Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hill, Lisa, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Pestotnik Llp, against Quaid Harley-Davidson, Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Scali Rasmussen, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilfred J Schneider, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2018 |
CategoryBusiness Tort/Unfair Business Practice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 07, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 29, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 27, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: April 19, 2019Amended Document Filed re:
Date: April 25, 2019Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Declaration re:
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 14, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 10, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 21, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 10, 2018Demurrer Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: August 06, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 02, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Status Report Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Reply Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 05, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 07, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 20, 2019Amended Cross Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Motion Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Motion re:
Date: September 20, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 05, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 16, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: October 05, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 13, 2018Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 05, 2018Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 12, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 02, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 22, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 14, 2019Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: November 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 19, 2019Notice of Lodging of Exhibits
Date: September 27, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Motion re:
Date: September 23, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 04, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 20, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 07, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 23, 2019Reply Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Motion re:
Date: July 09, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 23, 2019Order After Hearing Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 30, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: October 18, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 09, 2021Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: December 06, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 22, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 16, 2021Amended Cross Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 06, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: May 11, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Appeals - Memorandum of Costs on Appeal
Date: December 05, 2022Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: May 22, 2019Status Report Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: November 08, 2019Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 27, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Application for Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Memorandum of P&A ISO Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: October 04, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 17, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 19, 2022Application for Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 30, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 02, 2019Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 20, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Proof of Service
Date: September 19, 2022Status Report Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 13, 2022Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 09, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 06, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 27, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 14, 2023Opinion Received and Sent to Department
Date: November 30, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: March 10, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Brief Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: September 27, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: March 04, 2019Answer Filed
Date: December 14, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Remittitur Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 14, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Motion re:
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 20, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 14, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Motion re:
Date: December 09, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 12, 2019Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: September 15, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 27, 2019Motion re:
Date: May 03, 2021Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 12, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record
Date: February 03, 2022Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Reply to Motion re:
Date: October 18, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 04, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: February 28, 2019Declaration re:
Date: September 20, 2023Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: March 09, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: June 09, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 17, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 10, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Motion re:
Date: October 17, 2023Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: October 21, 2021Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: November 29, 2023Reply Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: March 04, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 03, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Motion re:
Date: August 31, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: April 19, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: November 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Rqst for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: December 07, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: December 04, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Proof of Service
Date: October 27, 2023Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 26, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Letter Sent To:
Date: November 16, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: October 17, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Order After Hearing Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Miscellaneous Opposition Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 16, 2021Notice
Date: March 08, 2021Comment:
Date: February 03, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: June 01, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: November 17, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: March 23, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 27, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 18, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 23, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 27, 2023Answer Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Separate Statement ISO Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 08, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: November 20, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: June 11, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 04, 2021Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 05, 2018Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: November 24, 2021Rqst for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Objection Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 13, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Exhibits
Date: October 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: October 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
August 01, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
January 29, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
January 25, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
December 13, 2023 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement ISO Reply Filed Electronically Plaintiff's Separate Statement ISO Reply Filed Electronically |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of P&A ISO Reply Filed Electronically Reply MPA iso Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed Electronically |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically Declaration of Ross Hyslop iso Plaintiff's Reply Filed Electronically |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rqst for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 7: 11/10/21 - 09/27/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.