Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Trujillo, Bryan, Trujillo, Cindy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bauerle, Ashley E., Choo, Claire, Danko, Michael S., against Does 1-20, Does 1-50, Magee, Stephen, Sac Aero Flying Club, Inc., represented by Montanari, Garry L, Wenig, Wesley S., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateApril 17, 2018 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial566 days |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time556 days |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept
Date: October 25, 2018Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 17, 2018Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: January 15, 2019Answer
Date: November 30, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: October 30, 2018ADR Referral
Date: August 16, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: August 16, 2018Request to Enter Default
Date: July 20, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 22, 2018Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: September 13, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: August 16, 2018Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee)
Date: January 10, 2019Complaint
Date: April 17, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 17, 2018Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: May 08, 2018Proof of Service on CORPORATION, LLC, etc.
Date: June 27, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: January 10, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 10, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: January 15, 2019Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: January 15, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 15, 2019Motion
Date: January 15, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 10, 2019Proof of Service by
Date: January 10, 2019Answer
Date: April 15, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 15, 2019Order
Date: February 27, 2019Complaint in Intervention
Date: February 21, 2019Statement
Date: February 07, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: February 21, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 23, 2020Discovery Conference
Date: May 28, 2020Notice
Date: April 01, 2020Order
Date: March 16, 2020Further Proceedings
Date: April 28, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: March 13, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: March 12, 2020Order
Date: April 22, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 22, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 04, 2021Motion for Discovery
Date: February 26, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: February 11, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 04, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 11, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: February 11, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: July 19, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Ex Parte Opposition
Date: January 03, 2020Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: July 19, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Motion
Date: December 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Motion
Date: December 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: December 20, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: November 22, 2019Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Hearing re
Date: December 14, 2020Jury Trial
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 09, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 04, 2019Defendant's Brief re:
Date: April 05, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 02, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 02, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: May 08, 2020Ex Parte Order
Date: July 24, 2019Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19
Date: April 06, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: July 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 19, 2019Order
Date: March 10, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 19, 2019Declaration
Date: March 06, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: February 27, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 19, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 11, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 11, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Order
Date: January 03, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: December 20, 2019Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: November 22, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 21, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 01, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Supplemental
Date: March 22, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 05, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 02, 2021Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: November 22, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 14, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2020Motion In Limine
Date: March 02, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: October 25, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 26, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: October 10, 2019Jury Trial
Date: March 30, 2020Order
Date: March 13, 2020Motion In Limine
Date: February 26, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: March 06, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 02, 2019Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Notice
Date: September 20, 2019Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 19, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 11, 2020Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 17, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: December 17, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: December 17, 2020Statement
Date: February 01, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: December 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: December 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 13, 2020Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: November 22, 2019Jury Trial
Date: November 06, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: March 10, 2020Motion for Order
Date: February 26, 2020Jury Trial
Date: November 04, 2019Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: February 26, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 04, 2019Objections to Evidence
Date: October 02, 2019Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: January 03, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: January 03, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: January 03, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: September 23, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: January 03, 2020Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: March 05, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: October 18, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: October 18, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 18, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 18, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 02, 2019Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: September 23, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 23, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Errata
Date: September 23, 201993298Joint00ece8
Date: March 06, 2024Trujillo_Proposed_Order_CCP_166_1_02_16_2024
Date: February 16, 2024Trujillo_Cover_letter_re_CCP_166_1_02_15_2024
Date: February 16, 202491902Defen004275
Date: February 13, 2024Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Furt_Decision_02_12_2024
Date: February 13, 2024Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Furt_MSS_Decl_02_12_2024
Date: February 13, 202490721Defen00f3f1
Date: January 25, 2024Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Obje_tatement_of_Decision
Date: January 19, 2024Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Obje_of_Decision_MSS_Decl
Date: January 19, 2024Objection
Date: April 08, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: April 12, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 19, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: April 05, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 05, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: March 29, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 29, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 21, 2022Pretrial Conference
Date: January 31, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: January 20, 2022Supplemental
Date: January 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 20, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: January 05, 2022Demurrer to
Date: January 20, 2022Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee)
Date: January 10, 2022Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: December 14, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 07, 2022Non-Opposition to
Date: December 07, 2021Supplemental
Date: January 07, 2022Order
Date: January 03, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 04, 2022Order Denying
Date: January 05, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: September 24, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 28, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2021Conference
Date: July 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 01, 2018Motion In Limine
Date: March 02, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 02, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 28, 2020Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 11, 2020Challenge against Judicial Officer sent to Department
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: April 07, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: March 20, 2020Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee)
Date: March 05, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 19, 2020Jury Trial
Date: February 10, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: January 03, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 22, 2019Request to Vacate Hearing Received
Date: November 12, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: October 02, 2019First Amended Complaint
Date: March 22, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: March 21, 2019Order
Date: April 21, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 08, 2021Pretrial hearing
Date: March 08, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: March 02, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 26, 2021Order
Date: February 24, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 18, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: February 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Court Hearing
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Hearing re
Date: October 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 14, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 16, 2020p_suppl_brief_election_1
Date: January 08, 2022p_supp_brief_election_rjn_1
Date: January 08, 2022p_answer_amended_2a
Date: January 10, 2022Demurrer_to_2nd_Amd_Answer
Date: January 21, 2022Demurrer_to_2nd_Amd_Answer_MSS_Dec
Date: January 21, 2022Demurrer_to_2nd_Amd_Answer_RJN
Date: January 21, 2022PFs_supp_brief_re_electi_burden_of_proof_RJN
Date: January 22, 2022PFs_supp_brief_re_election_and_burden_of_proof
Date: January 22, 2022p_demurrer_sac_opposition_rjn_1
Date: March 30, 2022p_demurrer_sac_opposition_
Date: March 30, 2022Trujillo_Demurrer_to_2nd_Amnded_Ans_Reply
Date: April 05, 2022Trujillo_Demurrer_to_2nd_ed_Ans_Reply_MSS_Dec
Date: April 05, 2022p_demurrer_sac_defs_obj_reply_1
Date: April 08, 2022p_pltf_demurrer_ruling_1
Date: April 15, 202259810Joint01cefc
Date: July 01, 202259810Joint021d7c
Date: July 01, 2022Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Tria_Estoppel_06_30_2022
Date: July 01, 2022Trujillo_MIL_No_2_Eviden__Results_06_30_2022_2
Date: July 01, 202259810Defen002307
Date: July 01, 2022Trujillo_MIL_No_1_Testim_Dietrich_06_30_2022
Date: July 01, 202259873Oppos00af14
Date: July 02, 202259873Oppos01ae74
Date: July 02, 202259922Defen008705
Date: July 05, 202287614Propo0026e3
Date: December 01, 202387487Propo00ffad
Date: November 30, 2023Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Post_7_Estoppel_07_28_22_2
Date: July 29, 202261089Defen00a296
Date: July 28, 2022Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Requ_Decision_2002_08_22
Date: August 23, 2022Trujillo_Stipulation_and_of_Trial_2022_04_15
Date: August 23, 202262358Defen00b520
Date: August 23, 202262682Defen00b3d5
Date: August 29, 2022Trujillo_Plaintiffs_Oppo_Decision_2022_08_29
Date: August 29, 202263867Joint00a613
Date: September 23, 202267440Joint000639
Date: December 07, 202268523Notic00c88d
Date: December 29, 202268523Reque02ba74
Date: December 29, 202269170Amend00529b
Date: January 12, 2023Stipulation_and_Prop_Ord_Reschedule_Ds_MIL_13
Date: January 18, 2023Ps_Opp_to_Ds_MIL_13_Excl_Nuisance_Damages_RJN
Date: February 01, 2023Ps_Opp_to_Ds_MIL_13_Excl_ent_Nuisance_Damages
Date: February 01, 202370859Memor0097fe
Date: February 14, 202372069Stipu0079d0
Date: March 08, 2023Ds_MIL_13_Exclude_Perman_sed_Order_2023_04_27
Date: April 27, 2023Ds_MIL_13_Exclude_Perman_der_2023_04_27_COVER
Date: April 27, 202386133Defen00c844
Date: November 06, 202386040Defen0020d7
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference STATUS OF WRIT Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | 93298Joint00ece8 | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference CONTINUED TO 6/11/2024 at 9:30 AM Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference CONTINUED TO 6/11/2024 at 9:30 AM |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Joint Brief PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL PLAN Joint Brief PROPOSED JOINT TRIAL PLAN |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing RE: DENIED ORDER RECOMMENDING IMMEDIATE REVIEW OF STATEMENT OF DECISION FOR PHA Affidavit of Mailing RE: DENIED ORDER RECOMMENDING IMMEDIATE REVIEW OF STATEMENT OF DECISION FOR PHASE 2 TRIAL UPON PETITION FOR EXTRAORDINARY WRIT |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Denying ORDER RECOMMENDING IMMEDIATE REVIEW OF STATEMENT OF DECISION FOR PHASE 2 TRIAL UPONPE Order Denying ORDER RECOMMENDING IMMEDIATE REVIEW OF STATEMENT OF DECISION FOR PHASE 2 TRIAL UPON PETITION FOR EXTRAORDINARY WRIT |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Trujillo_Proposed_Order_CCP_166_1_02_16_2024 | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Trujillo_Cover_letter_re_CCP_166_1_02_15_2024 | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Type: ORDER DENYING FURTHER REQUEST FOR A STATEMENT OF DECISIONSigned by: NANCY L. FINEMANDa Order Type: ORDER DENYING FURTHER REQUEST FOR A STATEMENT OF DECISION Signed by: NANCY L. FINEMAN Date Signed: 2/14/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.