Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wayne Norton, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Austin, Daniel Michael, Bradley, Roger W., Tyreman, Erin M, against Bruce Norton, Robert Norton, represented by Fabiano, Francesco, Jarvis, Richard H., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Partition) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: November 14, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 11, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 11, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: February 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 11, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 05, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 04, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 14, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 05, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 08, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Gilbert 9.8.23 |
||
July 25, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 14, 2022 | ORDER - AMENDED | ||
November 14, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 17, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Wayne Norton |
||
October 17, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #2) Memo of Law |
||
October 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
October 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Wayne Norton 2010 DL Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.