Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Maria Canul, filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSocrates P. Manoukian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a consumer class action brought by Maria Antonia Canul against Velocity Investments, LLC. Canul alleges that Velocity Investments engaged in abusive, deceptive, and unfair practices in violation of the California Fair Debt Buying Pr...
Minute Order
Date: October 25, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: October 11, 2023Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: September 27, 2023Memorandum of Costs
Date: December 12, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 11, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: October 11, 2023Judgment
Date: November 08, 2023Request: Judicial Notice
Date: September 27, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 11, 2023Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal
Date: December 19, 2023Order
Date: November 30, 2023Appeal: Receipt for Record
Date: January 03, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: September 27, 2023Request: Judicial Notice
Date: October 11, 2023Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration: In Opposition
Date: September 27, 2023Separate Statement
Date: September 27, 2023Notice
Date: November 27, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 11, 2023Deposit: Clerk's Transcript
Date: December 22, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: July 11, 2019Motion: Admissions Deemed Admitted
Date: July 11, 2019Motion: Strike
Date: September 10, 2019Motion: Set Aside
Date: July 07, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: February 17, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: February 24, 2021Conference: Case Management
Date: September 22, 2021Motion: Leave to File
Date: November 03, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: May 11, 2022Motion: Discovery
Date: May 11, 2022Hearing: Demurrer
Date: May 25, 2022Motion: Order
Date: June 22, 2022Conference: Case Management
Date: November 09, 2022Opposition/Objections
Date: September 27, 2023Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: September 25, 2019Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
Date: September 20, 2016Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 07, 2019Order
Date: July 23, 2019Cross-Complaint: Reclassifies to Unlimited
Date: February 19, 2019Answer (Limited): Up to $10K
Date: February 19, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 11, 2019Order
Date: July 23, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 23, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 11, 2021Application
Date: November 25, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 15, 2021Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 15, 2021Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: January 19, 2021Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Date: January 29, 2021Order
Date: January 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 17, 2021Notice of Hearing (no fee)
Date: June 08, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: February 22, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: February 22, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 05, 2022Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: February 18, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 25, 2020Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: January 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: June 23, 2020Proof of Service
Date: August 27, 2019Notice
Date: September 30, 2019Proof of Service: Mail
Date: August 11, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: February 23, 2022Request: Judicial Notice
Date: January 05, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: November 04, 2021Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: April 05, 2021Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: December 20, 2021Declaration
Date: December 20, 2021Proof of Service: Mail
Date: November 04, 2021Proof of Service: Mail
Date: November 19, 2021Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: December 07, 2021Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: February 20, 2018Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: January 29, 2021Proof of Service: Mail
Date: February 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 20, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 19, 2019Notice
Date: February 28, 2022Notice
Date: February 28, 2022Demurrer
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Service: Mail
Date: May 07, 2019Request
Date: March 10, 2022Declaration: In Support
Date: April 01, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: April 01, 2022Evidence
Date: April 01, 2022Motion: Order
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration: In Support
Date: April 01, 2022Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration: In Support
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration: In Support
Date: April 01, 2022Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: June 06, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: June 15, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: June 15, 2022Response/Reply
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: May 18, 2022Notice
Date: May 05, 2022Order
Date: May 11, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 05, 2022Request
Date: April 20, 2022Declaration: In Support
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition/Objections
Date: April 20, 2022Proof of Service
Date: April 20, 2022Notice: Entry of Order
Date: May 26, 2022Notice: Entry of Order
Date: May 26, 2022Opposition/Objections
Date: May 12, 2022Order
Date: May 25, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2022Response/Reply
Date: April 27, 2022Objection: Evidence
Date: April 27, 2022Response/Reply
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition/Objections
Date: April 20, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Service
Date: April 20, 2022Declaration: In Opposition
Date: April 20, 2022Opposition/Objections
Date: April 20, 2022Request: Judicial Notice
Date: April 20, 2022Declaration
Date: April 20, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 22, 2022Notice
Date: June 28, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: September 27, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: September 27, 2023Declaration: In Opposition
Date: September 27, 2023Request: Judicial Notice
Date: September 27, 2023Declaration: In Opposition
Date: September 27, 2023Separate Statement
Date: September 27, 2023Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: September 20, 2016Declaration
Date: August 27, 2019Declaration
Date: May 07, 2019Declaration
Date: August 11, 2021Declaration
Date: January 15, 2021Declaration
Date: February 17, 2021Notice
Date: August 02, 2021Notice
Date: September 23, 2021Declaration
Date: January 05, 2022Motion: Strike
Date: January 05, 2022Substitution: Attorney
Date: August 06, 2019Default Not Entered
Date: May 02, 2019Substitution: Attorney
Date: November 29, 2021Declaration
Date: February 22, 2022Substitution: Attorney
Date: September 20, 2021Order: Proposed
Date: January 05, 2022Notice
Date: January 19, 2022Declaration
Date: February 22, 2022Notice
Date: February 22, 2021Notice
Date: June 14, 2021Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: March 03, 2021Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: February 22, 2022Notice
Date: January 06, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: January 20, 2022Motion: Discovery
Date: February 22, 2022New Filed Case
Date: September 20, 2016Evidence
Date: September 27, 2023Minute Order
Date: September 22, 2021Response/Reply
Date: February 17, 2021Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 19, 2021Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 26, 2021Order: Submitted Matter
Date: February 26, 2021Motion: Leave
Date: August 11, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 03, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 09, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: January 15, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: February 11, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 11, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: February 09, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 30, 2021Order
Date: November 04, 2021Order: Submitted Matter
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 19, 2021Amended Cross-Complaint - No Fee
Date: November 04, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 11, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: August 18, 2022Declaration: In Opposition
Date: August 18, 2022Motion: Order
Date: August 31, 2022Response/Reply
Date: August 24, 2022Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 24, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: August 24, 2022Declaration: In Support
Date: August 24, 2022Notice: Entry of Order
Date: September 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 31, 2022Order
Date: August 31, 2022Notice
Date: September 18, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: August 04, 2023Notice
Date: October 06, 2022Notice
Date: October 26, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: November 02, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 04, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: November 04, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: November 02, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: November 07, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: November 09, 2022Notice
Date: November 10, 2022Request: Dismissal
Date: August 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 07, 2020Notice
Date: December 06, 2022Declaration
Date: February 21, 2023Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: February 21, 2023Notice
Date: March 14, 2023Notice
Date: March 28, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 22, 2023Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2023Notice
Date: July 07, 2023Exhibit List (Party)
Date: July 21, 2023Exhibit List (Party)
Date: July 21, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: July 21, 2023Evidence
Date: July 21, 2023Separate Statement
Date: July 21, 2023Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: July 21, 2023Proof of Service
Date: July 21, 2023Request: Judicial Notice
Date: July 21, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: July 21, 2023Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: July 21, 2023Request: Judicial Notice
Date: July 21, 2023Separate Statement
Date: July 21, 2023Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: July 21, 2023Notice
Date: July 21, 2023Notice: Entry of Order
Date: August 13, 2019Motion: Set Aside/Vacate
Date: August 06, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: May 07, 2019Response/Reply
Date: September 03, 2019Motion: Set Aside/Vacate
Date: March 23, 2020Order
Date: September 19, 2019Motion: Other
Date: May 07, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: August 13, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 29, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: May 07, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: August 27, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Appeal: Receipt for Record | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Deposit: Clerk's Transcript Taken on Notice of Undocumented Action, $100.00 Check #17073 |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal mailed 12/19 |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal H051695 |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal 8.124 (UN) 8.124 no RTs |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal 8.124 (UN) Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order HRG 10/25/23 Order After Hearing (Motion to Seal, MSJ/MSADJ) - signed/TCZ. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.