Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Hardy, Illya, Hardy, Johanna Barlund, Topline K9 Services, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ryther Law Group, Ryther Law Group, Llp, against Animal Emergency Clinic, Rios, Dvm, Grace, represented by Wallace, Brown & Schwartz, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed
Date: December 26, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 08, 2023Motion Filed
Date: June 19, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 07, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 11, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion re: filed
Date: January 10, 2024Notice Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 05, 2024Memorandum of Costs
Date: January 04, 2024Notice Filed
Date: January 09, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 07, 2023Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 01, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 16, 2021Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 01, 2021Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 01, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 29, 2023Motion for New Trial
Date: January 23, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: September 21, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: December 05, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 07, 2023Exhibits List Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: May 17, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 23, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 08, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 23, 2024Motion re:
Date: January 24, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 13, 2024Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: January 27, 2020Answer Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 05, 2024Objection Filed
Date: February 05, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 27, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: January 24, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 13, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Motion Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Notice Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Statement of Case Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: June 19, 2020Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 01, 2021Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 18, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 02, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 27, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 27, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: January 27, 2020Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: February 07, 2024Exhibits List Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Motion Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 11, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Conversion event
Date: July 27, 2020Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 13, 2024Notice Filed
Date: December 25, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: March 29, 2023Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: November 08, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: October 23, 2023Special Verdict filed.
Date: November 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 05, 2024Judgment ordered entered
Date: December 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 06, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 09, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: January 05, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 05, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Motion to Bifurcate
Date: October 05, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 16, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL (Comment) |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE RE MOTIONS FOR NEW TRIAL AND JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT (Comment) |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT (Comment) |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Balance Due on Case | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion Filed Electronically | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection Filed | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #13927726 Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Date listed 03/23/2016 is prior to the case being opened. Please correct and resubmit. Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.