Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chess, Kiki, Ly, Vivian, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Setareh, Chaim S., Yeremian, David, against Mobileone, Llc, An Arizona Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2019 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: August 10, 202152460Decla00ef9d
Date: January 25, 202252460Notic01d93c
Date: January 25, 2022MOBILE ONE -- 2022 01-25 PLD Dec of ND re POS on LWDA
Date: January 26, 202256912Notic002747
Date: April 28, 2022Stipulation
Date: November 14, 2019Application
Date: February 23, 2021Notice
Date: May 24, 2019Stipulation
Date: November 20, 2020First Amended Complaint
Date: March 27, 2020Order
Date: May 22, 2019Compendium of Evidence in Support of
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 16, 2021Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: July 16, 2021Stipulation
Date: June 20, 2019Order
Date: August 20, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: October 30, 2019Order
Date: June 19, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 24, 2019MOBILEONE 2022 10-13 Decl Reyes
Date: October 13, 2022MobileOneLLC_Suppl Declaration
Date: February 07, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: May 23, 2019Order
Date: May 23, 2019Petition for Coordination
Date: May 24, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 16, 2021Order
Date: March 03, 2021Motion for Class Certification
Date: February 16, 2021Case Management Order
Date: October 26, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 28, 2020Order
Date: June 05, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 06, 2020Stipulation & Order
Date: June 01, 2020Answer
Date: June 16, 2020Case Management Order
Date: March 09, 2020Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues
Date: December 16, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 27, 2019Evidence
Date: October 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 12, 2019Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: November 12, 2019Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: October 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 22, 2019Answer
Date: October 07, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: October 22, 2019Case Management Order
Date: October 21, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: September 06, 2019Case Management Order
Date: August 16, 2019Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: September 13, 2019Order
Date: July 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 13, 2019Order
Date: July 09, 2019Case Management Order
Date: July 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MobileOneLLC_Suppl Declaration | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOBILEONE 2022 10-13 Decl Reyes | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 56912Notic002747 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOBILE ONE -- 2022 01-25 PLD Dec of ND re POS on LWDA | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | 52460Decla00ef9d | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | 52460Notic01d93c | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement
Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Type: Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action SettlementSigned by: JUDGE WEINERD Order Type: Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 8/19/21 |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement 08/10/2021 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.