Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Leevers Garrett D., Network Deposition Services Inc., Yossefi Nuriel, Yossefi Uriel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Friedman Michael Elliot, Friedman Steven R., Friedman Steven Richard, Hart William R., against Network Deposition Services Inc., Yossefi Nuriel, Yossefi Uriel, represented by Behle Jr Roger N, Fisher Howard S. Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management342 days |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions314 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons
Date: January 19, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 06, 2018Summons
Date: April 06, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: First Amended Complaint
Date: April 06, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: April 18, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order
Date: April 18, 2018Other - - Other - Civil Deposit
Date: April 18, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 04, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: May 07, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike
Date: May 07, 2018Other - - Other - Civil Deposit
Date: May 07, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application
Date: May 09, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: May 09, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition
Date: May 09, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: May 09, 2018Summons
Date: May 16, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Second Amended Complaint
Date: May 16, 2018Other - - Other - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing
Date: May 24, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 24, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 05, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike
Date: June 08, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 14, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons
Date: June 20, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment -
Date: July 17, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 17, 2018Separate Statement -
Date: July 31, 2018Declaration - Of Michael E. Friedman
Date: July 31, 2018Motion to Compel - Further Responses
Date: July 31, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment -
Date: August 02, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice
Date: August 06, 2018Notice - Of Taking Off Calendar
Date: August 06, 2018Opposition - To Motion to Strike
Date: August 08, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition
Date: August 08, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply
Date: August 14, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Ruling -
Date: August 31, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: September 10, 2018Notice - of Demurrer
Date: September 10, 2018Answer -
Date: September 27, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition
Date: October 03, 2018Opposition - To Untimely Demurrer
Date: October 03, 2018Reply - to plaintiff's opposition to network's demurrer
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Defendant's (Network Deposition Services, Inc.) De...)
Date: October 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-10-17 00:00:00
Date: October 17, 2018Complaint - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order For the Deposition Sub...)
Date: December 04, 2018Separate Statement
Date: December 21, 2018Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: December 21, 2018Summons - Summons on Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: December 24, 2018Opposition - Opposition motion to compel for production of documents
Date: December 31, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 10, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 16, 2019Order - Order PROPOSED ORDER
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 11, 2019Objection - Objection NDSI's Objection to Garrett Leevers Notice of Ruling on Motion to Compel
Date: February 13, 2019Notice - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF OTHER ORDER
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 20, 2019Order - Order PROPOSED ORDER - WORDPERFECT
Date: March 01, 2019Order - Order PROPOSED ORDER - LETTER TO OPPOSING COUNSEL 1-17-19
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: March 08, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: March 29, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: April 29, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 07, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: May 16, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: May 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 06, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 24, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 26, 2019Status Report
Date: August 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE IN MOTION HEARING DATE
Date: August 07, 2019Status Report
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO TH...)
Date: September 11, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2019Status Report
Date: October 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: October 29, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 01, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY ISO AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: December 17, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFS OPP TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL CORP COMPLIANCE
Date: January 09, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 23, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 28, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE MOTION
Date: February 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE MOTION)
Date: February 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: April 22, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 29, 2020Status Report
Date: July 14, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Motion - PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2019Response - RESPONSE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 08, 2020Status Report
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 11, 2020Status Report
Date: October 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: October 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); TRI...)
Date: November 03, 2020Answer
Date: December 03, 2020Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: December 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND ADVANCING MOTION ...)
Date: December 08, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (A) CLARIFICATION, OR IN ...)
Date: December 14, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 14, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF URIEL YOSSEFI
Date: December 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROGER N. BEHLE, JR
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRISH BOTOFF
Date: February 18, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NURIEL YOSSEFI
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF URIEL YOSSEFI
Date: February 18, 2021Brief - BRIEF DEFENDATS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 18, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: March 03, 2021Status Report
Date: March 04, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF URIEL YOSSEFI
Date: March 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF NURIEL YOSSEFI
Date: March 15, 2021Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: March 26, 2021Motion for Leave - MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: March 26, 2021Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER
Date: April 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRISH BOTOFF
Date: April 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 16, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2021
Date: April 16, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2021
Date: April 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 06, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 20, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 21, 2021Other - - OTHER - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AGAINST URIEL YOSSEFI
Date: June 04, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: June 07, 2021Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: June 18, 2021Status Report
Date: July 06, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: CONTEMPT)
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: August 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: CONTEMPT)
Date: August 06, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 06, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 17, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2021Complaint
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPP TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 01-09-20
Date: January 09, 2020Summons
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL FRIEDMAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO CONTINUE CMC )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit)
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order (TO CONTINUE CMC )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION RE FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Summons Filed (SUMMONS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint (summons issued )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CMC )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Other - (Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CMC )
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (AGAINST - URIEL YOSSEFI )
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CMC )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Statement - General
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (AGAINST - NURIEL YOSSEFI )
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Answer (TO PARTIALLY VERFIED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Defendant's (Network Deposition Services, Inc.) De...))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter: Defendant's Demurrer to the Secon...))
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Protective Order For the Deposition Sub...))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production, Set 1)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against Judge Lawrence Cho)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Protective ...))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Demurring Party ISO Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants Opp to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 01-09-20)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Opposition (Defs Opp to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Corp Compliance)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Compliance with ...))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Motion)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Motion))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice (Not of Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories set One)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Informal Discovery Conference and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Response (Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (ot First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Withdrawing Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Tri...))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO and Advancing Motion ...))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Objection (to Granting Ex Parte Application for Issuance of a Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Use Certified Shorthand Reporter)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Uriel Yossefi)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Brief (Defendats' evidentiary objections to and motion to strike)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF URIEL YOSSEFI)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (A) CLARIFICATION, OR IN ...))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Trish Botoff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Roger N. Behle, Jr)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Nuriel Yossefi)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to plaintiff's motion)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Order ([proposed] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS? MARCH 5, 2021 PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF GRANTING OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Nuriel Yossefi)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Uriel Yossefi)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to Intervene)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2021)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Motion for Order (Notice of motion and motion for an order)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Trish Botoff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2021)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES TO MAY 19, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO THOMAS LEEVERS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE IN ACTION)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Dates)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Setting a Deadline for Mediation or Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Permitting Network Deposition Ser...))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference RE: Contempt as to Uriel Yossefi will be se...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Other - Order to show cause re: contempt against Uriel Yossefi])
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO DISCHARGE ORDER TO SHOW CA...))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Service
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: RE: Contempt))
Date: August 06, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: RE: Contempt))
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Objection (NDSI's Objection to Garrett Leevers Notice of Ruling on Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER - LETTER TO OPPOSING COUNSEL 1-17-19)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF OTHER ORDER)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER - WORDPERFECT)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to Code of Civi...))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Demurrer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance With Cou...))
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Plaintiff's and Cross-Defendant's Amended Notice of Motion to Strike Portions of the Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance With Cou...))
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Declaration (Friedman Declaration in support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice ( of Change in Motion Hearing Date)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice ( of Change in Hearing Date for Motion by Defendant Network Deposition Services, Inc.)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses TO TH...))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (Defs-XCompl Opposition to Pl - X-Defs Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint; Decl of HSF)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Reply (Reply In Support of Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING ON CROSS- DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT.
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,210)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.