Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Koop, Gary, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Kantor, Glenn Robert, against Fire Insurance Exchange, Dba Farmers Insurance Group, Hunsaker, Brian, represented by Finch, Albert Morris, Iii, Schwartz, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeMeo, Bradford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
Category18: Unlimited Insurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
93850DEFEN00bc75
Date: March 13, 202493850Decla016213
Date: March 13, 2024Koop - Plaintiffs Ex Parte Request for Continuance (with exhibits 1-6) 24-03-11
Date: March 12, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance by VRR 03.05.24
Date: March 05, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance by TAF 03.05.24
Date: March 05, 2024Koop - Notice of Remote Appearance - S. Tucker 24-03-02
Date: March 03, 202493069Notic0100b7
Date: March 01, 202493069Notic002dd0
Date: March 01, 202491091APPOI0016d0
Date: January 31, 2024Koop - Reply ISO Motion to Amend Expert Designation 24-01-26
Date: January 26, 2024Joinder to FIE Opp to TT Motion to Augment
Date: January 24, 202490312DECLA018bb7
Date: January 19, 202490312DEFEN0044a2
Date: January 19, 202454476Decla00fa8d
Date: March 08, 202256556STIPU0053d3
Date: April 21, 202286973PLAIN024769
Date: November 20, 202386973PLAIN00fe70
Date: November 20, 202386973DECLA01d0a7
Date: November 20, 2023Notice of Entry of Order 08.12.22 - Koop
Date: August 12, 202264833PLAIN0091f0
Date: October 13, 202264833PLAIN019844
Date: October 13, 202264833DECLA02c2ea
Date: October 13, 202264833PLAIN003523
Date: October 13, 202264833DECLA03b873
Date: October 13, 202264833REDAC043c62
Date: October 13, 202264833UNRED05ad29
Date: October 13, 202264805PLAIN00ddbc
Date: October 12, 2022Notice of Lodging Confidential docs
Date: October 21, 2022Redacted Reply To TTs Separate Stmt of Facts
Date: October 21, 2022POS - Redacted Reply to MSJ10.21.22
Date: October 21, 2022Redacted Reply to Opp ISO MSJ - 10.21.22
Date: October 21, 2022Redacted Objection to TTs Evidence 10.21.22
Date: October 21, 2022Decl of TAF pursuant to Rule 5.4 10.24.22
Date: October 24, 202265512Motio00a911
Date: October 26, 202265512Decla018726
Date: October 26, 202265512Decla031a0f
Date: October 26, 202265512Separ05353c
Date: October 26, 202265512Decla020658
Date: October 26, 202265512EVIDE0404c7
Date: October 26, 202265515REQUE03a214
Date: October 26, 202265515DECLA0254c0
Date: October 26, 202265515DECLA01a8c4
Date: October 26, 202265515PLAIN00f165
Date: October 26, 202265513Reque0058de
Date: October 26, 202265515REDAC042fa1
Date: October 26, 202265515REDAC06b6d6
Date: October 26, 202265515EVIDE059197
Date: October 26, 202265618NOTIC0157c1
Date: October 28, 202265618NOTIC00a4ad
Date: October 28, 202268103Stipu000694
Date: December 20, 202271934Decla00209f
Date: March 06, 202371933Decla0082ae
Date: March 06, 202371934Decla009a72
Date: March 06, 202371934Decla00ecde
Date: March 06, 202371932Decla005ebd
Date: March 06, 202371932Decla005fa2
Date: March 06, 202371966Decla00e1ef
Date: March 07, 202371934Decla007a6a
Date: March 06, 202371933Decla00a7ad
Date: March 06, 202371966Motio00fa80
Date: March 07, 202371966EVIDE027e39
Date: March 07, 202371934Decla001436
Date: March 06, 202371934Decla00cd52
Date: March 06, 202371931Decla00c565
Date: March 06, 202371933Decla008ce8
Date: March 06, 202371966Separ045c12
Date: March 07, 202371966Decla011254
Date: March 07, 202371932Decla00e4aa
Date: March 06, 202372036NOTIC009600
Date: March 08, 202372251DECLA01c712
Date: March 11, 202372231DECLA01c92c
Date: March 10, 202372231DECLA02ce1f
Date: March 10, 202372231DECLA0015f0
Date: March 10, 202372251DECLA00e78d
Date: March 11, 202372250DECLA002144
Date: March 11, 202372251DECLA005a55
Date: March 11, 202372251DECLA02c37d
Date: March 11, 202372251DECLA024a01
Date: March 11, 202372256REDAC00ba1b
Date: March 11, 202372251DECLA016ca2
Date: March 11, 202372250DECLA001811
Date: March 11, 202372252DECLA00eae8
Date: March 11, 202372251DECLA006789
Date: March 11, 202372252REQUE011a40
Date: March 11, 202372252REDAC068431
Date: March 11, 202372252PROPO02dfaa
Date: March 11, 202372252PLAIN058e20
Date: March 11, 202372252DECLA04f43b
Date: March 11, 202372252EVIDE038758
Date: March 11, 202372437NOTIC00d83d
Date: March 15, 202372507Decla001743
Date: March 16, 202372507Notic01af6a
Date: March 16, 202372883Separ04c426
Date: March 23, 202372883Decla01c273
Date: March 23, 202372883Plain03af05
Date: March 23, 202372883Notic028e1b
Date: March 23, 202373202Decla002ba0
Date: March 29, 202374379Notic0073b5
Date: April 19, 202375128STIPU00fff4
Date: May 03, 202376089DEFEN00f47e
Date: May 19, 202376089DECLA02442e
Date: May 19, 202376089DEFEN01d022
Date: May 19, 202376350Reply012970
Date: May 25, 202376350Decla008522
Date: May 25, 202377165NOTIC00b842
Date: June 09, 202377171DEFEN00ec9c
Date: June 09, 202377171DEFEN040cec
Date: June 09, 202377171SECON03aea5
Date: June 09, 202377171DEFEN014dc9
Date: June 09, 202377171FIRST025d0c
Date: June 09, 202377181DEFEN0184e2
Date: June 09, 202377181DEFEN003f8f
Date: June 09, 202377289Notic01a64c
Date: June 13, 202377289Notic00ce1b
Date: June 13, 202377298NOTIC003733
Date: June 13, 202377298NOTIC016dd3
Date: June 13, 2023Redacted Decl of TAF ISO Final 06.14.23
Date: June 14, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Final 06.14.23
Date: June 14, 2023Declaration of Brian Hunsaker Final 06.14.23
Date: June 14, 2023Redacted Hunsaker Response to TT Separate stmt
Date: June 14, 2023Declaration Of Liz Evans Final 06.14.23
Date: June 14, 2023Redacted Hunsaker Evidence ISO Opp Final
Date: June 14, 2023Declaration of Machin Final 06.14.23
Date: June 14, 2023POS - Opp to TT MSJ; Decls 06.14.23
Date: June 14, 2023Opp to TT MSJ Final 06.14.23
Date: June 14, 202377165PROPO0194d8
Date: June 09, 202377532PLAIN001d9c
Date: June 16, 202377532PLAIN010cbe
Date: June 16, 202377675DEFEN00fd0b
Date: June 20, 202377675DECLA01e8c8
Date: June 20, 202377769Propo003407
Date: June 23, 2023Unredacted Hunsaker Separate Stmt
Date: August 25, 2023Hunsaker Request for Judicial Notice Final
Date: August 25, 2023Unredacted Decl of TAF ISO
Date: August 25, 2023POS - Opp to TT MSJ; Decls 06.14.23
Date: August 25, 2023Declaration of Brian Hunsaker Final 06.14.23
Date: August 25, 2023Declaration Of Liz Evans Final 06.14.23
Date: August 25, 2023Declaration of Machin Final 06.14.23
Date: August 25, 2023Unredacted Hunsaker Evidence ISO Opp Final
Date: August 25, 202381609PLAIN011efc
Date: August 28, 202381609DECLA02472b
Date: August 28, 202381609REPLY009292
Date: August 28, 202383234REQUE0189fd
Date: September 20, 202383234DEFEN00f487
Date: September 20, 20238433610182003035
Date: October 10, 20238433611172011fbf
Date: October 10, 202384406SUPPL0026a7
Date: October 10, 2023843361018202e209
Date: October 10, 2023Joinder of FIE Motion to Bifurcate 10.19.23
Date: October 19, 202385030PLAIN01e693
Date: October 19, 202385030PLAIN003730
Date: October 19, 202385216Memor023184
Date: October 23, 202385216VERIF0062c0
Date: October 23, 202385216PLAIN012cc1
Date: October 23, 202385406REPLY00f729
Date: October 25, 202385493DEFEN00558b
Date: October 26, 202385493DECLA0187f2
Date: October 26, 202385582DEFEN004634
Date: October 27, 202385657PLAIN007e67
Date: October 30, 202385657DECLA0167cb
Date: October 30, 202385657PROPO02d9b6
Date: October 30, 202385657PROPO02d9b6
Date: November 01, 202386121Stipu00c5a8
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 15 days Judge: Gaskell, Jane |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Readiness Conference
Judge: Gaskell, Jane |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Koop - Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (cm200) 24-04-16 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Unconditional Notice of Settlement Entire | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 10 days Judge: Gaskell, Jane |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference re trial readiness set from 1/31 Judge: Gaskell, Jane |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance EX-PARTE ORDER 3/14 |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Gaskell, Jane |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.