Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Billfloat, Inc., Gilbert, Ryan, O'Malley, Sean, Golden Pacific Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scheidt, Bruce A, against Billfloat, Inc., Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Gilbert, Ryan, O'Malley, Sean, represented by Isola, Peter Lindsey, Webb, William T, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Andrew Y.S. Cheng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew Y.S. Cheng Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management382 days |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions396 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time571 days |
This complaint is a supplemental declaration by attorney Errol C. Dauis in support of Golden Pacific Bank's demurrer to BillFloat's first amended cross-complaint. The declaration states that Dauis attempted to meet and confer with Jennifer D. Su, cou...
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-14-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: November 17, 2016ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION - DENIED
Date: November 29, 2016MINUTES FOR MAR-24-2017 11:00 AM
Date: March 24, 2017ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: April 17, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100016240) FILED BY DEFENDANT BILLFLOAT, INC.
Date: March 22, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100002909) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BILLFLOAT, INC.
Date: September 09, 2016ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT BILLFLOAT, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: September 27, 2016ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' RYAN GILBERT AND SEAN O'MALLEY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: September 27, 2016JOINT MEDIATION REPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 100015291)
Date: May 05, 2017MINUTES FOR JUN-02-2017 10:00 AM
Date: June 02, 2017MINUTES FOR JAN-27-2017 9:30 AM
Date: January 27, 2017ORDER AFTER HEARING SETTING DEADLINES
Date: January 27, 2017ORDER - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REFERENCE
Date: February 15, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 11, 2016ORDER (MINUTE ORDER) GRANTING ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBITS 1,2, AND 4 OF COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2016ORDER ( AND MINUTES) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Date: January 11, 2016ORDER - STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2017 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
August 14, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
August 11, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 OSC - TRIAL DEPARTMENT
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-11-2017 IN DEPT. 606 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE (606) | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TERMINATED | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60933626) | |
July 14, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
July 14, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
July 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Golden Pacific Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Continue Trial
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-16-2017 - CASE SETTLED AT CONFERENCE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.