Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chester Jason, Jr., filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Clifford K. Mau, Collins & Mau,Llp, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2001 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 30, 2002Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 21, 2002Amended Order on Motion to be relieved as counsel (denying motion) Filed
Date: March 05, 2002Order re Case Management Filed
Date: February 25, 2002Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: February 01, 2002Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 07, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: November 28, 2001Declaration in Support
Date: January 07, 2002Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: January 07, 2002Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 18, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: January 27, 2003Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 10, 2003Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: February 10, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 10, 2003Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: March 18, 2002Declaration in Support
Date: March 18, 2002Proposed Order
Date: March 18, 2002Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: April 18, 2002Order re Case Management Filed
Date: November 28, 2001Initial Case Management Conference 11/28/2001 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: September 19, 2001Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 30, 2002Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Denied
Date: January 30, 2002Proposed Order
Date: February 01, 2002Declaration in Support
Date: February 01, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: February 25, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 10, 2003Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/18/2002 09:00 AM D- 109
Date: December 07, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: April 19, 2002Order Granting Withdrawal of Attorney Filed
Date: February 21, 2002Order re Case Management Filed
Date: April 22, 2002Order for Withdrawal of Attorney Filed
Date: April 25, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: December 18, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: June 21, 2002Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 18, 2002Order re Case Management Filed
Date: June 21, 2002Order re Case Management Filed
Date: October 02, 2002Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: December 18, 2002Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: March 10, 2003Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: February 03, 2003Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 19, 2002Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 10, 2003Case Management Statement of CHESTER JASON JR. Filed
Date: April 19, 2002Complaint - Professional Negligence Dismissed
Date: March 10, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 10, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: February 10, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: January 27, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: February 03, 2003Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2002-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2002-02-01T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2002-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2002-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 10, 2003Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2002-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2001-11-28T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2002-06-21T00:00:00Order Granting Withdrawal of Attorney Filed
Date: 2002-02-21T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/18/2002 09:00 AM D- 109
Date: 2002-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of CHESTER JASON JR. Filed
Date: 2002-04-19T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2002-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2003-02-10T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2002-04-22T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/28/2001 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2001-09-19T00:00:00Complaint - Professional Negligence Dismissed
Date: March 10, 2003Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2002-12-18T00:00:00Amended Order on Motion to be relieved as counsel (denying motion) Filed
Date: 2002-03-05T00:00:00Order for Withdrawal of Attorney Filed
Date: 2002-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2002-01-07T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2002-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2003-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2003-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 10, 2003Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2002-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2003-02-10T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2002-04-18T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2002-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Denied
Date: 2002-01-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2002-01-30T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2001-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2002-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.