Michael Barber (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by G. David Rubin (Attorney)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference) Filed by Quality Control Restoration Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by Quality Control Restoration, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Victor Michael Barber (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by LB Property Management Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Filed by Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff); Ryker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Quality Control Restoration, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by The Point at Beverly Hills Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Marjorie Dehey (Plaintiff); Ryker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation |
|
January 09, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department M Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department M Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department M Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit/Purchase of Annuity) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit/Purchase of Annuity) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
October 14, 2022 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit/Purchase of Annuity scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
October 14, 2022 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.