Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Deutsche Bank Ag, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by David G Januszewski, Day Pitney Llp, Phv Markley Brian T 7 21 20, Phv Ramesh Sheila C 2 28 14, against Alexander Vik, Caroline Vik, represented by Pullman & Comley Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Sheila A. Ozalis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2020 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/13/2020 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: July 13, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 3/11/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: March 04, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2020MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON MOTION RESULT: Order 3/11/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: March 11, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 3/11/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: March 11, 2021MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (#109.00)
Date: October 22, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 3/4/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: March 04, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/24/2020 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: August 24, 2020MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO THE PRIOR PENDING ACTION
Date: October 22, 2020MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO THE LITIGATION PRIVILEGE
Date: October 22, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD ON CONSENT RESULT: Granted 9/28/2020 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: September 14, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/15/2020 HON ROBERT GENUARIO
Date: July 15, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/28/2020 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: September 28, 2020MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO THE DOCTRINE OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS
Date: October 22, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 8/5/2021 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: August 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 7/9/2021 HON JAMES ABRAMS
Date: July 09, 2021MEMORANDUM TO SUPPLEMENT DEFENDANTS' COMPLEX LITIGATION APPLICATION
Date: July 02, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 2/3/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: February 03, 2021REPLY TO OBJECTION TO MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY
Date: November 20, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 3/2/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: March 02, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/6/2020 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: November 06, 2020ORDER RESULT: Off 11/23/2020 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: November 23, 2020ORDER CLD Remote Status Conference RESULT: Order 7/15/2021 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: July 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS
Date: July 30, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER PROPOSED FROM DEFENDANTS
Date: August 06, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 4/21/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: April 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON MOTION
Date: April 21, 2021MOTION TO QUASH Deposition of Equinox
Date: October 26, 2021MOTION TO QUASH Deposition of The Stanwich Club
Date: October 26, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 7/20/2021 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: July 20, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/12/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: July 12, 2021MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON MOTION
Date: March 04, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/1/2021 HON EDWARD KRUMEICH
Date: June 01, 2021APPEAL TO APPELLATE COURT ALL FEES PAID
Date: March 17, 2021MOTION TO QUASH Deposition of SoulCycle
Date: October 26, 2021OBJECTION Plaintiff Deutsche Bank AG's Objections to Defendants' Jurisdictional Discovery Requests
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 8/9/2021 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/7/2021 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: December 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 12/7/2021 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: December 07, 2021APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL Motion for Review RESULT: Order 6/9/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF ALEXANDER VIK IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS
Date: January 29, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN Supplemental Return of Service
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF MONTE FRANK IN SUPPORT OF DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS
Date: July 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 26, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 10, 2020APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Terminate Stay
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Good Faith Efforts to Resolve Discovery Disputes
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Sheila C. Ramesh
Date: December 20, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RESULT: Sustained 1/24/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 2/25/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: February 25, 2022REPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS
Date: January 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Sustained 1/24/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: January 24, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 1/24/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: January 24, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 09, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 2/2/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: February 02, 2022REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION OF DISCOVERY OR DEPOSITION DISPUTE (JD-CV-119)
Date: December 03, 2021REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: January 25, 2022REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77) Motion to Modify Scheduling Order
Date: February 24, 2022REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION COMPLEX LITIGATION (JD-CL-77)
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/1/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: March 01, 2022STIPULATION STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 01, 2022SUMMONS
Date: June 09, 2020APPEARANCE
Date: July 24, 2020OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (AS CORRECTED)
Date: June 10, 2022WITHDRAWAL IN PART MOTION #197.00 REQUEST FOR ADJUDICATION
Date: June 10, 2022WITHDRAWAL IN PART OF OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (DKT. 201.00)
Date: June 10, 2022OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: June 10, 2022MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: June 15, 2022WITHDRAWAL IN PART OF MOTION #188.00 MOTION TO SEAL
Date: June 10, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: June 03, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 6/29/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/14/2022 BY THE COURT
Date: February 14, 2022ORDER by the Appellate Court RESULT: Order 6/9/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: June 09, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 9/1/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS Last Updated: Entry Number - 09/28/2022
Date: September 01, 2022REPORT Joint Status Report
Date: August 03, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 8/4/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: August 03, 2022APPELLATE COURT DECISION JUDGMENT/ORDER OF TRIAL COURT REVERSED RESULT: BY THE COURT
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/4/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: August 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 | Hearing | ||
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 9/1/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS Last Updated: Entry Number - 09/28/2022 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: HON SHEILA OZALIS | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT DECISION JUDGMENT/ORDER OF TRIAL COURT REVERSED RESULT: BY THE COURT | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 8/4/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT Joint Status Report | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 8/4/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 6/29/2022 HON SHEILA OZALIS | |
June 29, 2022 | Remote Status Conference | ||
June 20, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-01 #001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.