Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Reynolds, Nace, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Balsam, Daniel L., Harker, Jacob, against Does 1 To 10, Feaver, Matthew Jacob, Heit, Brian, Heit, Brian Morgan, Heit Law Group, (total of 11) See All represented by Fickel, Connie M., Graft, Alex, Layne, Kendall Alexander, Sasaki, Ed, Schowe, Timothy M., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEthan P. Schulman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
ORDER AFTER APRIL 19, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 67495392)
Date: April 20, 2022ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67285385) FILED BY DEFENDANT HEIT, BRIAN HEIT LAW GROUP
Date: February 02, 2022ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 14, 2022 HEARING (TRANSACTION 67413035)
Date: March 21, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 66815590) TO PLAINTIFF REYNOLDS, NACE
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 66967990) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYNOLDS, NACE
Date: September 27, 2021CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (TRANSACTION ID # 66815590) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYNOLDS, NACE
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 200042048) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEEHAN, ROBIN
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Tuesday, February 27, 2024, Line 5, 2- DEFENDANT BRIAN HEIT and HEIT LAW GROUP's Motion For Orders Consolidating Hearings. Off calendar as moot. On January 9, 2... | |
January 09, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Tuesday, January 9, 2024, Line 3, PLAINTIFF NACE REYNOLDS Motion For Entry Of Judgment Under Code Of Civil Procedure 664.6` Plaintiff's motion for entry of judg... | |
December 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | On the Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, December 20, 2023, line 5. PLAINTIFF NACE REYNOLDS'S Motion For Entry Of Judgment Under Code Of Civil Procedure 664.6. Plaintiff's motion for entry of jud... | |
August 04, 2022 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION / Notice Of Motion & Motion For Summary Adjudication
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 67752981): GRAFT, ALEX, LAYNE, KENDALL ALEXANDER SUBSTITUTED FOR SASAKI, ED AS ATTORNEY FOR SHEEHAN, ROBIN | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67684142) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEEHAN, ROBIN AMELIA FEAVER, MATTHEW JACOB SHEEHAN & FEAVER, PC FKA SHEEHAN LAW GROUP, PC | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL / PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67640438) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYNOLDS, NACE | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JACOB HARKER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 67640438) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYNOLDS, NACE | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DANIEL BALSAM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 67640438) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYNOLDS, NACE | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 67640438) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REYNOLDS, NACE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.