Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cheng Sheng Hong, Cheng Zhiying, Chen Xiaole, Chen Xiaoli, Chunhong Jiang, (total of 51) See All filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Bell Jeffrey Thomas Esq., against American Dream Fund Llc, Celona Asset Management Usa Limited, Evans Carroll & Associates Inc., Goldstone Advisors Limited, Henry Global Consulting, (total of 16) See All represented by Akley Benjamin S., Cha John Sung Esq., Charron William L., Ciciliano Dylan T., Cooperman Lauren B., (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara M. Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara M. Scheper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: November 30, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: July 25, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: July 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: July 25, 2018Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE REQUEST FOR RELIEF
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - (Ex-Parte Proceedings)
Date: October 10, 2018Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER
Date: October 10, 2018Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FOR CLARIFICATION OF MARCH 12 ORDER
Date: October 10, 2018Response - Response Defendants' Proof Of Payment of First Appearance Fees
Date: November 14, 2018Notice - Notice Notice of Plaintiffs' Failure to Serve Filings
Date: February 01, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Annual Pro Hac Vice ...)
Date: February 22, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF XU ISO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: March 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 25, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROGERS ISO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: March 25, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAPLAN ISO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: March 25, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 17, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 25, 2019Answer
Date: April 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 20, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: February 28, 2020Joinder
Date: March 11, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: March 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 16, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 16, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 04, 2020Order - OF DISMISSAL
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: July 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 01, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 09, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 14, 2020Notice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE
Date: July 15, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO RELATING THE WEI ACTION TO THIS ACTION
Date: August 03, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: August 10, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: August 18, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE
Date: August 24, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 31, 2021Request - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: September 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/01/2021
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 01, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: October 05, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 05, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: October 14, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (BY JEFFEREY T. B...)
Date: November 05, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 19, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: November 29, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: December 07, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: December 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL;)
Date: December 16, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: December 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC
Date: January 05, 2022Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: January 31, 2022Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: February 01, 2022Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: March 03, 2022Order - ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: March 07, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: March 11, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: April 26, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: May 02, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: July 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 20, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 16, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 17, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: August 23, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 25, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 29, 2022Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: March 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: October 01, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: September 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE;)
Date: September 02, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 14, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 15, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 15, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 19, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 19, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 30, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 04, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 13, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: October 20, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: October 20, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RECALL AND QUASH WRIT OF EXECUTION
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE;)
Date: October 26, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: November 30, 2022Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED (B317537)
Date: December 01, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: December 16, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 05, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE;)
Date: January 06, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION JEFFREY T. BELL
Date: March 02, 2023Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )
Date: March 14, 2023Writ - Return
Date: April 26, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00as to defendant Pan Ajmerican Business Consulting Limited only
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Annual Pro Hac Vice ...))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Response (Defendants' Proof Of Payment of First Appearance Fees)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Plaintiffs' Failure to Serve Filings)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal o...))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Annual Pro Hac Vice ...))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Payment of Annual Pro Hac Vice Renewa...))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Kaplan ISO Motion to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Xu ISO Motion to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Rogers ISO Motion to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE DEFAULT OF HENRY TONGZHAO USA CONSULTING, INC.)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Arbitration; Order to Show Cause Re: Re ...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (Re Plaintiffs & Defendant Henry T...))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Arbitration))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Motion re: (Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/04/2020)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Petition to Confirm Contractual Arb...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Order Of Dismissal
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (Re Plaintiffs & Defendant Henry T...))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Payment of Annual Pro Hac Vice Renewa...))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Response (to Relating the Wei Action to this Action)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Renewal)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: ruling on issue of notice of related ...))
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re Arbitration; Case Management Conference...))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Payment of Annual Pro Hac Vice...))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (Re Plaintiffs & Defendant Henry T...))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition (PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey T. Bell)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO VACATE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Vacate)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award; Case Managemen...))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Response (to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Request (for Entry of Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Judgment (.)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/01/2021)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re Payment of Annual Pro Hac Vice Ren...))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal (as to Shengchao Tang)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal (as to Chunhong Jiang)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference and OSC)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Appeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified (NOA: 11/29/21 B317537)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (the Jams Arbitration Award)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judgment)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition (to motion confirm arbitration award)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference (Re Plaintiffs & Defendant Henry T...))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (by Jefferey T. B...))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal (as to Guangyu Wu)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Motion to be Relieved as Counsel;))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal (as to Li Yao)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.