Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Reyes, Anita, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Steele, Eugenia L, against Madera Community College Center, State Center Community College District, represented by Demaria, Anthony N., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management128 days |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
This complaint is filed by Anita Reyes, a California resident with physical disabilities who requires a wheelchair for mobility. The defendants in this case are the State Center Community College District, Madera Community College Center, and Does 1-...
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 28, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 24, 2020ADR Stipulation filed
Date: October 06, 2020Statement filed
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: February 11, 2021Statement filed
Date: February 11, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 11, 2021Statement filed
Date: February 11, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 08, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: February 11, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: April 15, 2021Order filed
Date: April 23, 2021Stipulation Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Reply filed
Date: May 03, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 01, 2021Reply filed
Date: April 29, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 11, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: October 21, 2019Summons issued and filed
Date: October 22, 2019Notice Filed
Date: February 26, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 20, 2019Notice Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 06, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: October 22, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 11, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: April 20, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 11, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 11, 2020Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: February 20, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Notice Filed
Date: February 05, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 30, 2020Answer Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: July 08, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: June 01, 2021Order filed
Date: June 22, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 07, 2022Order Denied
Date: June 21, 2022Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 09, 2022Statement filed
Date: April 20, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 20, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 26, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 13, 2020Stipulation Filed
Date: February 07, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 05, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: October 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Est. 5-7 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
06.22.22 Order filed on Request for PTDC re: 6/9/21 Order filed Order on Request for PTDC & CM (re Request filed 6/9/22) Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Order on Request for PTDC & CM (re Request filed 6/7/22) Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed Forwarded to dept. 403 (Opposition Due: 6/21/22) |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
6/7/22 Pretrial Conference Request Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed FWD to 403 (Opposition Due: 06/19/22) |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Estimated 5-7 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.