Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maria Delgado, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by D'Orazio, Bernard, Wiss, Scott Lawrence, Yudin, Steven G, against Nelson Rojas, represented by Weiss, Ronald D., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Felice Muraca presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFelice Muraca Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions509 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time505 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 17, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 17, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 03, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: November 05, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: June 24, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 19, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 24, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 24, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: October 20, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 26, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 09, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: August 13, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 01, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 19, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 24, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 28, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 27, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 04, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 06, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: July 29, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Bankruptcy Court Order denying Nelson Rojas a homestead exemption |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Nelson Rojas 2017 Bankruptcy Court docket excerpt |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Nelson Rojas - 2017 Bankruptcy Petition listing Delgado Judgment |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Motion papers filed by counsel for Nelson Rojas in Bankruptcy Court |
||
September 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5) Affirmation of Bernard D'Orazio |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Transcript excerpt - April 18,.2023 hearing in Bankruptcy Court |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) 2016 Nelson Rojas Bankruptcy - Order dismissing case without discharge |
||
August 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
July 07, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #5) Stipulation Adjourning Motion for a Stay and to Vacate |
||
June 30, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #5) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.