Case Last Refreshed: 30 minutes ago
Rigoli, Brianne, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Savarese Law Firm, The Rager Law Firm, against C.R. England, Inc. A Utah Corporation, England Global Logistics Usa, Inc. A Utah Corporation, Torres, Lorena, Rigoli, Brianne, represented by Nossman Llp, Snyder Burnett Egerer Llp, Snyder Law, Theodora Oringher Miller & Richman Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Janet M. Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M. Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2015 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time200 days |
This complaint document is a Notice of Association filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, Brianne Rigoli, is associated with co-counsel Melanie Savarese from the Savarese Law Firm. The address...
Motion Filed
Date: September 25, 2017Motion Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Objection Filed
Date: November 22, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 22, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 01, 2017Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: November 22, 2017Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 22, 2018Reply Filed
Date: December 01, 2017Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 22, 2017Ex Parte Filed
Date: December 21, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 22, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: February 02, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 03, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: December 29, 2017Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 26, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 26, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 26, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 26, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 26, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 26, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 29, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 02, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 02, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 06, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: October 19, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 09, 2018Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 30, 2018Declaration re:
Date: April 05, 2018Objection Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: July 20, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: April 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 06, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 10, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 10, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration re:
Date: April 11, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 16, 2018Exhibits List Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 27, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 05, 2018Reply Filed
Date: June 11, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: May 14, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: May 31, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: May 09, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 24, 2018Motion Filed
Date: May 30, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: July 20, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: June 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 31, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: August 17, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: October 19, 2018Receipt for Records filed
Date: August 17, 2018Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: October 10, 2018Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: October 26, 2018Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: September 17, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 31, 2019Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: November 07, 2018Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: November 27, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 12, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: October 19, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 30, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 26, 2016Motion Filed
Date: November 15, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 15, 2016Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: September 27, 2018Motion Filed
Date: November 15, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2016Jury Instructions
Date: April 30, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Request for Action Filed
Date: March 07, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2016Motion Filed
Date: November 15, 2016Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2016Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties
Date: March 13, 2019Notice of Appeal filed
Date: September 17, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 25, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 23, 2018Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 07, 2019Motion Filed
Date: April 23, 2018Motion Filed
Date: May 15, 2015Motion Filed
Date: May 15, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 02, 2015Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 02, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 02, 2015Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 02, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: March 02, 2015Demurrer Filed
Date: April 29, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 01, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 01, 2015Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: April 06, 2015Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 29, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 15, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 16, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 26, 2015Declaration re:
Date: December 09, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: May 08, 2015Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 26, 2015Order Filed Re:
Date: November 18, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 26, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 16, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: November 18, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 23, 2016Motion Filed
Date: November 23, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 12, 2016Reply Filed
Date: December 06, 2016Reply Filed
Date: December 06, 2016Reply Filed
Date: December 06, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 12, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 09, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: November 20, 2017Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 12, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 08, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 09, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 08, 2016Reply Filed
Date: December 15, 2016Reply Filed
Date: December 15, 2016Reply Filed
Date: December 15, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 18, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 12, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 27, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 23, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 22, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: March 07, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 13, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 27, 2016Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 13, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 23, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 22, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 22, 2018Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 05, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 13, 2017Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: March 22, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 16, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 22, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: September 25, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 25, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 02, 2019Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: December 13, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: March 22, 2019Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: December 13, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: July 16, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: May 20, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: July 23, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: July 15, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: June 14, 2019Remittitur Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 28, 2015Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 01, 2015Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 10, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 10, 2015Reply Filed
Date: September 16, 2015Reply Filed
Date: June 01, 2015Ex Parte Filed
Date: August 17, 2015Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 28, 2015Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 04, 2015At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 30, 2015Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 25, 2015Motion Filed
Date: December 23, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 15, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 04, 2016Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2016Reply Filed
Date: June 02, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 26, 2016Demurrer Filed
Date: December 23, 2015Answer Filed
Date: March 01, 2016Motion Filed
Date: June 02, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 04, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 15, 2016Motion Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 04, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: January 15, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 05, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 05, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 05, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: April 08, 2016At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: January 04, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 29, 2016Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: October 07, 2016Reply Filed
Date: October 31, 2016Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 15, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 26, 2016Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2015Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 15, 2016Motion Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 18, 2015Order Filed Re:
Date: August 10, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 26, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 29, 2016Objection Filed
Date: April 16, 2018Motion Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 30, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 25, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 12, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 27, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 26, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 19, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 26, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:STATUS OF APPEAL |
|
October 07, 2019 | |||
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR ROUTED TO SBJC, HON. JANET M. FRANGIE, DEPT. S29. | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decision By Reviewing Court: APPEAL (E071333) IS DISMISSED BY REVIEWING COURT. |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED. | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
August 26, 2019 | |||
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29. |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.