Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Guerrero v. OwensCypress Insurance Company v. Owens
A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Dalesandro, Samuel presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2016
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2023
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
civil
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Consolidation
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 20 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 5 months and 22 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
2. Partial Indemnification as Against All Cross-Defendants
3. Apportionment of Fault
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Order filed
Date: Nov 06, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: Nov 02, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: Nov 02, 2018Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: Nov 01, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: Oct 31, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: Oct 22, 2018Notice Filed
Date: Oct 22, 2018Opposition filed
Date: Oct 19, 2018Stipulation Filed
Date: Oct 05, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: Oct 03, 2018Reply filed
Date: Sep 26, 2018Reply filed
Date: Sep 26, 2018Opposition filed
Date: Sep 17, 2018Cross Complaint Filed
Date: Aug 24, 2018Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: Aug 21, 2018Motion filed
Date: Aug 16, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: Aug 16, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: Aug 16, 2018Reply filed
Date: Aug 14, 2018Opposition filed
Date: Aug 08, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: Jul 24, 2018Statement filed
Date: Jul 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: Jul 24, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: Jul 24, 2018Statement filed
Date: Jul 24, 2018Application Filed
Date: Jul 24, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: Jul 16, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: Jul 16, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: Jul 16, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: Mar 07, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: Feb 20, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: Feb 20, 2018Motion filed
Date: Feb 20, 2018ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: Feb 14, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: Dec 06, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: Nov 29, 2017Request for Judical Notice
Date: Oct 13, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: Oct 13, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: Oct 13, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: Oct 13, 2017Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: Jun 15, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: Jun 08, 2017Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro
Date: Jun 08, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: May 10, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: May 10, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: Apr 03, 2017Cross Complaint Filed
Date: Jan 18, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: Jan 10, 2017Civil Complaint filed
Date: Dec 05, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order filed Order Granting Defendant Quail Lake Community Association's Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature (Forwarded to Dept 501 on 11/5/18) Order Denying the Owens Defendants' Motion to Content Good Faith Settlement |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature (Forwarded to Dept 501 on 11/5/18) Order Granting Defendant, Quail Lake Community Association's Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) General Motion re: Mtn Good Faith Settlement, Oral Argument re: Summary Judgment |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter court reporter, Kim Thayer Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Anthony DeMaria Deft. (Quail Lake/ Atty DeMaria) make request for oral argument. Per Court, to be heard 11/01/2018 @ 3 p.m. w/ Mtn for Good Faith Settlement Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Motion re: Good Faith Settlement Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Summary Judgment |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Rayelle Sabo (JYH) Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Tentative Ruling | 17CECG01087 Motion: By Defendant Quail Lake Community Association for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication. Tentative Ruling: To continue the hearing to 3:00 p.m. on Thurs...
Judge: Jeffrey Y. Hamilton |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Defendant, Quail Lake Community Association's Notice of the Parties' Non-Opposition to the Pending Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition filed Quail Lake Community Association's Opposition and Objection to Declaration of Richard K. Haygood |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee Answer Filed |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mtn. MSJ Opp. service Opposition filed HRG Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed HRG 10/25/18 DECLARATION OF RICHARD K. HAYGOOD, P.E., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S, IAIN LEVI OWNES AND RICHARD L. OWENS MOTION TO CONTEST APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed Set for 12/03/2018 @ 10am Dept. 305 Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre continue trial Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed Forwarded to Dept 501 on 10/8/18 |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Gen Mtn re: Good Faith Settlement |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Motion Contest Good Faith Settlement - Rayelle Sabo Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
October 01, 2018 | Tentative Ruling | (Consolidated with 17CECG01087) Motion: For order determining good faith settlement. Tentative Ruling: To deny the application for an Order Determining Good Faith Settlement without prejudice. Explana...
Judge: Jeffrey Y. Hamilton |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply filed HRG 10/6/18 Reply Declaration in Support of Motion to Contest Application for Order Determining Good Faith Settlement |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply filed HRG 10/3/18 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Contest Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition filed Opposition to Motion to Contest Quail Lake Community Association's Application for Good Faith Settlement with Cypress Insurance Company |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Daniel L. Wainwright in Support of Defendant, Quail Lake Community Associations' Opposition to Motion to Contest Application for Good Faith Settlement with Cypress Insurance Company |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee Answer Filed |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service as to Jakusz Property Management |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service DEFECTIVE: Item 3a is reserved for one party being served only. Item 3b is reserved for either Agent for Service/Person Authorized to Accept. If Person Authorized to Accept is listed in Item 3a he/she cannot be under Item 5b. |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons and Cross-Complaint Jakusz Property Management-DEFECTIVE: Item 3a can only state one party. Declaration of Diligence needs to show 3 attempts on 3 separate days were done in order to serve an individal party. |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Jakusz Property Management-DEFECTIVE: Item 3a can only state one party. Declaration of Diligence needs to show 3 attempts on 3 separate days were done in order to serve an individal party. |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cross Action/Cross Complaint Cross Complaint Filed 2nd Cross Complaint |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed calendar setting |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) General Motion re: Leave to File Compulsory Cross-Complaint |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Motion to file untimely cross-complaint; David McDowell (JYH) Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion filed HRG 10-03-18 Notice of Motion and Motion to contest application for determinatior of good faith settlement |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities HRG 10-03-18 Defendant Iain Levy Ownes and Richard L. Owens II Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of motion to contest application for order determining good faith settlement |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature HRG 10-03-18 Order Denying Defendant Quail Lake Community Association's Application for Determination of Good faith settlement |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed HRG 10-03-18 Declartion of David A. McDowell in support of motion to contest application for order determining good faith settlement |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply filed Reply memorandum in support of motion for leave to file compulsory cross complaint |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Supplemental Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Order Granting Leave to File Compulsory Cross-Complaint |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition filed to Motion for Order Granting Leave to file Compulsory Cross Complaint |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Daniel L. Wainwright In Support of Defendant, Quail Lake Community Associations's Opposition to Motion for Order Granting Leave to File Comulsory Cross-Complaint |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Amended POS Re: Ian Levin Owens, Richard L. Owens II & Jennifer M. Owens motion for leave to file compulsory cross-complaint |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service regarding Good Faith Settlement as to Quail Lake Community Association |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ntc. Entry Disml. service Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Req. Disml. service Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Partial Dismissal |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication Notice of Motion |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement of Undisputed Statement filed |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to RA for further research. Forwarded (on 7/27/2018) to Dept: 501/RA Order: Application for Good Faith Settlement |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement of Evidence Statement filed |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application Filed for Good Faith Settlement |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature ***Pending Until Hearing*** |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of motion in support of Motion for order granting leave to file compulsory cross-complaint | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration in support of motion for order granting leave to file compulsory cross-complaint |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by Defendant with an estimated time of 5-7 days Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel Production of documents; Daniel Wainwright Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel Form interrogatories; Daniel Wainwright Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel Request for admissions; Daniel Wainwright Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Old Attorney: Marshal R. Parks New Attorney: David McDowell |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of withdrawal of motion to compel initial responses for production |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of withdrawal of motion to compel deem admitted |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of withdrawal of motion to compel initial responses to form and special rogs and request for sanctions |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Trial Setting |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Declaration in support Declaration Filed |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion to compel Motion filed |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation on consolidated parties Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:Laurie Q. Saldana, Esq. |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney/Counsel Association of Attorney filed |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment re: Mtn to Consolidate w/ 17CECG01087 |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion - Consolidate
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment re: Motion Consolidate |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion - Consolidate Anthony DeMaria (with case 17CECG01087) Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 28, 2017 | Tentative Ruling | 17CECG01087 3:30 p.m. (Dept. 402) Motion: By Defendant Quail Lake Community Association to consolidate Guerror v. Owens, 16CECG03895 and Cypress Insurance Company v. Owens, 17CECG01087. Tentative Ruli...
Judge: Jeff Hamilton |
|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Filed | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Judical Notice in support of motion to consolidate |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion to: Consolidate |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of motion to consolidate |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature *PENDING REVIEW UNTIL HEARING* |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Ryan B. Kalashian in support of motion to consolidate |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Deposit of Fees Deposit, payment,disbursment Motion to Compel Fees |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) re: Motion Compel |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel Marshal Parks initial Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
June 14, 2017 | Tentative Ruling | Motion: Motion to compel plaintiff to provide initial verified responses to form interrogatories, set one, special interrogatories, set one and request for production of documents, set one and sanctio...
Judge: Jeff Hamilton |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ADR Stip. service ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed Not signed by: Anthony DeMaria Party(s) who signed: Scott E. Spell, Marshal R. Parks ADR method chosen: Mediation |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and motion to: compel initial responses to form interrogatories and request for production |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature *PENDING REVIEW UNTIL HEARING* |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Marshal R. Parks |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) Motion filed to compel initial responses to form interrogatories and request for production |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Req. Mini-Openings & Supp. Ct. VD service Request Filed for mini-openings and supplemental court-conducted voir-dire |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ntc. Rlg. & Trl. service Notice Filed of ruling |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Requested by Party Quail Lake, estimated time of 5-7 days |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
CMS service Case Management Statement Filed |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ntc. Chg. Add. service Notice of Change of Address Filed |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons issued and filed to 1st Cross-Complaint |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cross Action/Cross Complaint Cross Complaint Filed 1st Cross-Complaint. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee Answer Filed to Complaint. |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed Case Management Statement |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Deposit Notice Filed |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee Answer Filed |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
POS (Iain) Proof of Service |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Fees Deposit, payment,disbursment of Jury Fees paid by Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
CCCS Civil case cover sheet |