Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Sierra Annette, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Hennig Esq. Robert, Hennig Robert A., against The City Of Los Angeles, represented by Savitt Esq. Linda Miller, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Robert B. Broadbelt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert B. Broadbelt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Declaration OF SAM BROWN; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Order On Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Order re Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Objection Objection to Defendant's Reply Separate Statement; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: December 27, 2017PEREMPTORY CHA..LENGE TO JUDICIAL OFHCER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)
Date: January 05, 2018Minute Order -
Date: January 08, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 10, 2018Notice of Change of Address -
Date: January 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 02, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: April 03, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, ADDRESS, AND PHONE NUMBERS
Date: April 02, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: April 03, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: April 13, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: April 03, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/25/2021
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 25, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT MEETING
Date: February 16, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO 1) PRODUCE DOCUMENTS...)
Date: February 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 15, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION/ JUDGEMENT
Date: March 05, 2021Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION
Date: March 15, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT
Date: March 16, 2021Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT
Date: March 16, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2021
Date: March 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 06, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 26, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/26/2021
Date: August 26, 2021Witness List; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: September 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAM BROWN
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 28, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Date: November 09, 2022Witness List
Date: November 15, 2022Exhibit List
Date: November 15, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: November 15, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: November 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (10 DAYS); FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 16, 2022Order - ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE ON TRIAL
Date: November 16, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 16, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 09, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 22, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 25, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 05, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: June 05, 2023Minute Order -
Date: April 18, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -
Date: May 18, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 23, 2019Separate Statement
Date: January 03, 2019Notice - Notice Of Case Reassignment
Date: January 28, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 28, 2019Notice - Notice Of Association Of Counsel
Date: February 11, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 11, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: April 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO RECUSAL)
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: April 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: May 31, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 04, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 04, 2020Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: March 24, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 04, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 04, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 21, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: December 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: December 15, 2021Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CITY'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPAL
Date: January 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/14/2022
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 14, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 03, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 06, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR
Date: August 03, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/03/2022
Date: August 03, 2022Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: October 28, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 28, 2022Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice ( Of Association Of Counsel) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice ( Of Case Reassignment) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Order (On Ex Parte Application) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice (Defendant's Amended Notice of Unavailability) Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Defendant's Reply Separate Statement) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing and Speci...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability) Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advise Court of Potential ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALIGNING DISCOVE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff to 1) Produce Documents...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Defendant City of Los Ange...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses) Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (STRIKING DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF SAM BROWN) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES) Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Order (ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE ON TRIAL) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (10 days); Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for) Filed by The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to: 1) Special ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Annette Sierra (Plaintiff); The City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel (to Compel Plaintiff to Serve Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF SAM BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR...))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Deadline for Mandatory Settlement Meeting)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal) of )
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PERSONAL COMPUTERS)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF SAM BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE ONE AND TWO)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff to 1) Produce Documents...))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION/ JUDGEMENT)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to: 1) Special ...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal))
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice (ERRATA RE: EXHIBITS 14-16 TO DEFENDANT CITY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Defendant's Reply Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Declaration (Second Supplemental Declartion of Philip L. Reznik Re: Defendant City's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re Continuation of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Order (On Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Response (TO OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER ALIGNING DISCOVERY CUTOFFS WITH NEW TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF SAM BROWN)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Order (re Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALIGNING DISCOVERY CUTOFFS WITH NEW TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (STRIKING DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Order (On Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing On Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advise Court of Potential ...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Defendant City of Los Ange...))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT CITY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALIGNING DISCOVE...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice (of Proof of Service Re: Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Further Discovery)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice (Defendant City's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compal)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re Continuation of Motion for Summary Judgment Adjudication and Trial)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re Evidence of Acts-Omissions-Damages After Filing of Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Notice (Defendant's Amended Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF SAM BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF SAM BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE ONE AND TWO)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (STRIKING DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to: 1) Special ...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel (to Compel Plaintiff to Serve Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice ( Of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing and Speci...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice ( Of Association Of Counsel)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice ( Of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advise Court of Potential ...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice ( Of Association Of Counsel)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal))
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing and Speci...))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADVANCING)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Order (On Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR...))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PERSONAL COMPUTERS)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/25/2021)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice (ERRATA RE: EXHIBITS 14-16 TO DEFENDANT CITY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Declaration (Second Supplemental Declartion of Philip L. Reznik Re: Defendant City's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff to 1) Produce Documents...))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Deadline for Mandatory Settlement Meeting)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION/ JUDGEMENT)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Defendant's Reply Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Response (TO OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re Continuation of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2021)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/06/2021)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALIGNING DISCOVE...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT CITY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Re Continuation of Motion for Summary Judgment Adjudication and Trial)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Order (On Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing On Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER ALIGNING DISCOVERY CUTOFFS WITH NEW TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/17/2021)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Defendant City of Los Ange...))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/26/2021)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice (Defendant's Amended Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF SAM BROWN)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Order (re Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ALIGNING DISCOVERY CUTOFFS WITH NEW TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice (of Proof of Service Re: Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Further Discovery)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.