Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Schmid, Astrid, Schmid, Frear Stephen, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Schmid, Frear Stephen, against County Of Sonoma, Two Rock Fire Dept, represented by Adams, William L, Sanders, Brian Murray, Borba, John E, King, Michael Alcock, Minioza, Joseph Jonathan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Pardo, Oscar A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePardo, Oscar A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2020 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
objection to proposed judgment
Date: April 02, 2024Objection Plf Closing Brief
Date: January 29, 2024Schmid post trial brief final
Date: January 24, 2024COS Closing Brief 1.24.24 Final
Date: January 24, 202401.17.24 - POS
Date: January 17, 2024trial brief w pos
Date: January 05, 2024Proof of Service Trial Docs
Date: January 05, 20247-Decl ISO COS MIL
Date: January 05, 20246-COS MIL no.2 of 2
Date: January 05, 20245-COS MIL no1
Date: January 05, 20244-COS Exhibit List final
Date: January 05, 202420240105121742513
Date: January 05, 20242-Joint Witness List
Date: January 05, 20241-COS Trial Brief 2024 final
Date: January 05, 202453443TRFDS0089aa
Date: February 15, 202253424ABAND00e5a5
Date: February 14, 2022march 24 cmc
Date: March 07, 20222022 03-03 TRVFD Substition of Atty (EF)
Date: March 07, 20223.24.22-COS CMC Statement
Date: March 07, 2022CMS
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RECORD - Revised
Date: March 20, 20222022 05-2022 POS - JOINDER MTN TO Vacate
Date: May 06, 2022Dec MAK ISO Motion Vacate Trial.mak
Date: May 06, 2022P&As Motion Vacate Trial Consolidate. Rv2
Date: May 06, 2022Notice Motion Vacate Trial Consolidate.Rv1
Date: May 06, 2022POS
Date: May 06, 2022Decl MAK ISO Ex parte Advance
Date: June 10, 2022WLA Decl ISO Ex Parte Advance
Date: June 10, 2022POS
Date: June 10, 2022MPA ISO Ex parte Advance
Date: June 10, 2022Notice of Order
Date: June 14, 2022POS Schmid v. TRFD - To File
Date: July 15, 2022opp to mo to consolidate - to file
Date: July 15, 202212.4.23 COS MAK Dec Opposition
Date: December 08, 2023reply in support of mo to sever
Date: December 08, 2023Opposition-Motion-Bifurcate-Sever
Date: December 05, 202312.4.23 COS Opposition Motion Bifurcate
Date: December 04, 202312.4.23 POS
Date: December 04, 2023Schmid v TRS- NOA - 20220222 - tofile r2
Date: February 23, 2022Reply ISO Vacate and Consolidate FINAL
Date: July 20, 2022Reply POS
Date: July 20, 2022WLA Decl in support of Reply for Joint Motion to Consolidaste 7-19-22 Final
Date: July 19, 2022POS -REPLY MTN TO Vacate
Date: July 19, 2022POS Murray-Filed Mtn
Date: July 19, 2022Reply Dec MAK Motion Vacate .mak
Date: July 20, 20222022 07-28 Ntc of Posting Jury Fee Deposit
Date: August 08, 20222022 08-08 NoE of Order After Hearing on Motion to Vacate-Consolidate
Date: August 08, 2022POS Mtn to Preclude S Schmid
Date: September 02, 20222022 09-02 TRVFD Motion to Preclude Testimonty at Trial of Plaintiff Astrid Schmid and for sanctions
Date: September 02, 2022POS Mtn to Preclude A Schmid
Date: September 02, 20222022 09-02 WLA Dec iso Mtn Preclude Testimonty at Trial of Plaintiff Astrid Schmid and sanctions
Date: September 02, 20222022 08-23 TRVFD First Amended Answer to Complaint Consolidated Case No SCV-270339
Date: September 09, 20222022 09-12 Schmid v. TRVFD Subst of Atty for PC
Date: September 13, 20222022 09-23 Ex Parte App to shorten time on Mtns to Preclude testimony (Frear)
Date: September 26, 20222022 09-23 DEC of WLA iso Ex Parte App to shorten time on Mtns to Preclude testimony (Frear)
Date: September 26, 2022AMND POS Ex Parte S Schmid
Date: September 26, 20222022 09-23 Ex Parte App to shorten time on Mtns to Preclude testimony (Astrid)
Date: September 26, 2022AMND POS Ex Parte A Schmid
Date: September 26, 20222022 09-23 DEC of WLA iso Ex Parte App to shorten time on Mtns to Preclude testimony (Astrid)
Date: September 26, 20222022 09-23 Proposed Order re Ex Parte App to shorten time on Mtns to Preclude testimony (Astrid)
Date: September 26, 20222022 09-23 Proposed Order re Ex Parte App to shorten time on Mtns to Preclude testimony (Frear)
Date: September 26, 20222022 09-27 NoE of Order after Ex Parte (S Schmid)
Date: September 28, 20222022 09-27 NoE of Order after Ex Parte (A Schmid)
Date: September 28, 20222022 10-03 Oppo to Plaintiffs Ex Parte App compel continued depo of Paul Martin (final)
Date: October 03, 2022POS OPP TO PLTFS Ex Parte re Martin depo
Date: October 03, 20222022 10-03 Oppo to Plaintiffs Ex Parte App re TFVFD written discovery responses 2 (final)
Date: October 03, 2022opp to mo 399
Date: October 04, 20222022 10-7 WLA dec iso Reply to Mtn to Preclude (S Schmid)
Date: October 07, 20222022 10-7 WLA dec iso Reply to Mtn to Preclude (A Schmid)
Date: October 07, 20222022 10-07 REPLY iso Mtn to Preclude (S Schmid)
Date: October 07, 20222022 10-07 REPLY iso Mtn to Preclude (A Schmid)
Date: October 07, 2022POS REPLY Mtn to Preclude S Schmid
Date: October 07, 2022POS REPLY Mtn to Preclude A Schmid
Date: October 07, 20222022 10-11 Oppo to Plaintiffs MTC contd depo of Paul Martin (final)
Date: October 11, 20222022 10-11 DEC of WLA iso Oppo to Pltfs MTC contd depo of Paul Martin (final)
Date: October 11, 2022POS OPP TO PLTFS mtc cont depo of Martin
Date: October 11, 20222022 10-11 Stip re RPD 1 (No 7 and 8)
Date: October 11, 202210.28.22 Signed Trial Orders
Date: October 28, 2022Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing on 10-14-2022
Date: October 29, 2022FSS trial brief agaiinst the county to file
Date: November 01, 2022FSS - TRIAL BRIEF. - TO FIL
Date: November 01, 2022TRVFD Trial Brief Final
Date: November 01, 2022Special Jury Voir Dire Questions
Date: November 01, 2022COS Trial Brief
Date: November 01, 2022TRVFD MIL 1 OF 3 re TRVFD NAME
Date: November 01, 2022Defts Statement Case executed
Date: November 01, 2022TRVFD Prosposed Jury Instructions rev 10-31-22 at 0910
Date: November 01, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 01, 2022Dec ISO COS MIL
Date: November 01, 2022COS Exhibit List_Part1
Date: November 01, 2022COS Exhibit List_Part2
Date: November 01, 2022Joint Witness List
Date: November 01, 2022COS Oppo Mtn to Amend MAK Dec
Date: November 03, 2022TRFVD opposition to Plaintiffs' Pretrial Motion (final)
Date: November 03, 2022COS Oppo Mtn to Amend
Date: November 03, 2022COS Oppo Mtn to Amend POS
Date: November 03, 2022Proof of Service Mtn Enforce
Date: January 17, 2023DEC Keefer ISO Enforce Settlement
Date: January 17, 2023Dec MAK ISO Enforce Settlement
Date: January 17, 2023Points and Auth ISO Mtn Enforce
Date: January 17, 2023Notice Motion Enforce Settlement
Date: January 17, 20232023 02-09 CMC Statement (final)
Date: January 25, 20232.9.23 COS CMC Statement
Date: January 25, 2023POS Opp
Date: January 27, 2023WLA Dec iso OPP to Demurrer (final)
Date: January 27, 2023TRFVD Opposition to Schmid Demurrer and Motion to Strike (final)
Date: January 27, 2023Proof of Service Mtn Enforce EF
Date: February 07, 2023TRVFD Motion to Compel depo of Plaintiff Astrid Schmid (final)
Date: February 09, 2023POS Astrid MTC
Date: February 09, 2023Sep Stmt is MTC Astrid Depo (final)
Date: February 09, 2023WLA DEC iso MTC depo of Plaintiff Astrid Schmid (final)
Date: February 09, 2023WLA DEC iso MTC depo of Plaintiff Frear Schmid (final)
Date: February 11, 2023Sep Stmt is MTC Frear Stephen Schmid Depo (final)
Date: February 11, 2023TRVFD MTC Cont'd Depo of Frear Schmid (final)
Date: February 11, 2023POS Frear Stephen Schmid MTC
Date: February 11, 20232023 02-27 Mtn to Enforce (final)
Date: February 27, 20232023 02-27 WLA DEC iso Mtn to Enforce (final)
Date: February 27, 20232023 02-27 POS Joinder Mtn to Enforce
Date: February 27, 20232023 03-08 Notice of Entry of Order on Pltfs Demurrer
Date: March 08, 20232023 03-14 ThompsonGas Joinder Mtn to Enforce (Final)
Date: March 16, 2023FSS BRIEF TO FILE r2
Date: March 24, 2023Reply PAs Motion Enforce
Date: March 29, 2023FSS 1.002 - objections final to serve
Date: March 30, 20232023 03-28 REPLY ISO JOINDER TO MTN TO ENFORCE
Date: March 28, 20232023 03-28 POS Reply iso Joinder Mtn to Enforce
Date: March 28, 20232023 03-28 WLA DEC re REPLY ISO JOINDER TO MTN TO ENFORCE
Date: March 28, 2023Order Re Mtn to Enforce
Date: April 18, 2023Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 20, 2023sep statements final
Date: April 28, 2023opp to mo to compel final with pos to serve
Date: April 28, 2023Final WLA dec iso Reply to Mtn to Compel (A Schmid)
Date: May 03, 2023Final Version - WLA dec iso Reply to Mtn to Compel (S Schmid)
Date: May 03, 2023POS REPLY MTC Frear Stephen Schmid
Date: May 03, 2023Final Version -- REPLY iso Mtn to Compel (A Schmid)
Date: May 03, 2023Final -- REPLY iso Mtn to Compel (Frear Schmid)
Date: May 03, 2023POS REPLY MTC Astrid Schmid
Date: May 03, 2023PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS.
Date: May 08, 2023NoE Order on Motion to Compel
Date: May 25, 20232023 06-06 Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 06, 20232022 06-05 DEC of WLA iso EX PARTE to stay or vacate-Final
Date: June 05, 20232022 06-05 Ex Parte app to stay or vacate Preliminary Injunction-Final
Date: June 05, 2023[PROPOSED] ORDER on Ex Parte
Date: June 05, 20232023 06-05 POS Ex Parte
Date: June 05, 2023costs bill on appeal 547
Date: July 21, 2023ex parte trfd osc final for filing complete
Date: August 07, 20232023 08-07 OPP-DEC to PLTF Ex Parte (final)
Date: August 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ex parte order osc 559
Date: August 08, 20232023 08-25 TRVFD Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction-FINAL
Date: August 25, 20232023 08-25 POS Resp ot 9-8-23 OSC re contempt
Date: August 25, 20232023 08-25 WLA dec iso Two Rock Fire Motion to Dissolve PI (FINAL)
Date: August 25, 20232023 08-25 POS Mtn to Dissolve PI
Date: August 25, 2023WLA dec iso Two Rock Fire Response to OSC re Contempt (FINAL)
Date: August 25, 2023TRVFD response to 9-8-23 OSC re contempt (FINAL)
Date: August 25, 2023Ex Parte App re OSC and Mtn to Dissolve
Date: August 28, 20232023 08-27 Ex Parte
Date: August 28, 2023PL OPP FINAL TO FILE
Date: August 28, 2023PROPOSED ORDER on TRVFD Ex Parte 2023 08-28
Date: August 28, 20232023 08-29 NoE Order after Ex Parte
Date: August 29, 2023TRVFD Sub of Attorney (SCV266225)
Date: September 15, 2023CMC Statement 10-26-23
Date: October 13, 2023COS MIL #2 OF 2
Date: November 01, 2022COS MIL #1 OF 2
Date: November 01, 2022TRVFD MIL 2 of 3 re TRFVD Preclude evidence of diminution of value (Final - WLA 11-1-22)
Date: November 01, 2022TRFVD Joinder in County of Sonoma MIL 1 and 2 .(Final - WLA 10-31-22)
Date: November 01, 2022order denying diss of pi 588
Date: November 01, 2023motion to sever bifurcate final for filing
Date: November 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 10 day JT per 3/22 minutes Judge: Pardo, Oscar A |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | objection to proposed judgment | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objections Filed objection to proposed judgment |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Per 3/12 Order Judge: Pardo, Oscar A |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Statement of Decision PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION AND JUDGMENT OF THE COURT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1590(F). |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed Objection to Plaintiffs Closing Brief |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection Plf Closing Brief | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief plaintiffs' post trial brief |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Brief Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.