Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Great American Insurance Company filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against Abhi-Crockett, Inc., Albay Construction Company, All Asbestos Defendants-See Attached Documents, Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Libility Trust, Asbestos Corporation Limited, (total of 59) See All represented by Anger, Laurie Kirkpatric, Armstrong, William Henry, Biderman, David T., Blackard, Eugene Charles, Bodell, Daniel D., (total of 36) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Lynn O'Malley Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 05, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time3915 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC-07-274226. The plaintiff/petitioner is Charles Tobey, and the defendant/respondent is Asbestos Defendants (BP). The request for dismissal is to be made without prejudic...
THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: March 16, 2017DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61557361)
Date: January 11, 2018ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 01, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29175950) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION
Date: January 22, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 21405911) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: September 08, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21405911) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: September 08, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21453188) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTRICON CORPORATION
Date: September 10, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21073153) FILED BY DEFENDANT STM AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Date: August 14, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21073153) FILED BY DEFENDANT STM AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Date: August 14, 2008ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2008ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 09, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16227511) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.
Date: September 07, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16215366) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Date: September 06, 2007DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16215366) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Date: September 06, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16077748) FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.
Date: August 24, 2007SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. TO PLAINTIFF TOBEY, CHARLES
Date: December 17, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16069447) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Date: August 23, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16257441) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Date: September 11, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16284407) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.
Date: September 12, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16117721) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABHI-CROCKETT, INC.
Date: August 28, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16235943) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY
Date: September 07, 2007NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 22944089) FILED BY ATTORNEY KANNETT, MARK SIMON
Date: December 16, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16047358) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOODLOE E. MOORE, INC.
Date: August 22, 2007DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16069447) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Date: August 23, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22402983) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION
Date: November 10, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16002319) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC
Date: August 20, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15823025) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY
Date: August 03, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 05, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16010046) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Date: August 20, 2007INDEX OF MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 33235781) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.
Date: September 15, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69033884) AS TO INTERVENOR GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS INSURER OF FOLEY-PMI, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69033884) AS TO DEFENDANT FOLEY-PMI, INC | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT / ANSWER-IN-INTERVENTION TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67857563) FILED BY INTERVENOR GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS INSURER OF FOLEY-PMI, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER : STIPULATION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT FOLEY-PMI, INC. AND FOR GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE; ORDER | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FEE PAID ON: STIPULATION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT FOLEY-PMI, INC. AND FOR GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 67815304) FILED BY OTHER GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS INSURER OF FOLEY-PMI, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION | |
March 01, 2018 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-01-2018. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 1/11/18. (503) | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61557361) | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOLEY-PMI, INC., AND THE LUNKENHEIMER COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 60356020) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOBEY, CHARLES | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.