Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Pnc Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fox, Christine L., Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Goldberg, Brian David, Loecher, Melissa Mary, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, (total of 6) See All against Babbar And Associates P.C., Cach, Llc, Household Finance Realty Corporation Of New York, Jamise Valentine, John Doe, (total of 6) See All represented by Singer, David Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: December 21, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 21, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 20, 2023ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE
Date: October 02, 2023ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE
Date: November 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT non military affiadvit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 27, 2023SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: July 14, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: July 14, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 26, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 26, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Settlement Conference Release Form |
||
December 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service of the Summons |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Help for Homeowners Notice |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Answer of Kevin Valentine and Jamise Valentine |
||
December 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Notice to Tenants of Buildings in Foreclosure |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.