Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Taghavi, Ali, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Hagen, Fredrick A, against Alticor, Inc., A Michigan Corporation, Does 1-10, Inclusive, The Leland Stanford Junior University, A California Nonprofit Corporation, represented by Eklof, Amber A., Kubin, Karen J., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management128 days |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2017 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Time To Trial405 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time532 days |
Motion to Quash
Date: November 26, 2018Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Date: November 29, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 01, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: August 31, 2018Declaration in Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 21, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 10, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 26, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 31, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 31, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 02, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 26, 2018Evidence
Date: November 02, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 26, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 31, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Objections to Evidence
Date: November 09, 2018Compendium of Evidence in Support of
Date: October 26, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 02, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 26, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 11, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: November 02, 2018Objections to Evidence
Date: November 02, 2018Order Denying
Date: November 15, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 16, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 11, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 11, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 11, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 08, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 17, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 10, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 10, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 14, 2018First Amended Complaint
Date: February 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 24, 2018Compendium of Evidence in Support of
Date: August 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 26, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 02, 2018Complaint
Date: October 04, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: October 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 02, 2018Separate Statement
Date: November 02, 2018Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: August 31, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 31, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 20, 2018Separate Statement
Date: October 11, 2018Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: November 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 09, 2018Notice
Date: November 20, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: July 30, 2018Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion
Date: November 16, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 26, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: March 20, 2019Notice
Date: February 05, 2019Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: February 05, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: January 11, 2019Order
Date: November 26, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: November 26, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 26, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 20, 2018Order
Date: November 20, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 16, 2018Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion
Date: November 16, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 16, 2018Motion for Summary of Judgment/Adjudication of Issues
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 14, 2018Notice
Date: November 14, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 14, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 14, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 14, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: November 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 09, 2018Notice
Date: November 09, 2018Notice
Date: November 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 09, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 09, 2018Order
Date: November 08, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: November 08, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 06, 2018Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: November 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 02, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 01, 2018Declaration
Date: November 01, 2018Separate Statement
Date: November 01, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: November 01, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 26, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 24, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 24, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 24, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: October 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: October 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 11, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 01, 2018Opposition
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: September 28, 2018Separate Statement
Date: September 21, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 21, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: September 21, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: September 21, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: August 24, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 20, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL Notice OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 02/05/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Early Settlement Conference 01/25/2019 Early Settlement Conference Phone Conference, Post settlement Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Quash 01/11/2019 MOTION TO QUASH DUPLICATIVE SUBPOENAS TO FORMER EMPLOYERS Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.