Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Conte, Anthony, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against 3M Company, All Asbestos Defendants See Scanned Documents, Asbestos Defendants B*P As Reflected On Reflected, Bnsf Railway Company, Bucyrus International Inc, (total of 28) See All represented by Bassi, Marte Joseph, Bertrand, Jean Lynne, Biderman, David T., Bodell, Daniel D., Fadeff, Jeffery John, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions343 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2813 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The plaintiff, Anthony Conte, is requesting the dismissal of the case with prejudice. The case number is CGC-09-275046. The document also mentions that a copy of the dismissal will not be ret...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29493384) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Date: February 10, 2010DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28902987) AS TO DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY
Date: January 08, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24864135) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY
Date: April 24, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 29217222) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION
Date: January 26, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 29493384) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Date: February 10, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32692898) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC.
Date: August 16, 2010CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: February 08, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 54656046) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC.
Date: December 05, 2013NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 30, 2009NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 56317684) FILED BY ATTORNEY SHELDON, CHARLES T
Date: November 10, 2014ORDER ADDING CASE TO JUNE 20, 2013 STATUS AND SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: March 21, 2013ORDER TRIAL SETTING ORDER RE EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY (TRANSACTION ID # 53875058)
Date: August 23, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CONTE, ANTHONY
Date: February 01, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49301264) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC.
Date: February 05, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24680388) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BUDD COMPANY
Date: April 15, 2009NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 35296962)
Date: January 11, 2011AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 35397382) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONTE, ANTHONY
Date: January 14, 2011ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: November 19, 2010REMITTITUR REVERSED (A131068 DIV 2)
Date: July 11, 2012DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57112476)
Date: April 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59696745) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
June 04, 2015 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015. DISMISSAL FILED 4/21/15. (503) | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57112476) | |
March 05, 2015 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
December 04, 2014 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-04-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MICHAEL LEVINSON. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 56317684) FILED BY ATTORNEY SHELDON, CHARLES T | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR SET FOR 12/4/14 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR FILING OF A DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. CASE RESOLVED PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S LETTER DATED 9/11/14. (503) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.