Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gillon Britney, Mcdougal Raenelle Annette, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Barmakszian Rosie, Barmakszian Rosie Esq., Dell Louis P Esq., Reeves Sheryl Lee, Reeves Sheryl Lee Esq., (total of 5) See All against Estate Of Eric D. Vasquez Deceased, Vasquez Eric Daniel, represented by O'Brien Patrick Kevin Esq, Pabros Steven, Pabros Steven Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Trial Brief; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Filed by the Plaintiffs for a...)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Relating Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Joint Statement Of The case; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Declaration Rosie Barmakszian; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Joint Trial Exhibit List; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Death of Defendant Eric Daniel Vasquez; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions - Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Opposition nonsuit; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order as to Judge Alarcon, Stanley Mosk Dedpt. 96, OTR on at 9:30 a.m. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 05, 2022Special Verdict Form; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 05, 2022Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Jury Trial)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: April 17, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: April 17, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 14, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: July 02, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: July 02, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2018Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: December 26, 2018Notice - Notice of Death of Defendant Eric Daniel Vasquez
Date: February 07, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 18, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE
Date: December 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TH...)
Date: December 20, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 29, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: February 21, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 20, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARCHER IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: March 20, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 20, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020
Date: April 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: May 11, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION
Date: July 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE TRIAL
Date: July 28, 2020Answer
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 26, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: December 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RELATING CASES)
Date: January 20, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF E-SERVICE ADDRESS DESIGNATION
Date: October 06, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 09, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE [MIL 2] TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM COURTROOM
Date: March 01, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE [MIL 3] TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS WEALTH
Date: March 01, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE [ MIL 16] TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY
Date: March 01, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: March 02, 2022Witness List - JOINT TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: March 02, 2022Exhibit List - JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 02, 2022Trial Brief
Date: March 02, 2022Statement of the Case - JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE
Date: March 02, 2022Trial Brief
Date: March 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 08, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: June 01, 2022Objection - OBJECTION MTN IN LIMINE 1-16
Date: June 01, 2022Witness List
Date: June 01, 2022Exhibit List
Date: June 01, 2022Status Report
Date: June 01, 2022Statement of the Case - JOINT
Date: June 01, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 06, 2022Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS
Date: June 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS OPERATIVE PLEADINGS
Date: June 15, 2022Witness List
Date: June 15, 2022Exhibit List
Date: June 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE TABLE OF CONTENTS
Date: June 16, 2022Exhibit List
Date: June 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS OPERATIVE PLEADINGS
Date: June 16, 2022Witness List
Date: June 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE UNAVAILABILITY OF DR. AJAKWE - RQST FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: June 20, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION MAGGIE-MAE GAUGHAN
Date: June 21, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION ROSIE BARMAKSZIAN
Date: June 21, 2022Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 2-10 ONLY
Date: June 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL;)
Date: June 21, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 05, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 07, 2022Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for an order continuing th...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Relating Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Joint; Filed by: Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Joint Trial Witness List; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Relating Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition) Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of Death of Defendant Eric Daniel Vasquez) Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Joint Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Joint Statement Of The case Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Joint Trial Witness List Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Filed by the Plaintiffs for a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Joint Trial Exhibit List Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant); Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: October 05, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (- Given) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Special Verdict Form Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CC...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Conference Re: Plaintiff's Request for a Trial Continuance...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (as to Judge Alarcon, Stanley Mosk Dedpt. 96, OTR on at 9:30 a.m.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Jury Trial)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (Rosie Barmakszian) Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rulings on Motions in Limine)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Opposition (nonsuit) Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 29, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: August 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RULINGS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: August 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 02, 2022Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: September 02, 2022Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR NONSUIT
Date: September 06, 2022Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS DEFENDANTS’ SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION, ATTACHED
Date: September 06, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION NONSUIT
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 07, 2022Motion re: - MOTION RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT
Date: September 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 08, 2022Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS - GIVEN
Date: September 08, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)]
Date: September 08, 2022Special Verdict - SPECIAL VERDICT FORM
Date: September 08, 2022Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: September 08, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 15, 2022Judgment
Date: October 05, 2022Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuing Demurrer/Trial Setting Conference) of )
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuing Demurrer/Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Archer In Support Of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF STEVE PABROS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF VLAD GENDELMAN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice (Trial)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Relating Cases) of )
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Relating Cases))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Pabros In Support Of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Motion to Continue (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL... O/C by MP)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for an order continuing th...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of E-service Address Designation)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice (of Death of Defendant Eric Daniel Vasquez)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Joint Trial Exhibit List
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Joint Statement Of The case
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([ MIL 16] TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 15] TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. AIVAZIAN)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 7] TO EXCLUDE OFFERS OF COMPROMISE OR SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Objection (Mtn In Limine 1-16)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 3] TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS WEALTH)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Trial)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 2] TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM COURTROOM)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 8] TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED OR PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 14] TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' GENERAL DAMAGES CLAIMS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 3333.4)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Joint
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Joint Trial Witness List
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 12] TO EXCLUDE HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF NON-TESTIFYING MEDICAL EXPERTS)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EACH OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 1 - 16)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Notice (of Death of Defendant Eric Daniel Vasquez)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for an order continuing th...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Pabros In Support Of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Archer In Support Of Demurrer)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuing Demurrer/Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice (Trial)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Relating Cases) of 01/20/2021)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Relating Cases))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF STEVE PABROS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF VLAD GENDELMAN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice (of E-service Address Designation)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 7] TO EXCLUDE OFFERS OF COMPROMISE OR SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([ MIL 16] TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 14] TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' GENERAL DAMAGES CLAIMS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 3333.4)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion to Continue (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL... O/C by MP)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 15] TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. AIVAZIAN)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 12] TO EXCLUDE HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF NON-TESTIFYING MEDICAL EXPERTS)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 8] TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED OR PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 3] TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS WEALTH)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine ([MIL 2] TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM COURTROOM)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice (of E-service Address Designation) Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte) Filed by Eric Daniel Vasquez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuing Demurrer/Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Estate of Eric D. Vasquez, Deceased (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (Trial) Filed by Britney Gillon (Plaintiff); Raenelle Annette McDougal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.