Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Ching Fen Huang, Hsi Keng Huang, Hsi Keng Huang, Sz Hua Huang, Sz Hua Huang, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by B. Mark Fong, Doris Cheng, against Tesla Inc., Tesla, Inc., The State Of California, Department Of Transportation, represented by Daniel C Posner, Landa Siu Low, Rosemary Iola Love, Vincent Galvin, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
|
Last RefreshedJune 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions291 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs SZ HUA HUANG, Individually and as successor in interest to WEI LUN HUANG, deceased; TRINITY HUANG, a minor; TRISTAN HUANG, a minor; HSI KENG HUANG; and CHING FEN HUANG against Defendants TESLA INC. dba TESLA MOTO...
Exhibit List (Party)
Date: April 23, 2024Request
Date: May 09, 2024Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: May 20, 2024Trial Minute Order
Date: May 20, 2024Declaration
Date: April 22, 2024Motion: In Limine
Date: April 22, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2024Response/Reply
Date: April 23, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 07, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 08, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 23, 2024Trial Minute Order
Date: May 13, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 09, 2024Declaration
Date: May 13, 2024Motion: In Limine
Date: May 13, 2024Declaration
Date: May 13, 2024Trial Minute Order
Date: May 21, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 25, 2024Jury Fee Deposit
Date: April 26, 2024Trial Minute Order
Date: May 15, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 06, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 22, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 23, 2024Trial Minute Order
Date: May 22, 2024Juror Questionnaire (Proposed)
Date: May 24, 2024Verdict
Date: May 28, 2024Order
Date: May 23, 2024Trial Minute Order
Date: May 14, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: May 14, 2024Order After Hearing - POS
Date: June 07, 2024Trial Minute Order
Date: May 23, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 28, 2024Juror Questionnaire (Proposed)
Date: May 28, 2024Motion: Other
Date: May 28, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 22, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 29, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 30, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 01, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 02, 2024Motion: In Limine
Date: May 13, 2024Minute Order
Date: May 16, 2024Motion: Reconsideration
Date: May 17, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: May 20, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: May 20, 2024Notice of Hearing (no fee)
Date: May 28, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: June 06, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: June 14, 2024Conference: Case Management
Date: August 06, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 10, 2019Hearing: Demurrer
Date: February 11, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: July 14, 2020Motion: Strike
Date: July 28, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 08, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: April 15, 2024Declaration
Date: April 15, 2024Brief: Trial
Date: April 15, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: April 15, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 16, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 15, 2024Minute Order
Date: August 08, 2023Motion: Other
Date: August 01, 2023Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: September 12, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 31, 2023Notice: Entry of Order
Date: October 26, 2023Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: January 10, 2024Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: April 12, 2024Motion: Good Faith Settlement
Date: April 08, 2024Motion: Seal
Date: April 08, 2024Minute Order
Date: April 08, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: April 12, 2024Motion: In Limine
Date: April 11, 2024Statement
Date: April 12, 2024Jury Instructions (Proposed)
Date: April 12, 2024Separate Statement
Date: April 06, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: April 20, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 23, 2023Order After Hearing - POS
Date: May 24, 2023Response/Reply
Date: June 09, 2023Notice
Date: August 15, 2023Minute Order
Date: August 06, 2019Order
Date: October 25, 2023Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 18, 2019Declaration
Date: October 25, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 17, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 20, 2020Response/Reply
Date: July 21, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 28, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: April 20, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: April 20, 2023Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: June 08, 2023Jury Questions
Date: April 05, 2024Jury Instructions (Proposed)
Date: April 05, 2024Notice
Date: June 16, 2023Minute Order
Date: April 11, 2024Declaration
Date: April 20, 2023Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 11, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: April 08, 2024Brief
Date: April 12, 2024Motion: Compel
Date: April 20, 2023Request
Date: April 11, 2024Notice: Entry of Order
Date: June 01, 2023Motion: Protective Order
Date: June 05, 2023Declaration
Date: April 11, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: June 05, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration
Date: October 19, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: October 19, 2023Proof of Service
Date: April 15, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: May 18, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 14, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: March 27, 2020Response/Reply
Date: February 04, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 23, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: July 09, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: February 11, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 11, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 27, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: March 27, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 01, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 15, 2020Response/Reply
Date: April 20, 2023Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 27, 2023Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: May 18, 2023Order After Hearing - POS
Date: April 28, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 16, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 18, 2023Minute Order
Date: June 22, 2023Motion: Reconsideration
Date: May 22, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: May 22, 2023Stipulation
Date: June 29, 2023Declaration
Date: August 01, 2023Declaration
Date: August 01, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: October 25, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: October 25, 2023Request
Date: November 29, 2023Proof of Service
Date: April 05, 2024Statement
Date: April 05, 2024Motion: Strike
Date: May 18, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 18, 2020Order
Date: July 10, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: June 19, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 10, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: January 29, 2020Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 26, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 19, 2020Response/Reply
Date: June 30, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: September 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 21, 2019Declaration
Date: April 20, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 25, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: July 14, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 26, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: May 18, 2020Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 26, 2023Application: Pro Hac Vice
Date: May 25, 2023Stipulation and Order
Date: June 12, 2020Order: Continuance
Date: June 29, 2023Request
Date: July 24, 2020Order: Submitted Matter
Date: July 30, 2020Request
Date: July 31, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: October 24, 2023Exhibit List (Court)
Date: April 21, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 24, 2023Minute Order
Date: April 27, 2023Order: Submitted Matter
Date: November 17, 2023Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: June 29, 2023Proof of Service
Date: June 29, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 01, 2023Declaration
Date: October 31, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 31, 2023Minute Order
Date: November 07, 2023Request
Date: November 06, 2023Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 06, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: June 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Fees Posted $2,842.14 Check # 158728 |
|
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS **efs 6-13-24 jm**Order Granting Tesla Inc's Motion to Seal Settlement Amount Declaration |
|
June 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO TESLA, INC.S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR LIMITED RESTRICTIONS ON PUBLIC DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION DURING TRIAL (Oppositions) |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Verdict Special Verdict Form; |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Trial Minutes - Day 32, 5/28/24 |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Juror Questionnaire (Proposed) Jury Questions |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CURE THE DEFECT CAUSED BY CALTRANS IMPROPER ARGUMENT ABOUT THE LAW |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Instructions (Final) | |
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Defendant Caltrans' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Cure |
|
May 28, 2024 | Hearing | Jury Trial: Long Cause (Ongoing) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.