Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
First Doe Through Tenth Doe, Inclusive, Scott, Michael Gerald, Scott, Nancy Marie, Scott, Robert David, Scott, Thomas Cary, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Fishback, Stephen M., Harowitz, Steven Marc, against 3M Company (Formerly Named Minnesota Mining And, Abb, Inc., Abb, Inc. Which Will Do Business In California As, Ac And S, Inc., Allied Packing & Supply, Inc., (total of 58) See All represented by Berfield, Frank K., Berry, Phillip Samuel, Biderman, David T., Blackard, Eugene Charles, Brydon, John R, (total of 34) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Bruce E. Chan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 20, 2005 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions209 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1426 days |
This complaint is an amendment to a complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiffs, Nancy Marie Scott, et al., are represented by attorneys Steven M. Harowitz and Stephen M. Tigerman of Harowitz & Tigerma...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15652185) FILED BY DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY
Date: July 20, 2007ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: June 29, 2007ORDER RE-OPENING DISCOVERY
Date: June 29, 2007ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: June 15, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 14294486) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: March 29, 2007NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 13944999) FILED BY ATTORNEY GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE
Date: February 27, 2007NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 12368845) FILED BY ATTORNEY DUMONT, RICHARD DANA
Date: September 14, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY
Date: March 14, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SB DECKING, INC.
Date: March 06, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION
Date: February 28, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY
Date: February 28, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA
Date: February 28, 2006ORDER : STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS, AND ORDER
Date: April 20, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AS A SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST
Date: February 21, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Date: February 22, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: February 27, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE AND SON, INC.
Date: February 17, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY
Date: February 21, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Date: February 16, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Date: February 22, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC.
Date: February 16, 2006ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT ABB, INC.
Date: February 08, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC.
Date: February 15, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.
Date: February 07, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Date: February 02, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY
Date: February 01, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.
Date: February 07, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 02, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION
Date: January 30, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC. FKA CUTLER-HAMMER INC.
Date: January 27, 2006NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 20, 2005ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT TO JANUARY 25, 2006
Date: November 29, 2005ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT TO NOVEMBER 25, 2005
Date: September 20, 2005DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16325196) AS TO DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY
Date: September 14, 2007MINUTES FOR AUG-29-2007 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 29, 2007MINUTES FOR AUG-28-2007 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 28, 2007MINUTES FOR AUG-30-2007 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 30, 2007MINUTES FOR AUG-22-2007 4:00 PM FOR DEPT 318
Date: August 22, 2007MOTIONS IN LIMINE 3 (TRANSACTION ID # 16043667) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Date: August 22, 2007MOTIONS IN LIMINE 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 16043667) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Date: August 22, 2007MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 (TRANSACTION ID # 16043667) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Date: August 22, 2007MINUTES FOR MAY-21-2007 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610
Date: May 21, 2007EXHIBIT A (TRANSACTION ID # 15083177)
Date: June 01, 2007DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16839580) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: October 29, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R0907621J006 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE , FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 24541660) | |
August 27, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21245865) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ONE HUNDREDTH SEVENTH DOE TO BE METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 20145981) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20086802) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. | |
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CONTACT INFORMATION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD (TRANSACTION ID # 19908248) FILED BY ATTORNEY FISHBACK, STEPHEN M. | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19078405) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 30 TO BE T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18488266) AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC. , ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS IMO INDUASTRIES INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS IMO DELAVAL TURBINE, INC. | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18229607) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18143788) AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.