Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Farmers National Bank Of D, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Dailey, Austin Todd, against Hyde, Vicki Delyse, Jane Doe, John Doe, Joshua Lane Moses The Duly App, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: December 05, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: October 22, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED VICKI DELYS HYDE
Date: November 13, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JANE DOE
Date: November 13, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JOHN DOE
Date: November 13, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING
Date: December 27, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: December 05, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 22, 2019ANSWER FILED BY DEFT VICKI DELYS HYDE
Date: January 30, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING
Date: December 13, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: November 13, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: October 22, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: November 13, 2019EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE
Date: November 14, 2019AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: December 05, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: October 22, 2019EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING
Date: November 22, 2019ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY/ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AMENDED FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: January 16, 2020EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: December 19, 2019MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE FILED BY PLTF FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: February 28, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: January 24, 2020MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: January 17, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT VICKI DELYS HYDE
Date: February 18, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT VICKI D HYDE
Date: February 13, 2020OATH OF GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY/ADMINISTRATOR OF AD LITEM
Date: January 17, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY DEFT VICKI DELYS HYDE
Date: February 18, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 01, 2022AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: May 08, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTF NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLES MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 06, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: October 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: October 06, 2020NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS NOT ATTACHED FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: October 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: October 06, 2020MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PLTF FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: October 06, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FILED BY DEFT VICKI DELYS HYDE
Date: January 18, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 14, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PLTFS ATTORNEYS FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: October 06, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: October 21, 2020ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 15, 2021SUGGESTION OF DEATH AND MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY FILED BY PLTF
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFT
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: December 15, 2021PROMISSORY NOTE - ORIGINAL AND ORIGINAL MODIFICATION FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK
Date: October 26, 2021ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: October 28, 2021EFILED NOTICE OF SALE
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF THE FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF PLTFS ATTORNEYS
Date: January 18, 2022EFILED NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 04, 2022CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTFS ATTORNEY RE DISBURSEMENT CHECK
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY PLTF FARMERS NATIONAL BANK OF DANVILLE
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: February 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT FILED BY ROBERT D. WILSON
Date: January 26, 2022CLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST
Date: February 03, 2022ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF SALE AMENDED
Date: February 11, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 28, 2022ORDER GRANTING OWNERS CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE SURPLUS
Date: June 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED
Date: April 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: April 07, 2022NOTICE TO FINANCE DEPARTMENT REQUEST FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS
Date: June 16, 2022ASSIGNMENT OF BID FILED BY PURCHASER
Date: April 14, 2022COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED
Date: June 23, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: April 19, 2022REGISTRY-PARTIALLY DISBURSED
Date: April 21, 2022MOTION-OWNERS CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FILED BY LAURA COVELL
Date: April 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 7 assessed at sum $15.00 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $15.00 Receipt Number XX 757775 | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO FINANCE DEPARTMENT REQUEST FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT COPY TO FINANCE ORDER TO DISBURSE EMAILED TO FINANCE | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 06/15/2022 | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING OWNERS CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE SURPLUS | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTFS ATTORNEY RE DISBURSEMENT CHECK | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 04/22/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.