Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
Davis Lila, Fortune Company Llc, Hashemian Gita, Hashemian Hassan, Hashemian Mehdi, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Arshonsky Richard I. Esq., Grant Adam D., Grant Adam Douglas, Jarrell Charles D. Esq., against 10801 National Llc, Rahban Frank, Rahban Frank Aka Farhad Rahban, Ventura Investment Company Llc, represented by Barnes Robert William Esq., Conn Richard Samuel Esq., Khalili Sandra, Mashian Bahman, Solberg Kelsey, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management167 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Demurrer; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Frank Rahban (Defendant); Result: Rejected; Result Date:
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Order Denying Application for Writ of Attachment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Request Research for Informal Discovery Request; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Saeed Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Notice OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Filed by: Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: August 01, 2023Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Set Trial Date; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Answer 2nd; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant); As to: Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re Demurrer; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Declaration of HKC re MTN to Compel FROGS; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Dismiss: Filed By: 10801 National, LLC (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: 10801 National, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Report Regarding Status of Consolidated Cases Requested by the Court; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: 10801 National, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Saeed Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Declaration . of HKC re MTN to Compel RFAs re Docs; Filed by: Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: February 22, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY ;ETC
Date: February 22, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: March 01, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 02, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT
Date: May 04, 2018PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDIAL OFFICER JCODE CIV. PROC, 170.6)
Date: May 21, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 23, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 25, 2018FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, ETC
Date: May 30, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2018NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: May 30, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 28, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 17, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: July 18, 2018NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: July 31, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: August 02, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 07, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -
Date: August 24, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 29, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 24, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: October 11, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 16, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 17, 2018Reply - Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Demurrer
Date: October 22, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 24, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re Demurrer
Date: October 31, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 28, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 03, 2018Motion re: - Motion re: by all plaintiffs Nabavi
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: January 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 23, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of entry of order
Date: January 24, 2019Order - Order Granting Ex Parte Application
Date: January 24, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - demurrer of ...)
Date: February 26, 2019Order - Order Ruling Re: Defendant Frank Rahban's Demurrer to the Second Amended Complaint
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 05, 2019Answer - ANSWER 2ND
Date: March 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 18, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: April 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 23, 2019Case Management Order
Date: May 02, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: May 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION . OF HKC RE MTN TO COMPEL RFAS RE DOCS
Date: August 06, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF HKC RE MTN TO COMPEL FROGS
Date: August 06, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: August 06, 2019Separate Statement
Date: August 16, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 16, 2019Separate Statement
Date: September 06, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 12, 2019Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: November 19, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 19, 2019Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: November 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR
Date: December 03, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: January 02, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES
Date: February 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING FORTUNE/YOUNESI'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: February 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEF. RAHBAN'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE SERVED 02/19/20
Date: March 02, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2020
Date: March 10, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 20, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 18, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 19, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER
Date: August 19, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 19, 2020Order - ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
Date: August 26, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: January 21, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: February 08, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: February 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CON...)
Date: February 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: February 19, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: March 17, 2021Order - ORDER REGARDING MARCH 17, 2021 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 09, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: September 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 03, 2021Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE -ANSWER
Date: September 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: October 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR
Date: November 12, 2021Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 24, 2022Amended Complaint - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2022Answer
Date: August 15, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 06, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2022Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 02, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MEDIATION
Date: December 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL , 7-10 DAY ESTIMATE,; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; MAN...)
Date: December 13, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: December 20, 2022Answer
Date: January 05, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 06, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: January 19, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 31, 2023Status Conference Statement
Date: February 09, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING HASHEMIAN PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING
Date: February 10, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET TRIAL DATE
Date: February 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC); HEARING ON EX PARTE AP...)
Date: February 15, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 24, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: April 24, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: May 22, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: June 02, 2023Opposition -
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: August 26, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 19, 2020Request - REQUEST RESEARCH FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY REQUEST
Date: November 19, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO FORTUNE COMPANY, LLC'S REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: November 20, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCES
Date: January 19, 2021Status Report - STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT FRANK RAHBAN’S STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY
Date: January 20, 2021Answer (2nd) Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference r/t BC693651 & BC695301; Hearing o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mersedeh Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Gita Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Demurrer) Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (. of HKC re MTN to Compel RFAs re Docs) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (of HKC re MTN to Compel FROGS) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re Demurrer) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference r/t BC693651 & BC695301)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Fortune/Younesi's Ex Parte Ap...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Defendant Frank Rahban's Demurrer to the Second Amended Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Seyed Hossein Na...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mehdi Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - demurrer of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference r/t BC693651 and BC695301; H...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (- 2nd IDC request pltf) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Hassan Hashemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases: Rahban, et al v. Rahb...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Request (Research for Informal Discovery Request) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (of Time Change of Informal Discovery Conferences) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Request for Informal Discovery Con...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Order (Denying Application for Writ of Attachment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice (of Opposition to Application for Right to Attach Order) Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Set Trial Date) Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Hearing on Ex Parte Ap...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Order (REGARDING MARCH 17, 2021 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference) Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation to Continue the Depositions of Nic...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Ventura Investment company LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (_ PARTIAL) Filed by David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Report Regarding Status of Consolidated Cases Requested by the Court Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial , 7-10 day estimate,; Final Status Conference; Man...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re Mediation) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Fortune Company LLC (Plaintiff); David Younesi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Frank Rahban (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File Third Am...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Fortune/Younesi's Ex Parte Ap...))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice ( of Taking Fortune/Younesi's Motions to Compel Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference r/t BC693651 & BC695301; Hearing o...))
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of entry of order)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Request (Research for Informal Discovery Request)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs' supplemental filing in support of request for informal discovery conference)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Order (Granting Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Requests for Admission, Set One)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Deft Frank Rahban's Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice (of taking plaintiffs' motion to compel attendance at deposition of Frank Rahban off calendar)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Objection (TO FORTUNE COMPANY, LLC'S REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Seyed Hossein Na...))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING THE DEPOSITIONS OF NICHOLAS RAHBAN AND SASHA RAHBAN)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases: Rahban, et al v. Rahb...))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference r/t BC693651 & BC695301))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Stipulation to Continue the Depositions of Nic...) of )
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Answer (2nd)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Declaration (. of HKC re MTN to Compel RFAs re Docs)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion re: (by all plaintiffs Nabavi)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Unique Work Group's Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Seyed Nabavi's Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Frank Rahban's Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (Joinder to Said Rahban's Opp to Frank Rahban's Ntc of Related Cases)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Opposition ( to Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (of HKC re MTN to Compel FROGS)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Defendant Frank Rahban's Demurrer to the Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice ( of Informal Discovery Conference Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Fortune/Younesi's Ex Parte App. to Advance Hearing Date re MTC re Frank Rahban)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Opposition ( to Def. Rahban's Notice of Related Case served )
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Frank Rahban's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint;)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant, Frank Rahban's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint;)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Status Report (DEFENDANT FRANK RAHBAN?S STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference r/t BC693651 and BC695301; H...))
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (- 2nd IDC request pltf)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Order (Denying Application for Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice (of Opposition to Application for Right to Attach Order)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - demurrer of ...))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice (of Time Change of Informal Discovery Conferences)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Continued Informal Discovery Conference Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE THE DEPOSITIONS OF NICHOLAS RAHBAN AND SASHA RAHBAN;;)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Request for Informal Discovery Con...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (-ANSWER)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation to Continue the Depositions of Nic...))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Request for Informal Discovery Con...) of )
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (_ PARTIAL)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Report Regarding Status of Consolidated Cases Requested by the Court
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Arshonsky in Support of Motion to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Response (To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Order (on Fortune/Younesi's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File Third Am...))
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Order (REGARDING MARCH 17, 2021 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion for Leave (Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant, Frank Rahban's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint;)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Frank Rahban's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint;)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Motion re: (by all plaintiffs Nabavi)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Order (Granting Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference r/t BC693651 & BC695301; Hearing o...))
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of entry of order)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - demurrer of ...))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Defendant Frank Rahban's Demurrer to the Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Frank Rahban's Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Answer (2nd)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Seyed Nabavi's Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference r/t BC693651 & BC695301))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Unique Work Group's Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Declaration (. of HKC re MTN to Compel RFAs re Docs)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Seyed Hossein Na...))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Declaration (of HKC re MTN to Compel FROGS)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Requests for Admission, Set One)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Fortune/Younesi's Ex Parte App. to Advance Hearing Date re MTC re Frank Rahban)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Fortune/Younesi's Ex Parte Ap...))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice ( of Taking Fortune/Younesi's Motions to Compel Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice ( of Informal Discovery Conference Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Opposition ( to Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (Joinder to Said Rahban's Opp to Frank Rahban's Ntc of Related Cases)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Opposition ( to Def. Rahban's Notice of Related Case served 02/19/20)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/10/2020)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases: Rahban, et al v. Rahb...))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference r/t BC693651 and BC695301; H...))
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Opposition to Application for Right to Attach Order)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Order (Denying Application for Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs' supplemental filing in support of request for informal discovery conference)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Request for Informal Discovery Con...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Status Report (DEFENDANT FRANK RAHBAN?S STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (- 2nd IDC request pltf)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (of taking plaintiffs' motion to compel attendance at deposition of Frank Rahban off calendar)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE THE DEPOSITIONS OF NICHOLAS RAHBAN AND SASHA RAHBAN;;)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order (REGARDING MARCH 17, 2021 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Request (Research for Informal Discovery Request)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice (of Time Change of Informal Discovery Conferences)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Objection (TO FORTUNE COMPANY, LLC'S REQUEST FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation to Continue the Depositions of Nic...))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Continued Informal Discovery Conference Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Motion for Leave (Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Arshonsky in Support of Motion to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (-ANSWER)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING THE DEPOSITIONS OF NICHOLAS RAHBAN AND SASHA RAHBAN)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.