Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Xxxxx Xxxxxxxx, Xxxxxx Xxxxxxxx, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Xxxxxxx, Xxxxxx Leonard, Kornfeld, Seth Kyle, Napoli, Xxxxxx P., against Berlin Obgyn Associates, Family Psychology Of Long Island, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. K N A Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Richard Pitch, Ronald J Tadeo, (total of 8) See All represented by Borbet, Daniel, Cascino, Gregory A, Decrow, Barbara Helen, Fabiano, Angela, Kaplan, Keith Lawrence, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Supreme with Stephen Hackeling presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen Hackeling Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2012 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time2324 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. The plaintiffs, xxxxxx xxxxxxxx on behalf of xxxxx xxxxxxxx (an infant under the age of 18) and xxxxxx xxxxxxxx individually, are suing multipl...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008) Summons and Complaint
Date: January 10, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008) Defendant Richard Pitch, M.D. with Affidavit of Service
Date: January 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #007) Exhibit I - Response to Combined Demands
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007) Exhibit G- Dr. Pitch's EBT transcript
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007) Exhibit F - plaintiff's EBT transcripts
Date: January 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007) Exhibit E - BP as to co-defendant Dr. Pitch
Date: January 10, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007) Exhibit D - BP as to Family Psychology
Date: January 10, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007) Exhibit B- Answer for Family Psychology
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007) Exhibit C - Answer for co-defendant Dr. Pitch
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007) Exhibit A -S&C
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005) Dr Pitch's records
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005) Dr Cavuoto's record
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005) South Shore Hospital chart
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005) Taddeo's original chart
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 09, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 06, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: December 06, 2018INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 12, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 12, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 28, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 28, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 12, 2012NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 09, 2012NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 10, 2012ANSWER
Date: December 10, 2012STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 28, 2012DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 09, 2012DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 09, 2012ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 07, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 07, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 07, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 07, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 07, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: January 16, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 14, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 16, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 14, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 15, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 21, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 14, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #007) Order with Notice of Entry
Date: January 14, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 16, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 21, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 13, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 17, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 21, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #008) Note of Issue
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 13, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #008)
Date: January 10, 2019ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE *Corrected*
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #008) Affirmation of Expert, Jason Hershberger, M.D.
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Dr. Pitch 3.12.15
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Dr. Pitch 10.22.14
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Dr. Taddeo 9.23.14
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O-2 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Dr. Taddeo 6.26.14 Part 2
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O-1 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Dr. Taddeo 6.26.14 Par 1
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N-2 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Tony xxxxxxxx 6.13.14 Part 2
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N-1 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Tony xxxxxxxx 6.13.14 Part 1
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L-2 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Plaintiff 5.29.14 Part 2
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Plaintiff 6.13.14
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L-3 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Plaintiff 5.29.14 Part 3
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K-2 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Plaintiff 4.28.14 Part 2
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L-1 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Plaintiff 5.29.14 Part 1
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Plaintiff 1.21.14
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #008) Records of Ronald Taddeo, M.D.
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K-1 Â (Motion #008) EBT Transcript of Plaintiff 4.28.14 Part 1
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #008) Records of Southside Hospital
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008) Records of Dr. Richard Pitch
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H-3 Â (Motion #008) Records of Dr. Nicholas Cavuoto Part 3
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars as to Dr. Pitch
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H-2 Â (Motion #008) Records of Dr. Nicholas Cavuoto Part 2
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008) Demand for Bill of Particulars
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008) Verified Answer Dr. Pitch
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G2 Â (Motion #008) Records of Scott Berlin, M.D. Part 2
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G1 Â (Motion #008) Records of Scott Berlin, M.D. Part 1
Date: January 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: August 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: August 30, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #015)
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Ex, E
Date: March 15, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #015)
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #011)
Date: August 17, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Ex. D
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: September 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Ex. C
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #010)
Date: August 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #010)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Ex. B
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Ex. A
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #010)
Date: August 30, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #010)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010) Expert Disclosure re Dr. Schuster
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #010)
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010) "Supplemental" Bill of Particulars
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #010) Expert Disclosure re Dr. Reid
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #010) Expert Disclosure re Dr. Finnell
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010) Bill of Particulars
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #015) barcoded records Dr. Cavuoto
Date: August 14, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #015) Barcoded redacted Dr. Taddeo's chart
Date: August 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #015) *Corrected*
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #015) *Corrected*
Date: August 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #015) *Corrected*
Date: August 14, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 18, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 26, 2023EXTRACT
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S)
Date: July 18, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 26, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: April 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 01, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #015)
Date: March 28, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #014)
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #015)
Date: November 15, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #015)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Ex. H
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* | ||
April 01, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 28, 2024 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #015) | ||
January 05, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 15, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #015) Memorandum of Law in Reply (Dr. Taddeo & Shore Psychiatric) |
||
November 15, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #015) Affirmation in Reply (Dr. Taddeo & Shore Psychiatric) |
||
October 20, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 19, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #015) Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 18, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #015) | ||
September 20, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #015) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.