Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Schmittle Juanita Denise, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aarons Martin Isaac, Golan Jeremy, against Baldwin Park Unified School District, Cazorla Sergio, represented by Priagula Citadelle B, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1129 days |
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF JOYCE EVANS, LMFT
Date: August 07, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF JOYCE EVANS, LMFT
Date: August 17, 2017PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ETC.
Date: September 13, 2017PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF JOYCE EVANS, LMFT; ETC.
Date: September 21, 2017ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF JOYCE EVANS, LMFT
Date: October 05, 2017NOTICE OF RULING FROM HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH IMPROPER MEDICAL SUBPOENAS
Date: February 14, 2018NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE
Date: April 23, 2018ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 11, 2018ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS, ETC
Date: May 31, 2018ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 07, 2018OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE, ETC
Date: September 17, 2018Notice of Ruling - on Defendants' Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: October 03, 2018Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: June 21, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 5
Date: July 30, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 2
Date: July 30, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: July 30, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 4
Date: July 30, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: August 01, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: August 01, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: August 01, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: August 01, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: August 01, 2019Motion to Bifurcate
Date: August 05, 2019AMENDED ANSWER BY BALDWIN PARK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: October 06, 2017FIRST CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION, ETC
Date: June 29, 2018OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, ETC
Date: September 17, 2018ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: September 28, 2018Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Amended Answer
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Request-Informal Discovery Conf
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2014-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendants' Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Judgment (re Sergio Cazorla)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Citadelle Priagula re MSC)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte App for Order Advancing Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re submission of MSC intake form))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice (of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/30/2019)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte App for Order Advanc...))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANT BALDWIN PARK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ORDER TO FURTHER MANDATORY)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AN...))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Order (Ex Parte 6/21/19)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Response (re Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Lien (NOTICE OF ATTORNEY LIEN)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (5)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (4)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (3)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (2)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Request ( for Judicial Notice in Support of MIL No. 2)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine ( No. 6 to Exclude Email Correspondence Containing Settlement Communications)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Declaration ( in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER ADVANCING THE HEAR...))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/19/2019)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 15, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.