Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dbp Investments, King Plaza Center, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Piser, Steven B., against Does 1 - 10, Inclusive, King Plaza Center,Llc, Lai, Thanh, Lien, Sovan, Quach, Bua, (total of 6) See All represented by Barrett, James M., Fogurty, Janet, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management127 days |
Filing DateJune 01, 2016 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Time To Trial971 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1358 days |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Stipulation & Order
Date: March 06, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: March 27, 2017Answer
Date: September 02, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2016Points and Authorities
Date: August 01, 2017Reply
Date: August 01, 2017Cross Complaint
Date: August 01, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: October 06, 2016Motion hearings
Date: November 14, 2016Declaration
Date: August 09, 2017Declaration
Date: August 15, 2017Motion for Issue and Monetary Sanction
Date: August 10, 2017Opposition
Date: August 09, 2017Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: August 22, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 24, 2017Opposition
Date: October 20, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: September 04, 2020Case Management Order
Date: August 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 17, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: February 19, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: December 15, 2016Reply
Date: February 08, 2017Opposition
Date: January 31, 2017Supplemental
Date: April 21, 2017Reply
Date: February 01, 2017Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: March 02, 2017Motion to Compel Further
Date: February 16, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: February 10, 2017Reply
Date: April 21, 2017Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Date: February 08, 2017Motion to Compel Further
Date: May 16, 2017Non-Opposition to
Date: May 02, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 02, 2017Motion
Date: May 26, 2017Declaration
Date: April 21, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: April 28, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 26, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: July 13, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2017Motion to Compel Further
Date: June 26, 2017Separate Statement
Date: May 26, 2017Reply
Date: June 19, 2017Motion
Date: July 14, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 14, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 14, 2017Opposition
Date: July 25, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: July 27, 2017Motion
Date: July 27, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 04, 2017Order
Date: August 29, 2017Separate Statement
Date: October 04, 2017Notice
Date: October 06, 2017Motion
Date: October 04, 2017Order
Date: March 15, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: July 01, 2019Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 01, 2021Statement of NonAgreement
Date: February 07, 2022Def_King_Plaza_s_CMS_final_
Date: March 12, 2022DBP-- CMC and TSC Statement
Date: March 15, 2022Proofs_of_Service_for_all_Parties
Date: March 17, 2022Trail_Setting_and_Case_M_fendant_Quach_et_al_
Date: March 17, 2022DBP_Csse_Managment_Trial_Setting_Statement
Date: March 17, 2022Stipulation Re Time to Bring Matter to Trial
Date: May 07, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 23, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: July 26, 2017Proof_of_Service_MSC_Statement_2
Date: October 14, 2022Proof_of_Service_MSC_Statement
Date: October 14, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: April 14, 2017Declaration
Date: January 26, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: October 27, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 14, 2017Separate Statement
Date: March 30, 2017Declaration in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2016McLellan_Decl_final_
Date: November 04, 2022RJN_final_
Date: November 04, 2022MIL_2_final_
Date: November 04, 2022POS_MILs_Supp_Pleads_2022_11_04
Date: November 04, 2022MIL_1_final_
Date: November 04, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 01, 2016Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: June 20, 2016Summons Issued / Filed
Date: June 01, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 04, 2017Motion
Date: January 19, 2017Declaration in Opposition
Date: July 25, 2017Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: March 30, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: February 08, 2017Opposition
Date: January 26, 2017POS_Trial_Docs_2022_11_17
Date: November 18, 2022RJN_final_
Date: November 18, 2022Fact_Stipulations_final_
Date: November 18, 2022Trial_Brief_final_
Date: November 18, 2022DBP Opposition to MIL No 1 and No 2
Date: November 18, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 18, 2022DBPs Trial Brief
Date: November 18, 2022DBPs Witness List
Date: November 18, 2022Witness_List_final_
Date: November 18, 2022RJN_No_2_final_
Date: November 18, 2022Exhibit_List_final_
Date: November 18, 2022POS_RJN2_Witness_Ex_Lists_2022_11_18
Date: November 18, 2022Stipulation_and_Proposed_Consolidation_FINAL
Date: January 06, 2023NOE_of_Order_Re_Consolidate_CIV538897_final_
Date: January 19, 2023Request for Dismissal-Inj Relief 1st in FAC
Date: January 20, 2023Summons Issued / Filed
Date: October 28, 2016Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 07, 2016Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: November 15, 2016Proof of Service
Date: December 21, 2016DBP Exhibit List
Date: January 25, 2023DBP Trial Brief
Date: January 27, 2023Declaratory_Relief_Trial_Brief_final_final_
Date: January 30, 2023RJN_final_
Date: January 31, 2023DBP Amended Exhibit List
Date: February 01, 2023Fact Stipulations-Fully Executed
Date: February 08, 2023DBP--Notice of Related Case
Date: February 16, 2023DBPs Amended Exhibit List - Rev 022223
Date: February 22, 2023DBPs List of Exh Ref to in Trial Brief
Date: February 23, 2023Witness_Listv2_final_
Date: February 24, 2023Exhibit_Listv2_final_
Date: February 24, 2023Stipulation re Briefs and Hearing
Date: March 06, 2023Closing_Brief_final_
Date: March 08, 2023Fitzgerald Decl ISO Post-Trial Brief
Date: March 08, 2023DBP Post-Trial Brief
Date: March 08, 2023Request for Dismissal - 2nd COA re King
Date: March 17, 2023Proposal_for_Statement_of_Decision_Final_
Date: March 23, 2023Objection Tentative Statement Decision
Date: March 23, 2023Post_trial_brief_on_Proposed_Judgment_Final_
Date: April 12, 2023Proposed_Judgment_Final_
Date: April 12, 2023POS_Post_Trial_Brief_2023_04_12
Date: April 12, 2023NOE of Judgment
Date: April 21, 2023Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 28, 2023Notice_of_Intent_to_Move_New_Trial_Final_
Date: May 02, 2023Notice_of_Intent_to_Move_Final_
Date: May 02, 2023King_Cost_Memo_Final_w_POS_
Date: May 03, 2023RJN_ISO_Mtn_Vacate_New_Trial_final_
Date: May 12, 2023SDM_Dec_ISO_Mtn_Vacate_New_Trial_final_
Date: May 12, 2023POS_Mtn_to_Vacate_New_Trial_2023_05_12
Date: May 12, 2023MPA_ISO_Mtn_Vacate_New_Trial_final_2
Date: May 12, 2023RJN_ISO_Mtn_to_Strike_Tax_Costs_final_
Date: May 12, 2023MPA_ISO_Mtn_to_Strike_Tax_Costs_final_
Date: May 12, 2023NOM_Strike_Tax_Costs_final_
Date: May 12, 2023SDM_Dec_ISO_Mtn_to_Strike_Tax_Costs_final_
Date: May 12, 2023POS_Mtn_to_Strike_Tax_Costs_2023_05_12
Date: May 12, 202308-04-23 Motion to Tax Costs - Notice
Date: May 22, 202308-04-23 Motion to Tax Costs - POS
Date: May 22, 202308-04-23 Motion to Tax Costs - RFJN
Date: May 22, 202308-04-23 Motion to Tax Costs - P and A
Date: May 22, 202306-16-23 Mtn to Set Aside Vacate Oppos
Date: May 24, 2023Stip_Proposed_Order_re_MTS_Hearings_2
Date: May 24, 2023Reply_v2_Final_
Date: May 30, 202306-16-23 Motion to Set Aside - Order
Date: June 28, 202307-21-23 Tax Costs Mtn-Order Granting DBP Mtn
Date: July 27, 202307-21-23 Tax Costs Mtn-Order Deny King Mtn
Date: July 27, 2023Notice Entry of Order Grant Mtn Strike Costs
Date: August 04, 2023Notice Entry Order Deny Mtn Strike Costs
Date: August 04, 2023Memo of Costs After Judgment
Date: August 11, 2023Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: August 11, 2023Stip_for_EOT_Re_MTS_final_
Date: August 17, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: August 29, 2017Non-Opposition to
Date: March 09, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: October 27, 2016Declaration
Date: June 13, 2017Opposition
Date: July 26, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: July 26, 2017Declaration
Date: July 14, 2017Declaration
Date: June 19, 2017Separate Statement
Date: July 14, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: March 02, 2017Complaint
Date: June 01, 2016Declaration
Date: August 09, 2017Separate Statement
Date: April 14, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 15, 2017Amended
Date: May 31, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: May 26, 2017Notice
Date: November 07, 2016Declaration in Support
Date: January 19, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 27, 2017Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion
Date: June 13, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 13, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 27, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: March 30, 2017Supplemental
Date: January 04, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 04, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: April 14, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 30, 2017Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 31, 2017Notice of Entry of Order
Date: May 25, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 27, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: July 01, 2019Declaration
Date: October 04, 2017Notice of Entry of Order
Date: March 24, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2016Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 15, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 01, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: August 19, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: September 29, 2016Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion
Date: December 21, 2016Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: December 13, 2016Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: December 15, 2016Answer
Date: November 29, 2016Amended
Date: October 28, 2016Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 11, 2016Separate Statement
Date: October 11, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 11, 2016Motion
Date: October 11, 2016Declaration
Date: October 11, 2016Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: February 08, 2017Declaration
Date: February 01, 2017Declaration in Opposition
Date: January 31, 2017Notice
Date: January 27, 2017Declaration
Date: January 26, 2017Notice
Date: January 26, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: January 05, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 19, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 04, 2017Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 30, 2017Order After Hearing
Date: January 18, 2017Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: January 26, 2017Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: January 19, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 12, 2017Separate Statement
Date: January 04, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: January 04, 2017Motion
Date: January 04, 2017Supplemental
Date: December 28, 2016Reply
Date: December 28, 2016Declaration in Opposition
Date: December 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip_for_EOT_Re_MTS_final_ | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Memo of Costs After Judgment | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Accrued Interest | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Order Grant Mtn Strike Costs | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Entry Order Deny Mtn Strike Costs | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 07-21-23 Tax Costs Mtn-Order Granting DBP Mtn | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 07-21-23 Tax Costs Mtn-Order Deny King Mtn | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 06-16-23 Motion to Set Aside - Order | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply_v2_Final_ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.