Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dreyer Dr. Jerrold S. Md, Dreyer Rachel Chaim, Jerrold S. Dreyer Md Trustee, Macias Kathy, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Ly John K, Rothstein Glen Allen, against Jm Capital Investments Llc, Keyes Carlos, Lluis Miguel, Macias Kathy, Marble Arch Entertainment Llc, (total of 9) See All represented by Goldman Diane Esq., Gubner Steven T., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia D. Nieto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management198 days |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions59 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
SUMMONS -
Date: July 17, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY;ETC
Date: July 17, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 17, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 10, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 10, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 22, 2018MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2018DEFENDANT KATHY MACIAS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: September 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: October 01, 2018Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: October 01, 2018Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order to continue case management conference
Date: October 25, 2018Motion for Leave - Application to extend time pursuant to CRC 3.110(H)
Date: October 31, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 31, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 06, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 07, 2018Opposition - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint
Date: November 19, 2018Opposition - Opposition To Kathy Macias
Date: November 21, 2018Opposition - Opposition To Defendant Kathy Macias
Date: November 21, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 28, 2018Reply - Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint
Date: November 28, 2018Other - - Other - Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 30, 2018Order - Ruling Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike to the Complaint
Date: December 04, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: December 06, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)
Date: December 06, 2018Order - Ruling Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike to the Complaint
Date: December 06, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: December 10, 2018Complaint - (Amended)
Date: December 21, 2018Motion re: - Motion re: to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint
Date: January 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 28, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: March 11, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 28, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: April 05, 2019Answer
Date: April 08, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: April 08, 2019Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT 1ST
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 13, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: May 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 15, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: July 18, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 26, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 22, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 22, 2019Case Management Statement - LIMITED, SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: August 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 04, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 10, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 27, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 27, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 19, 2019Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: December 02, 2019Case Management Order
Date: December 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: December 10, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2020
Date: April 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: April 22, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 05, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 04, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 04, 2020Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 04, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DIANE GOLDMAN
Date: September 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 02, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 02, 2020Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: October 02, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: December 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 20, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 28, 2021Substitution of Attorney - SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AMENDED
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 17, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 24, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: August 26, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 26, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: September 22, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: April 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: October 20, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: December 05, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 12, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: February 02, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: March 17, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: June 02, 2023Summary of the Case
Date: June 09, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: June 09, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Kathy Macias' Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing on defendant's demurrer and motion to strike portions of the complaint)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Ruling Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike to the Complaint
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Ruling Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike to the Complaint
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Diane Goldman)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue case management conference)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Opposition (To Defendant Kathy Macias)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Limited, Supplemental Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Other - (Substitution of Attorney)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Opposition (To Kathy Macias)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing on defendant's demurrer and motion to strike portions of the complaint)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of )
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Kathy Macias' Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Diane Goldman re Informal Discovery Conference and Continued Status Conference)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (1st Amended)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Answer (CROSS-DEF JERROLD'S DREYER'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT KATHY MACIAS' CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Reply ( to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Motion re: (to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Settlement))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Enter Defaul...))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Enter Defaul...))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue case management conference)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing on defendant's demurrer and motion to strike portions of the complaint)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing on defendant's demurrer and motion to strike portions of the complaint)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Opposition (To Kathy Macias)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Opposition (To Defendant Kathy Macias)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Other - (Substitution of Attorney)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Motion re: (to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Kathy Macias' Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Reply ( to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Kathy Macias' Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (1st Amended)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Answer (CROSS-DEF JERROLD'S DREYER'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT KATHY MACIAS' CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Declaration ( of Diane Goldman re Informal Discovery Conference and Continued Status Conference)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Diane Goldman re Informal Discovery Conference and Continued Status Conference)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/20/2020)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Diane Goldman)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 10/01/2020)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Settlement))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Enter Defaul...))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Enter Defaul...))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED
Date: September 08, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 08, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 10, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Declaration ( of Diane Goldman re Informal Discovery Conference and Continued Status Conference)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.