Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Underhill Marie, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Brown Brown & Brown, against Does 1 To 100, Estate Of Testa, represented by Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuch&Lebovits Ll, Mark R. Weiner & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 26, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions539 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc South District |
Case Cycle Time576 days |
Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 22, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to obtain mental examination of pltf by a Neuro-Psychologist; )
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT JURY FEES-$150.00 )
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to obtain second physical examina- tion of pltf by a Neurologist; )
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 7, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Order (re mtn for summ judgment )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 10, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 12, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 )
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 11, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00List of Exhibits (JOINT )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MO IN LIMINE 12 )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 9, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SECOND MEDICAL EXAMINATION )
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #1 )
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00List of Witnesses (JOINT )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #1 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER )
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 14, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT PAGE-LINE DESIGNATIONS FOR DEPOSITION TESTIMONY IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT )
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4, ETC...___________________ )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: December 13, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-08-09 00:00:00
Date: August 09, 2018Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: September 25, 2018Miscellaneous-Other
Date: August 30, 2018Abstract - misc Issued (ISSUED RETURNED TO JANNEY & JANNEY )
Date: September 25, 2018Motion for New Trial
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Amended/Corrected Judgment
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.
Date: January 18, 2018PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 05, 2018SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2018ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 11
Date: May 07, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 1
Date: May 07, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 3
Date: May 07, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 9
Date: May 07, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 10
Date: May 07, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1; DECLARATION OF JOAN BENJAMIN BROWN
Date: May 08, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 2
Date: May 08, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE 2; DECLARATION OF JOAN BENJAMIN BROWN
Date: May 08, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 12
Date: May 14, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 14
Date: May 15, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE 3
Date: May 16, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 13
Date: May 16, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE 4
Date: May 16, 2018Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict -
Date: July 02, 2018Motion to Tax Costs -
Date: July 09, 2018Motion for New Trial - Court's Ruling
Date: August 08, 2018Motion to Tax Costs - Court's Ruling
Date: August 08, 2018COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: October 26, 2016Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT JURY FEES-$150.00 )
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to obtain second physical examina- tion of pltf by a Neurologist; )
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to obtain mental examination of pltf by a Neuro-Psychologist; )
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SECOND MEDICAL EXAMINATION )
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAMINATION; )
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Statement of Facts (in support of motion for summary judgment; )
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (REBUTTAL RE NEW ISSUE RAISED IN REPLY BRIEF )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Order (re mtn for summ judgment )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 9, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 8, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 7, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 10, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 11, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00List of Exhibits (JOINT )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00List of Witnesses (JOINT )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (REBUTTAL RE NEW ISSUE RAISED IN REPLY BRIEF )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #2 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #1 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 8, ETC..._ )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Statement of Facts (in support of motion for summary judgment; )
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 15, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00General Verdict
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFFS BRIEF RE MEDICAL BILLS AND CAPITATION )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION FOR MENTAL EXAMINATION; )
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #13 )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 12, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 )
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #1 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #1 )
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #1 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #2 )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #13 )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MO IN LIMINE 12 )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLTFFS BRIEF RE MEDICAL BILLS AND CAPITATION )
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 14, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 15, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4, ETC...___________________ )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT PAGE-LINE DESIGNATIONS FOR DEPOSITION TESTIMONY IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3, ETC... )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 )
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER )
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT )
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Abstract - misc Issued (ISSUED RETURNED TO JANNEY & JANNEY )
Date: September 25, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.