Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chiu, Thai Ming, Liu, Kaman, Fu, Bryant, Lei, Crystal, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Johnson, Michael Kenneth, Kaplan, Gary M., Serlin, Mark A, Pro Per, against Chiu, Thai Min, Chiu, Thai Ming, Does 1-20, Inclusive, Liu, Kaman, Yan, Tina, (total of 5) See All represented by Chao, Peter, Disston, William Leeds, Lapham, Mark, Yan, Demas, Yu, Linda, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
This complaint is a case management order from the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The Dec-13-2017 case management conference has been canceled, and a new conference is scheduled for Mar-14-2018 in Department 610 at 10:30 am. T...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60721760) FILED BY DEFENDANT YAN, TINA
Date: June 12, 2017ORDER OVERRULING KAMAN LIU'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 24, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60532179) FILED BY DEFENDANT LIU, KAMAN
Date: April 28, 2017NOTICE OF UNDERTAKING FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, BRYANT LEI, CRYSTAL
Date: August 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: February 24, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2022NOTICE OF LIEN (TRANSACTION ID # 100142496) FILED BY DEFENDANT YAN, TINA
Date: September 23, 2021DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, BRYANT LEI, CRYSTAL
Date: February 08, 2022POS NTC OF DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, BRYANT
Date: November 05, 2021ORDER ON CROSS-DEFENDANT CHEN'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT CHIU'S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2021ORDER RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2021ORDER ON CROSS-DEFENDANT CHEN'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT LIU'S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2021NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT. (206)
Date: June 08, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CHIU, THAI MING
Date: June 27, 2022ORDER TAKING CROSS-DEFENDANT STELLA CHEN'S DEMURRER TO KAMAN LIU'S CROSS COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR
Date: November 14, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CHIU, THAI MING
Date: July 02, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT LIU, KAMAN
Date: July 02, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR SERLIN, MARK A AS ATTORNEY FOR FU, BRYANT
Date: January 16, 2018RECORD REMANDED BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT
Date: August 29, 2017NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF STAY (TRANSACTION ID # 61036795) FILED BY DEFENDANT LIU, KAMAN
Date: August 28, 2017RECORD REMANDED BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT
Date: November 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
September 28, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
August 23, 2022 | Hearing |
Chens Joinder In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial Or In Alternative To Bifurcate The Cross-Complaint
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
August 23, 2022 | Hearing |
MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON AUG-23-2022 IN 206, CROSS-COMPLAINANT THAI MING CHIU'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL - OFF CALENDAR BY COURT. NO APPEARANCES MADE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT TOOK THE MOTION OFF CALENDAR (NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 08/22/22). JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206) | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON AUG-23-2022 IN 206, CROSS-DEFENDANT STELLA CHEN'S JOINDER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO BIFURCATE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT - OFF CALENDAR BY COURT. NO APPEARANCES MADE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT TOOK THE UNDERLYING MOTION OFF CALENDAR (NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 08/22/22). JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206) | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 210014460) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHIU, THAI MING | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY DEFENDANTS TINA YAN AND THAI MING CHIU (TRANSACTION ID # 210014409) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, BRYANT LEI, CRYSTAL | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 210014230): JOHNSON, MICHAEL KENNETH SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR FU, BRYANT FU, BRYANT | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 210014230): JOHNSON, MICHAEL KENNETH SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR LEI, CRYSTAL LEI, CRYSTAL AKA LI MING LEI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.