Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Shirley Petway, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Harris, Seth A, against New York City Housing Authority, represented by Goldsmith, Jonathan D., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Carol R. Edmead presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol R. Edmead Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 18, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 18, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 24, 2020PETITION *Corrected*
Date: June 08, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 29, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #002) Stipulation (request to so order) |
||
October 29, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) Letter to Court |
||
September 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE |
||
September 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) EXHIBIT F - RESPONDENT'S AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION |
||
September 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) EXHIBIT E - STIPULATION |
||
September 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) EXHIBIT D - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
September 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) EXHIBIT C - SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
||
September 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIA ECF |
||
September 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF LOUIS JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.