Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Van Degrift, Paul, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against Albay Construction Company, All Asbestos Defendants, Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, Armstrong International, Inc., Asbestos Defendants, (total of 52) See All represented by Bassi, Marte Joseph, Biderman, David T., Blackard, Eugene Charles, Blomquist, Sonja Elizabeth, Brown, Eugene, (total of 31) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2009 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions544 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2231 days |
ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS
Date: June 12, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28815790) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY
Date: January 06, 2010DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 39701429) AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY
Date: September 08, 2011DECLARATION OF BRETTON MORRIS (TRANSACTION ID # 35398422) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRIMON, INC.
Date: January 18, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 18, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 29312673) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 01, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 29034793) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: January 14, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29034793) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: January 14, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29663690) FILED BY DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Date: February 19, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29412985) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Date: February 04, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29097440) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: January 19, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28708184) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.
Date: December 29, 2009ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE PARTY NAME
Date: April 19, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28931011) FILED BY DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.
Date: January 11, 2010ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56259212)
Date: October 28, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 56995047) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. | |
November 06, 2014 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 10/28/14. (503) | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56259212) | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR 402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206) | |
April 17, 2014 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM IN DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
December 19, 2013 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO AUG-17-2017 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF VAN DEGRIFT, PAUL | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.