Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brilliant, Barry, Hoheneck-Smith, Dagmar K., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Bacho, Davin Richard, against Black, Deanne G., Black Knight Vineyards, Llc, Black, Mitchell G., represented by Greenberg, Mitchell Bruce, Watters, Michael George, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHonigsberg, Christopher M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Defendants' Answer to FAC
Date: February 24, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: February 24, 2022Stipulation_and_Order_to_e_Trial_Date_signed_
Date: March 10, 2022Proposed_Order
Date: April 07, 2022Plaintiffs_Ex_Parte_Application
Date: April 07, 2022Decl_of_DRB
Date: April 07, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Order_6_22_Stip_and_Order_
Date: April 07, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Order_7_22_Ex_Parte_Order_
Date: April 07, 2022Doe_Amendment_to_FAC
Date: August 26, 2022Declaration iso Attorney's Mtn
Date: September 13, 2022Ntc of Mtn & Mtn Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 13, 2022Amended NOM & Mtn Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 14, 2022Amended Declaration iso Motion
Date: September 14, 2022Ex_Parte_Notice_and_Application
Date: September 14, 2022Decl_of_DRB
Date: September 14, 2022Plaintiffs_Opposition
Date: September 15, 2022Decl_of_DRB
Date: September 15, 202263482Propo0265f7
Date: September 15, 2022Notice_of_Entry_of_Order_re_Doe_Amendment
Date: September 15, 202263482ExPar0087d3
Date: September 15, 2022Doe_Amendment_to_FAC_subbing_LLC
Date: September 15, 202263482Decla01f062
Date: September 15, 2022POS_to_FAC_on_LLC
Date: September 15, 202263482Proof03fbce
Date: September 15, 2022Black Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 16, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Non-Opposition
Date: September 28, 2022Greenberg M & C Declaration
Date: October 03, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 07, 2022Sub - Deanne
Date: October 12, 2022Sub - Mitch
Date: October 12, 2022Sub - BKV
Date: October 12, 2022POS to file with court
Date: October 12, 2022Answer_to_XC
Date: October 13, 2022Answer
Date: October 20, 2022Answer of LLC
Date: November 17, 2022Trial Brief
Date: February 23, 2023Dec of Tapley with exhibits
Date: February 01, 2023Notice and Memo to Augment
Date: February 01, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_3_of_5_Su_al_Expert_Disclosure
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_2_of_5_Hearsay
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_1_of_5_Im_r_Character_Evidence
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_CACI_List_of_Jury_Instructions
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_Verdict_Forms
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_Request_Special_Voir_Dire
Date: February 16, 2023Proof_of_Service
Date: February 16, 2023Trial_Brief_Plaintiffs_
Date: February 16, 2023Joint_Witness_List
Date: February 16, 2023Joint_Neutral_Statement
Date: February 16, 2023Joint_Est_Length_of_Jury_Trial
Date: February 16, 2023Defendants Witness List
Date: February 16, 2023Defendants List of Proposed CACI Instructions
Date: February 16, 2023POS for filing - BLACK - WL
Date: February 16, 2023No 2 Rule on Discovery Motion
Date: February 15, 2023No. 1 To exclude different opinions
Date: February 15, 2023POS re MILs
Date: February 15, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_3_of_5_RFJN_ISO_MIL_3_of_5
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_4_of_5_Pr_Mediation_Privilege
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_4_of_5_RFJN_ISO_MIL_4_of_5
Date: February 16, 2023Trial_Orders_Signed
Date: February 16, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_5_OF_5_Pr_ce_of_Defedants_PTSD
Date: February 16, 2023No 3 to exclude expert opinion on law
Date: February 17, 2023Proof_of_Service_to_MIL_6_and_7
Date: February 17, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_6_RFJN_ISO_MIL_6
Date: February 17, 2023Plaintiffs_Supplemental_Motion_in_Limine_No_7
Date: February 17, 2023Plaintiffs_Supplemental_MIL_6
Date: February 17, 2023Defendants Proposed Voir Dire by the Court
Date: February 21, 2023Plaintiffs_Opp_to_MIL_3
Date: February 21, 2023Plaintiffs_Opp_to_MIL_2
Date: February 21, 2023Plaintiffs_Opp_to_MIL_1
Date: February 21, 2023Opposition_and_Demand_fo_In_Limine_of_Dept_18
Date: February 21, 2023Proof_of_Service
Date: February 21, 2023Defendants Opp to MIL No 3
Date: February 22, 2023POES - Oppos to MILs
Date: February 22, 2023Defendants Opp to MIL No 6
Date: February 22, 2023Defendants_Opp_to_MIL_No_4
Date: February 22, 2023Defendants Opp to MIL No 7
Date: February 22, 2023Defendants Opp to MIL No 2
Date: February 22, 2023Plaintiffs_Opp_to_MIL_2_RFJN
Date: February 21, 2023Proof_of_Electronic_Service_MIL_Oppo_No_4
Date: February 22, 2023POES - Trial Brief and RJN
Date: February 23, 2023Trial RJN
Date: February 23, 2023Plaintiffs_RFJN_at_Trial
Date: February 24, 2023Decl_of_Bacho_ISO_of_Motion
Date: March 07, 2023Plaintiffs_RFJN_re_13A
Date: March 07, 2023Plaintiffs_Brief_re_13A
Date: March 07, 2023Plaintiffs_MIL_No_8_Prec_rt_Opinion_Testimony
Date: March 07, 2023Ntc of Appeal - MGW Signed
Date: April 04, 2023Los_Angeles_Co
Date: April 07, 2023Defendants Notice of Intent
Date: April 03, 2023Sonoma_Co
Date: April 07, 2023Abstract_of_Judgment
Date: March 29, 2023Notice_of_Entry_of_Judgment
Date: March 30, 2023Brief in Support of Post-Trial Motions
Date: April 14, 2023Memo P and A
Date: April 14, 2023Declaration of Graden R. Tapley
Date: April 14, 2023Mtn Vacate Judgment
Date: April 14, 2023Joyce Declaration Pt 1
Date: April 14, 2023Dec of Joyce Whitaker - Fire
Date: April 14, 2023Mitch Black dec
Date: April 14, 2023EFS-020 - Proposed Order (Cover Sheet)
Date: April 14, 2023EFS-050 - Proof of Electronic Service_Redacted
Date: April 14, 2023Mtn JNOV
Date: April 14, 2023Memo P and A (1)
Date: April 14, 2023EFS-050 - Proof of Electronic Service
Date: April 14, 2023Dec of MGW in Sppt of Post-Judgment Motions
Date: April 14, 2023Dec of J. Whitaker re Trees - PT 3 K-P
Date: April 14, 2023Dec of Joyce W re Fire
Date: April 14, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 14, 2023POS_Mtn_for_Attys_Fees
Date: April 14, 2023Separate_Statement_ISO_Mtn_for_Attys_Fees
Date: April 14, 2023Decl_of_Bacho_ISO_Mtn_for_Attys_Fees
Date: April 14, 2023MPA_to_Mtn_for_Attys_Fees
Date: April 14, 2023Notice_and_Mtn_for_Attys_Fees
Date: April 14, 2023Memo_of_Costs_Summary_
Date: April 14, 2023Dec of J. Whitaker re Trees - PT 3 K-P
Date: April 17, 2023Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Atty_Fees
Date: April 17, 2023Part 2.1 2nd half of Ex. G to J2
Date: April 17, 2023Part 3 - Ex. K-P
Date: April 17, 2023Part 2 1st half of Ex. G
Date: April 17, 2023Joyce Dec Part 1
Date: April 19, 2023Part 2.1 2nd half of Ex. G to J2
Date: April 19, 2023Part 2 1st half of Ex. G
Date: April 19, 2023Joyce Declaration Pt 1
Date: April 19, 2023POES
Date: April 20, 2023Opp_to_Motion_for_New_Trial
Date: April 25, 2023Plaintiffs_Objections_to_Evidence
Date: April 25, 2023Plaintiffs_RFJN_of_Opp_to_MFNT
Date: April 25, 2023Opp_to_Motion_to_Vacate_Judgment
Date: April 25, 2023Decl_of_Bacho_ISO_of_Opp_to_MFNT
Date: April 25, 2023Proof_of_Service
Date: April 25, 2023Opp_to_Motion_for_JNOV
Date: April 25, 2023POS_Notice_of_Non_Reply
Date: May 03, 2023Notice_of_Non_Reply_to_O_Motion_for_New_Trial
Date: May 03, 2023Notice_of_Non_Reply_to_Opp_re_Motion_to_Vacate
Date: May 03, 2023Notice_of_Non_Reply_to_Opp_re_Motion_for_JNOV
Date: May 03, 2023Declaration of Ed Lear
Date: May 13, 2023Declaration of TTW
Date: May 13, 2023Defendants Opposition to Motion for AF
Date: May 13, 2023Dec of GRT
Date: May 12, 2023Dec of GRT
Date: May 13, 2023Declaration of MGW
Date: May 13, 2023Declaration of Ed Lear
Date: May 12, 2023Declaration of MGW
Date: May 12, 2023Declaration of TTW
Date: May 12, 2023Defendants Opposition to Motion for AF
Date: May 12, 2023Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Opposition
Date: May 16, 2023Decl_of_Dagmar_Hoheneck_Smith
Date: May 19, 2023Reply
Date: May 19, 2023Decl_of_JSL
Date: May 19, 2023POS
Date: May 19, 2023Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: May 24, 2023Respondents_Notice_Desig_ing_Record_on_Appeal
Date: May 31, 2023NOA - all remaining issues w POS
Date: June 07, 2023Notice_of_Entry_of_Order_Denying_Motions
Date: June 06, 2023Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: July 11, 2023Opposition
Date: August 17, 2023Notice_of_Non_Reply_to_O_Motion_to_Tax_Costs
Date: August 25, 2023Notice_of_Entry_of_Order_Denying_Motion
Date: September 07, 2023MPA_ISO_Reconsideration_of_Fee_Motion
Date: September 15, 2023NOM_and_Motion_for_Recon__ttorneys_Fees_Motion
Date: September 15, 2023Dec_ISO_Reconsideration_of_Fee_Motion
Date: September 15, 2023POS
Date: September 15, 2023Defendants Opposition
Date: November 01, 2023Plaintiffs_Ntc_of_Posting_of_Jury_fees
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Stay of Proceedings
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney's Fees
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendants Opposition | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of P&A's in Opposition Defendants' Memorandum of P&A's in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support Supplemental Declaration of Davin R Bacho |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Motion Re: Motion for attorney fees |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Davin R. Bacho ISO Motion |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Reconsideration re Attorney's Fees |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Motion/OSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.