Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Stephens, Donnetta, filed a(n) Product Liability Unlimited case represented by Gibbs Law Firm Llp, Kiesel Law Llp, Kirkendall Dwyer Llp, Law Offices Of William D Shapiro, Trammell, Pc, (total of 5) See All against Crown Ace Hardware, Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive, Monsato Company, Wilbur-Ellis Company, Llc, Wilbur-Ellis Nutrition, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Hollingsworth Llp, Parker, Milliken, Clark, O'Hara & Samuelian, Proskauer Rose Llp, Winston & Strawn Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a petition to coordinate add-on cases in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda. The petitioners are Daniel Jimenez and Nahid Murtaza, on behalf of their minor child, Noor Jimenez, and Destiny Clark, on beh...
Amended Document Filed re:
Date: November 02, 2020Motion re:
Date: October 14, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 05, 2020Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 15, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: November 12, 2020Declaration re:
Date: October 30, 2020Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 25, 2020Supplemental Brief Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 09, 2020Declaration re:
Date: January 11, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 11, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 25, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: January 20, 2021Reply Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Application for Pro Hac Vice
Date: January 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: December 15, 2020Notice Filed
Date: January 26, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 26, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 28, 2021Declaration re:
Date: January 26, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration re:
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration re:
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: August 23, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: June 29, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 29, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 01, 2024Notice Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Declaration re:
Date: October 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 25, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 12, 2021Notice
Date: April 20, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Notice Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Declaration re:
Date: June 11, 2021Objection Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 27, 2020Notice Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Answer Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: March 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Reply Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: May 12, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: May 21, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: May 24, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 16, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 30, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: April 12, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 10, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 12, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 12, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 12, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 11, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: July 19, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 10, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Petition Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Proof of Service
Date: August 31, 2021Declaration re:
Date: August 14, 2020Response Filed to:
Date: September 08, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 31, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: September 22, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: July 15, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 12, 2021Request Filed Re:
Date: July 16, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 26, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 04, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: February 18, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: February 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration re:
Date: July 12, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 25, 2022Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Exhibits List Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Amended Notice to Reporter For Estimate of Costs filed/maile
Date: March 24, 2022Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: March 10, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 15, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 16, 2021Balance Due on Case
Date: July 16, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: March 29, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: December 17, 2021Memorandum of Costs
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Trial Brief Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: September 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: September 19, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: February 14, 2022Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: November 14, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 15, 2023Trial Brief Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Statement of
Date: August 20, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 03, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: March 20, 2023Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Trial Brief Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties
Date: May 31, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 15, 2021Trial Brief Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 18, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 04, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 04, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 09, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: December 07, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 28, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: April 23, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Motion re:
Date: June 11, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: February 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 07, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: June 16, 2021Court Order Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 16, 2021Court Order Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Notice
Date: April 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration re:
Date: April 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 14, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Ntc of Entry of Default Filed and Fwd to the Court of Appeal
Date: February 27, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: July 06, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Received an Order Dismissing Appeal from the Reviewing Court
Date: March 06, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Notice
Date: April 19, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: July 08, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 21, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 14, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 14, 2020Declaration re:
Date: October 14, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: February 09, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 02, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 25, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Special Verdict filed.
Date: December 09, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: December 09, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: December 09, 2021Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: April 05, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: December 09, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Receipt of Records/Exhibits filed
Date: August 24, 2022Proof of Service
Date: October 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 29, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Motion Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 12, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: December 26, 2023Remittitur Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: February 14, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 29, 2022Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: February 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of withdrawal of memo of costs |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date Appeal is DISMISSED by reviewing court |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remittitur Routed to SBJC Civil for placement in file |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed 2nd Remittitur Filed with a different Proof of Service |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remittitur Filed Appeal is DISMISSED by reviewing court |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date Appellant's request for an extension of time to file opening brief is GRANTED. |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed to extend deadline to file motion to tax costs by sixty additional days |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date If appellant's opening brief is not filed within 15 days after this notice, the appeal may be dismissed. |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Purchased certified copy of judgment purchased |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Certified Copy Purchased |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.