Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Garcia, Phillip, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Martin, Benjamin, against Carrie Wilson, In Her Capacitcy As Trustee Of The, Does 1 To 20, Markham, Erika, Markham, Shaun, Markham, Shawn, (total of 7) See All represented by Clifford, Joyce E, De La Pena, Gregory Ramon, Delapena, Gregory Ramon, Goodman, Joshua Seth, Mejia, Matthew, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Charlene P. Kiesselbach presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharlene P. Kiesselbach Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Case Cycle Time1265 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC14538560 and it is being heard in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff is Phillip Garcia and the defendants are Carrie Wilson and oth...
ORDER DENYING PETITION A151176 DIV 1
Date: May 26, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-09-2017 9:30 AM
Date: August 09, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-10-2017 1:30 PM
Date: August 10, 2017ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF PHILLIP GARCIA'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: November 01, 2016MINUTES FOR AUG-07-2017 9:30 AM
Date: August 07, 2017RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 58230853) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARCIA, PHILLIP
Date: December 01, 2015NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58157768) FILED BY ATTORNEY MARTIN, BENJAMIN
Date: November 12, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 14342297) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARCIA, PHILLIP
Date: December 09, 2014ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WILSON, ANGELO
Date: November 24, 2014ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL [NO S.A.S.E. - COPY OF ORDER IN DEPT. 501 OUTBOX]
Date: January 12, 2015ORDER AND STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 18, 2014ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 19, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58433662) FILED BY ATTORNEY MARTIN, BENJAMIN
Date: January 15, 2016ORDER [GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING OF DEMURRER]
Date: June 04, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 10, 2014ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT ANGELO WILSON
Date: July 28, 2014MINUTES FOR AUG-15-2017 10:00 AM
Date: August 15, 2017MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 56461303) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARCIA, PHILLIP
Date: December 12, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56461303) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARCIA, PHILLIP
Date: December 12, 2014ORDER VACATING SANCTIONS ON OSC
Date: May 03, 2016ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: April 28, 2016TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 100020376) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARCIA, PHILLIP
Date: August 07, 2017DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61061931)
Date: September 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2018 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: CHARLENE P. KIESSELBACH |
|
October 03, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-13-2018 - DISMISSAL ON FILE. | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-03-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61077150) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARKHAM, SHAWN (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SERVED AS SHAUN MARKHAM) | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61061931) | |
August 28, 2017 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: CHARLENE P. KIESSELBACH |
|
August 22, 2017 | Hearing | OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-22-2017 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON OCT-03-2017 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE COMMISSIONER PRO TEM., PANG LY HEARING SET FOR AUG-22-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 603 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.