Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nguyen, Khai, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Alvarez, Alejandro, against Alex Birman, M.D, Ct Corp System, Florida United Radiology, Georges Edouard, M.D, Georges Edouard, M.D., P.A, (total of 10) See All represented by Groves, Asa B, Iii, Strauss, Marci L, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2014 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a civil action for damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiff, Khai Nguyen, is suing multiple defendants, including Alex Birman, M.D., Sunlife OB/GYN Services of Ft. Lauderdale, P.A., Georges Edouard, M.D., Georges Edouard, M.D., P...
Request for Admissions
Date: July 22, 2014Request to Produce
Date: July 22, 2014Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 22, 2014Request to Produce
Date: July 22, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: July 22, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: July 22, 2014Request to Produce
Date: July 22, 2014Answer to Interrogs
Date: December 01, 2014Response to Motion to Compel
Date: October 20, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: December 01, 2014Motion to Compel
Date: July 24, 2015Expert Witness List
Date: July 12, 2016Order
Date: December 04, 2014Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: August 29, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: July 17, 2015Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 23, 2014Objection
Date: October 23, 2014Notice of Absence from Jurisdiction
Date: January 13, 2016Notice
Date: September 29, 2016Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: August 05, 2016Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 05, 2015Notice of Filing
Date: October 20, 2015Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: May 22, 2015Amended Complaint
Date: May 11, 2015Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: February 12, 2015Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 07, 2014Request for Copies
Date: July 15, 2016Request for Copies
Date: April 27, 2016Amended
Date: November 02, 2016Notice
Date: January 28, 2015Response to Request for Copies
Date: January 14, 2015Response to Request to Produce
Date: September 30, 2016Amended
Date: August 31, 2016Request to Produce
Date: January 26, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: July 21, 2016Request to Produce
Date: November 16, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 11, 2015Request for Copies
Date: October 03, 2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief
Date: July 31, 2015Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 13, 2015Request for Copies
Date: January 29, 2016Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: March 20, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: August 08, 2016Response to Request for Copies
Date: July 26, 2016Motion for Mediation
Date: July 24, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: August 12, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: January 28, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 05, 2015Request to Produce
Date: August 12, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: September 08, 2014Notice
Date: September 06, 2016Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2015Request to Produce
Date: July 22, 2014Response to Motion
Date: March 23, 2015Objection to Interrogatories
Date: December 01, 2014Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 07, 2014Request for Production
Date: September 22, 2014Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 07, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: January 13, 2015Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 07, 2016Response
Date: January 30, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: February 13, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 07, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: July 28, 2016Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 31, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: August 08, 2016Notice
Date: January 28, 2015Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 05, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: August 12, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 02, 2016Answer to Interrogs
Date: October 23, 2014Order
Date: March 26, 2015Request for Copies
Date: January 07, 2015Expert Witness List
Date: July 12, 2016Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: November 04, 2014Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 23, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 08, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: July 27, 2016Response to Request for Copies
Date: February 26, 2016Notice of Withdrawal
Date: September 04, 2015Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: June 06, 2016Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 10, 2016Request for Copies
Date: August 08, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 05, 2015Interrogatories
Date: September 22, 2014Request to Produce
Date: August 12, 2014Order
Date: March 27, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 11, 2015Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2015Order Denying Motion
Date: October 21, 2015Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 23, 2014Request for Production
Date: June 09, 2016Motion
Date: November 30, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 12, 2016Request to Produce
Date: January 13, 2015Notice of Mediation
Date: March 28, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: March 09, 2017Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 08, 2017Order on Motion to Compel
Date: October 21, 2015Amended Answer
Date: October 30, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: April 15, 2016Amended Motion
Date: May 23, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: April 07, 2015Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: July 21, 2015Response to Motion to Compel
Date: October 16, 2015Request for Production
Date: November 04, 2014Answer to Interrogs
Date: January 07, 2015Request for Admissions
Date: January 13, 2015Notice of Filing
Date: September 08, 2014Request to Produce
Date: August 12, 2014Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 23, 2014Amended
Date: October 27, 2014Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: May 22, 2015Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: November 03, 2017Request to Produce
Date: June 02, 2017Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 09, 2017Request to Produce
Date: May 26, 2017Request to Produce
Date: May 17, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 30, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 08, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: May 03, 2018Notice
Date: October 23, 2018Response to Motion
Date: June 22, 2018Response
Date: June 25, 2018Motion for New Trial
Date: September 19, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 11, 2019Request for Copies
Date: February 14, 2017Objection
Date: July 16, 2019Motion to Shorten Time
Date: February 13, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: August 12, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 29, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: September 29, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: March 29, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 18, 2019Objection
Date: July 20, 2017Report of Court Ordered Mediation
Date: April 03, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 02, 2019Motion
Date: August 22, 2019Notice
Date: March 30, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: August 12, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: July 30, 2019Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: March 29, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: April 05, 2019Response to Motion
Date: January 11, 2017Notice
Date: February 23, 2017Motion for New Trial
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 13, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: July 05, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 26, 2017Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: May 15, 2018Agreed Order
Date: June 21, 2019Request for Copies
Date: February 14, 2017Memorandum of Law
Date: August 23, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: August 12, 2019Request to Produce
Date: March 14, 2017Request for Copies
Date: August 01, 2019Amended Motion
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: May 16, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: December 19, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 29, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: August 24, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 10, 2017Request for Production
Date: February 13, 2017Order on Motion to Compel
Date: August 12, 2019Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: June 21, 2019Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: June 21, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: October 11, 2017Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Order
Date: August 26, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 01, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: March 15, 2017Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: June 27, 2019Response
Date: March 15, 2017Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: March 29, 2017Motion to Shorten Time
Date: February 24, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: March 14, 2017Response to Motion
Date: October 04, 2019Notice
Date: March 20, 2017Motion to Shorten Time
Date: March 14, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 21, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: April 10, 2017Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: October 02, 2017Memo
Date: August 13, 2019Memo
Date: August 06, 2019Agreed Order
Date: February 27, 2017Response to Request for Copies
Date: February 01, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: April 19, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: May 16, 2018Motion
Date: September 03, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 13, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 26, 2017Response to Motion
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Adoption
Date: May 16, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 15, 2017Mediation Report
Date: February 21, 2017Response to Motion
Date: January 10, 2017Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 13, 2017Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 10, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: April 19, 2019Request for Production
Date: October 28, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 14, 2019Motion
Date: September 05, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: June 19, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: February 17, 2017Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 28, 2019Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: April 22, 2019Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: January 30, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: January 25, 2017Response to Motion
Date: August 07, 2019Order
Date: October 31, 2019Motion
Date: August 23, 2018Motion for Approval
Date: September 05, 2017Motion to Produce
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 02, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: January 16, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 14, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: August 14, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: February 28, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: March 30, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 14, 2017Memorandum in Support
Date: November 01, 2019Appeal Record Completed
Date: April 16, 2020Amended
Date: February 12, 20204th DCA Order
Date: August 03, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: January 29, 2020Response to Motion
Date: November 04, 20194th DCA Order
Date: August 03, 2020Notice of Appeal
Date: February 25, 2020Order
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 20, 2018Supplemental Witness List
Date: August 09, 2017Order On Motion to Strike
Date: August 09, 2017Order Resetting
Date: August 11, 2017Request for Production
Date: November 16, 2016Request to Produce
Date: June 30, 2016Notice of Mediation
Date: March 07, 2016Response to Request for Copies
Date: June 03, 2015Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: June 05, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: September 24, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: December 14, 2015Motion
Date: February 12, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: February 11, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 13, 2015Objection to Notice to Produce
Date: January 16, 2015Agreed Order
Date: October 21, 2014Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 01, 2014Motion to Compel
Date: December 01, 2014Agreed Order
Date: December 04, 2014Answer to Interrogs
Date: December 29, 2014Answer to Complaint
Date: September 03, 2014Answer to Interrogs
Date: September 05, 2014Request for Production
Date: April 20, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: August 18, 2019Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: June 05, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 22, 2014Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: December 06, 2016Request to Produce
Date: July 22, 2014Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 06, 2014Response to Request for Copies
Date: May 12, 2015Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: November 23, 2016Order Deferring
Date: July 11, 2016Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: October 07, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 27, 2014Request for Production
Date: August 02, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 10, 2015Notice of Absence from Jurisdiction
Date: February 05, 2015Request for Production of Documents
Date: October 07, 2014Motion for Sanctions
Date: December 23, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: January 26, 2015Motion to Compel Production
Date: October 28, 2016Objection to Request to Produce
Date: December 01, 2014Request for Copies
Date: October 28, 2016Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: March 18, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: March 18, 2015Request for Copies
Date: March 17, 2015Amended
Date: August 12, 2016Request for Examination
Date: August 03, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: August 12, 2014Motion to Compel
Date: June 24, 2016Expert Witness List
Date: December 07, 2016Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 22, 2014Request for Examination
Date: December 29, 2016Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 11, 2014Request for Copies
Date: September 13, 2016Request for Copies
Date: May 12, 2015Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 23, 2014Order Granting
Date: July 11, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: November 06, 2014Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: October 28, 2014Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 31, 2014Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 04, 2016Ex Parte Motion
Date: April 12, 2016Motion for Continuance
Date: July 22, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: December 08, 2016Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: October 07, 2014Motion for Sanctions
Date: December 08, 2016Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: May 11, 2015Response to Request for Copies
Date: May 11, 2015Response to Request for Copies
Date: April 16, 2015Order Deferring
Date: July 11, 2016Response to Request for Copies
Date: June 05, 2015Notice
Date: December 15, 2015Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: May 21, 2015Response to Request for Copies
Date: May 21, 2015Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: May 21, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: December 01, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: September 19, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: July 14, 2016Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 24, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 15, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 05, 2014Request to Produce
Date: January 13, 2015Order
Date: August 16, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: July 25, 2016Answer to Interrogs
Date: November 21, 2014Response
Date: July 24, 2015Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: October 07, 2014Response to Request to Produce
Date: September 05, 2014Memorandum in Support
Date: March 09, 2015Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: November 08, 2016Motion for Continuance
Date: December 05, 2016Amended Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 26, 2014Request for Production
Date: December 16, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 20, 2016Request for Production
Date: January 13, 2015Notice
Date: January 28, 2015Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 05, 2015Response to Motion
Date: January 05, 2015Response
Date: September 01, 2015Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 07, 2014Order
Date: February 11, 2015Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 19, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: July 15, 2016Request for Copies
Date: January 12, 2016Notice
Date: August 05, 2016Request for Copies
Date: August 22, 2016Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 15, 2016Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: June 23, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 31, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: March 10, 2015Motion
Date: December 08, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: July 22, 2014Amended Motion
Date: June 30, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: July 22, 2014Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: April 27, 2018Supplemental File
Date: April 26, 2018Response
Date: February 02, 2017Motion for Entry of Judgment
Date: September 06, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: September 06, 2019Motion for Final Judgment
Date: September 06, 2019Motion
Date: September 19, 2019Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: June 19, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: August 16, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: May 08, 2017Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: February 21, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 24, 2019Response to Motion
Date: January 11, 2017Motion
Date: March 07, 2017Motion in Limine
Date: April 01, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: June 26, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: February 22, 2017Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 21, 2018Order
Date: July 08, 2019Order
Date: November 09, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: January 04, 2017Order Case Exhibits in Courtroom Overnight
Date: August 16, 2019Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: February 26, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 11, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: August 11, 2019Request to Produce
Date: March 09, 2017Request to Produce
Date: October 26, 2017Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: October 23, 2017Motion for Continuance
Date: July 09, 2019Motion
Date: June 01, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 07, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 21, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: April 29, 2015Order Resetting
Date: November 09, 2017Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: March 26, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Availability
Date: April 16, 2019Order Denying Motion
Date: January 29, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: February 24, 2016Response to Motion
Date: June 24, 2016Request for Copies
Date: May 20, 2015Response to Motion to Compel
Date: December 10, 2014Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: December 23, 2014Notice
Date: January 28, 2015Notice
Date: January 28, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: March 17, 2015Request for Admissions
Date: August 12, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 02, 2017Motion for Sanctions
Date: October 11, 20174th DCA Order
Date: August 10, 2020Notice
Date: February 12, 2020Motion to Withdraw
Date: November 06, 2019Notice of Cross Appeal
Date: March 11, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: February 05, 2020Mediation Report
Date: February 24, 2020Order
Date: January 29, 2020Motion to Compel Production
Date: October 31, 2019Response to Motion to Compel
Date: February 06, 2020Order
Date: November 15, 20194th DCA Order
Date: March 13, 2020Order Denying Motion for Judgment
Date: November 15, 2019Stipulation
Date: March 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Transmitted to 4DCA SUPPLEMENT 4D20-549/ KH |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of: | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Record Completed 4D20-549 |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D20-549 / KLH - ORDERED that appellant's August 3, 2020 "agreed motion for leave to file a brief inexcess of page limit" is granted in part, and appellant may serve an initial brief up to sixty (60)pages |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D20-0549 / KLH - ORDERED that appellant's August 3, 2020 motion to supplement the record and toll tme to serve initial brief is granted. The material requested in the motion shall be included in therecord on appeal. The clerk of the lower tribunal shall prepare and file the supplemental material n this court within twenty (20) days from the date of this order. Appellant shall monitor the supplmentation process; further, ORDERED that the time for filing appellant's initial brief is tolled unil seven (7) days after the supplemental record is received |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D20-549; ORDERED that appellant's August 3, 2020 motion to supplement the record and toll time toserve initial brief is granted. / KHsted in the motion shall be included in |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change /Defendant PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL, L.P., d/b/a PLANTATION GENERAL HOSPITAL |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Completed 4D20-549- TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.