Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pique, Frederick, Pique, Godofredo, Pique, Gregory, Pique, Rosita, Sanchez, Marlene, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against All Asbestos Defendants, Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, Asbestos Defendants, Borg-Warner Corporation By Its Successor In, Carlisle Corporation, (total of 51) See All represented by Bassi, Marte Joseph, Biderman, David T., Brown, Eugene, Buty, Madeline L, Fadeff, Jeffery John, (total of 28) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2080 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal of a case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiffs, Rosita Pique and others, are requesting the dismissal of their case against Dana Companies, LLC (formerly known as Dana ...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54653963)
Date: December 05, 2013MINUTES FOR MAY-10-2013 9:30 AM
Date: May 10, 2013MINUTES FOR MAY-01-2012 1:30 PM
Date: May 01, 2012MINUTES FOR MAY-02-2013 9:00 AM
Date: May 02, 2013MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2013 9:30 AM
Date: May 13, 2013MINUTES FOR MAY-06-2013 9:00 AM
Date: May 06, 2013INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 41566786) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Date: January 25, 2012MINUTES FOR MAY-22-2012 2:00 PM
Date: May 22, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 22780128) FILED BY ATTORNEY GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE
Date: December 05, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 25208925) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: May 15, 2009ORDER GRANTING MONETARY SANCTIONS
Date: November 20, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23294960) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUBE CITY IMS CORPORATION
Date: January 13, 2009ORDER RE MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: June 18, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26919035) AS TO DEFENDANT DEERE & COMPANY
Date: September 03, 2009ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: May 18, 2012MINUTES FOR MAY-16-2012 9:00 AM
Date: May 16, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 39814200)
Date: September 14, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23699068) FILED BY DEFENDANT UTILITY TRAILER MANUFACTURING
Date: February 10, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23429105) FILED BY DEFENDANT DEERE & COMPANY
Date: January 22, 2009ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34415167) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.
Date: November 18, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 34220175) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC.
Date: November 05, 2010SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 26682575) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.
Date: August 20, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 34300668) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.
Date: November 12, 2010DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27000569) AS TO DEFENDANT HEIL CO.
Date: September 10, 2009ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34220175) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC.
Date: November 05, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26682575) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.
Date: August 20, 2009NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 28042682) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.
Date: November 13, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20217791) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: June 12, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23698646) FILED BY DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR, INC.
Date: February 09, 2009ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS, AND ORDER
Date: July 14, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 27816965) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIQUE, GODOFREDO
Date: October 30, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 20217791) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: June 12, 2008AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21341024) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE PACCAR INC.
Date: September 03, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21976611) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACCAR INC.
Date: October 15, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 08, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2014 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 12/5/13. (503) | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54653963) | |
December 05, 2013 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: RVELUZ/EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54394678) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE [ON 11/12/09, THE COURT GRANTED THE CONSOLIDATION OF THE TWO CASES FOR TRIAL: ROWE (#274238) AND PIQUE (#274659). ORDER FILED ON 12/15/09.] FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIQUE, GODOFREDO PIQUE, GREGORY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED PIQUE, FREDERICK , AS LEGAL HEIR OF GODOFREDO PIQUE, DECEASED FEE DEPOSITED BY BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP FOR JURY FEE FOR MAY-13-2013 THROUGH MAY-14-2013 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 611 | |
August 01, 2013 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-01-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, OREN NOAH. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE [ON 11/12/09, THE COURT GRANTED THE CONSOLIDATION OF THE TWO CASES FOR TRIAL: ROWE (#274238) AND PIQUE (#274659). ORDER FILED ON 12/15/09.] FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. FEE DEPOSITED BY PERKINS COIE FOR JURY FEE FOR MAY-14-2013 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 502 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.