Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Mary Kay Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Eisenberg, Jared D, Herz, Jill, Schwegmann, Christopher J, Stewart, Amy M, against Xxxxxxx, Xxxxx Xxxxx, represented by Lurich, Ryan K, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2018 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Mary Kay Inc. against xxxxx xxxxx xxxxxxx in the District Court of Dallas County, Texas. Mary Kay seeks immediate and permanent injunctive relief to prevent irreparable injury caused by xxxxxxx. They also seek monetary reli...
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 23, 2019MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 27, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: April 30, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 27, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 20, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 27, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 27, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 27, 2018TRUST RECEIPT
Date: May 07, 2018ORDER - PROTECT
Date: July 17, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2018TRUST RECEIPT
Date: July 17, 2018CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 17, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 07, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 18, 2018JURY DEMAND
Date: June 18, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 20, 2018RULE 11
Date: July 11, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 29, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 18, 2018ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: June 19, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2018SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: September 26, 2018REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2018NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: September 06, 2018DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: September 06, 2018ORDER - COMPEL
Date: August 22, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: August 15, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: August 15, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 10, 2018CITATION ISSUED
Date: April 27, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: August 15, 2018ORDER - PROTECT
Date: August 22, 2018CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 30, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: August 22, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 07, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2018SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: August 09, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: August 22, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 10, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 27, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 22, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2020ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 25, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: May 07, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: June 07, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 20, 2018OBJECTION
Date: June 27, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 20, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 20, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: May 07, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 11, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 20, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 27, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 07, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 07, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 07, 2018CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: April 27, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 27, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: July 23, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: May 07, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 11, 2019Motion - Quash
Date: March 04, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 22, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: August 01, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 06, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 12, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 23, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: February 13, 2020BRIEF FILED
Date: July 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 15, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: May 22, 2018MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 21, 2018ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 22, 2018EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 29, 2022MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: September 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 16, 2022MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 26, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 25, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 26, 2020OBJECTION
Date: August 01, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 29, 2022Special Setting
Date: August 08, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 26, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: March 04, 2020ORDER - COMPEL
Date: March 04, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 14, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 03, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 12, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 25, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: September 03, 2019ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 12, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 14, 2020RESPONSE
Date: August 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 05, 2020Final Disposition Hearing
Date: September 13, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 17, 2019ORDER - SEAL
Date: August 12, 2019CHARGE OF COURT
Date: August 12, 2022RULE 11
Date: January 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 12, 2022MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 02, 2022STRIKE SHEET
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2019OBJECTION
Date: August 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2018ORDER - LEAVE
Date: August 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 29, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 04, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 27, 2019VACATION LETTER
Date: August 25, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 28, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 20, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 20, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 12, 2018EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 03, 2019DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 03, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2019OBJECTION
Date: February 07, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: February 10, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 30, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2018MOTION - SEAL
Date: August 12, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 21, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 22, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 03, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 06, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 03, 2018RULE 11
Date: May 23, 2018COUNTER CLAIM
Date: June 06, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 28, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 25, 2019NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 04, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2022COA - POST CARD
Date: February 08, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 22, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 21, 2019Motion - Dismiss
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION - LEAVE
Date: August 19, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 04, 2019Motion - Compel
Date: August 07, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 25, 2019MOTION - QUASH
Date: February 27, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: August 13, 2019APPELLATE RECORD
Date: February 10, 2023Motion - Dismiss
Date: May 31, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 02, 2019ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 03, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 21, 2019REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: February 01, 2023TRUST RECEIPT
Date: October 11, 2022COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: February 16, 2023COUNTER CLAIM
Date: February 25, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 13, 2019Motion - Quash
Date: May 01, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 14, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 22, 2019ORDER - RELEASE BOND
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 01, 2019MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 25, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 10, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 19, 2019ORDER - RELEASE BOND
Date: October 03, 2022CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: January 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2019OBJECTION
Date: August 16, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 30, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 29, 2019RULE 11
Date: August 09, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 09, 2019RESPONSE
Date: May 17, 2019RULE 11
Date: October 09, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: January 03, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 01, 2019COA - POST CARD
Date: February 16, 2023Motion - Quash
Date: May 22, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 13, 2019CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 16, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 04, 2018REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: February 01, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 30, 2018COA - POST CARD
Date: January 04, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 01, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 17, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: August 08, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 19, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 24, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: April 22, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 13, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2019MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 05, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 25, 2018ORDER - STRIKE
Date: August 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 10, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 10, 2020Motion - Seal
Date: September 05, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: September 03, 2019ORDER - SEAL
Date: September 05, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: September 23, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 28, 2019ORDER - SANCTIONS
Date: July 23, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 29, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 14, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 02, 2020RESPONSE
Date: February 10, 2020MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 10, 2020MOTION - SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 10, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 25, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 07, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: August 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 25, 2022STRIKE SHEET
Date: August 08, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 27, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: January 09, 2020RESPONSE
Date: September 23, 2022MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: January 07, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2020REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: August 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2022REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: August 01, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 24, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: July 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: July 13, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 19, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2018MOTION - QUASH
Date: February 06, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 30, 2020ISSUE SUBPOENA
Date: March 20, 2019RESPONSE
Date: July 20, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 17, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 27, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 27, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 20, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 07, 2018ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 22, 2018ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: June 19, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 01, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 27, 2018MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 15, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: May 07, 2018MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: May 21, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 06, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 29, 2018CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2018RULE 11
Date: May 23, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 19, 2018COUNTER CLAIM
Date: June 06, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 20, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 20, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 17, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 20, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: August 15, 2018RULE 11
Date: July 11, 2018ORDER - PROTECT
Date: July 17, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: July 12, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 26, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2018RESPONSE
Date: July 20, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 07, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 10, 2018REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2018ORDER - COMPEL
Date: August 22, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 03, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 27, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 03, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 03, 2018ORDER - PROTECT
Date: August 22, 2018RULE 11
Date: October 09, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2018REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 04, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: August 22, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: August 15, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: April 30, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 25, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 28, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 25, 2018MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 27, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 12, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: August 06, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2018RESPONSE
Date: January 04, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2019MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: August 22, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 19, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 30, 2018MOTION - SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 10, 2018COUNTER CLAIM
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 06, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 10, 2019ISSUE SUBPOENA
Date: March 20, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 27, 2019ORDER - SEAL
Date: August 12, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: January 03, 2019Motion - Compel
Date: August 07, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 02, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2019RULE 11
Date: August 09, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: August 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2019RESPONSE
Date: May 17, 2019Motion - Quash
Date: May 22, 2019MOTION - LEAVE
Date: August 19, 2019OBJECTION
Date: August 16, 2019ORDER - LEAVE
Date: August 30, 2019ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: August 13, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 13, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 10, 2020ORDER - COMPEL
Date: March 04, 2020Motion - Quash
Date: March 04, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2019ORDER - SEAL
Date: September 05, 2019ORDER - STRIKE
Date: August 30, 2019MOTION - SEAL
Date: August 12, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: January 09, 2020RULE 11
Date: January 13, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: February 13, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 22, 2019MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 28, 2019OBJECTION
Date: February 07, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 17, 2019Motion - Seal
Date: September 05, 2019Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 21, 2019ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 12, 2020MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: January 07, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: May 28, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 30, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: May 07, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: May 22, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: June 20, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: June 20, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: June 27, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: July 17, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: July 17, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: July 30, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: August 10, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: August 27, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: September 14, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: September 20, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: August 29, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: November 28, 2018MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: August 13, 2019MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: August 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER - 05-23-00001-CV COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER 05-23-00001-CV |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
COA - POST CARD - 05-23-00001-CV COA - POST CARD 05-23-00001-CV |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPELLATE RECORD 05-23-00001-CV CLERKS RECORD SUBMIT 5TH COA WITH CONFIRMATION # 52387 |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE EMAILED ATTY. $2297.00 |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COA CASE NO 05-23-00001-CV PREPARING REQUESTED CLERK'S RECORDS |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
COA - POST CARD - 05-23-00001-CV COA - POST CARD 05-23-00001-CV |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS EMAIL SENT/COURT REPORTER RE: REPORTERS REQUEST |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR REPORTER'S RECORD REQUEST REPORTER RECORD HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP - ROBERT GILREATH - ATTY |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.